MEANOR v. WARDEN OF BEAVER COUNTY JAIL et al
Pennsylvania Western District Court | |
Judge: | J Nicholas Ranjan |
Case #: | 2:24-cv-01771 |
Nature of Suit | 530 Prisoner Petitions - Habeas Corpus - General |
Cause | 28:2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State) |
Case Filed: | Dec 31, 2024 |
Re-opened: | Jan 21, 2025 |
Terminated: | Jan 07, 2025 |
Create an account to get the full party report for this case.
Docket last updated: 05/19/2025 11:59 PM EDT |
Monday, May 12, 2025 | ||
44 | 44
![]() CORRECTIVE ENTRY re43 Report and Recommendation. Reason for Correction: /s/ was missing. (kcb) |
|
Friday, May 09, 2025 | ||
43 | 43
![]() REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION recommending that7 the Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus be dismissed as moot insofar as it challenges the denial of bail and that it be dismissed as premature in all other respects. It is further recommended that Petitioner's37 Motion for Declaratory Judgment,39 Motion for Summary Judgment,40 Motion for Waiver of Exhaustion of State Remedies, and42 Motion to Appoint Federal Public Defender be denied. A certificate of appealability should also be denied. Objections to R&R due by 5/23/2025. Objections to R&R for Unregistered ECF Users due by 5/27/2025. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kezia O. L. Taylor on May 9, 2024. (kcb) |
|
Tuesday, May 06, 2025 | ||
utility
Add and Terminate Judges
Tue 05/06 1:28 PM
Magistrate Judge Kezia O.L. Taylor no longer assigned to case. (tla) |
||
utility
Add and Terminate Judges
Tue 05/06 1:36 PM
Judge J. Nicholas Ranjan and Magistrate Judge Kezia O.L. Taylor added. Motions referred to Kezia O.L. Taylor. (tla) |
||
Friday, May 02, 2025 | ||
42 | 42
![]() MOTION to Appoint Federal Public Defender by MATTHEW STEPHEN MEANOR. (rjr) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Tuesday, April 29, 2025 | ||
41 | 41
![]() NOTICE of Change of Address by MATTHEW STEPHEN MEANOR. FILER advised that the change of address has been made on above captioned matter only. FILER address has been updated to 235 BEAVER AVE. ALIQUIPPA, PA 15001. If you wish to have address changed on other matters before this court, it is your responsibility to file such a notice at each case number. This NEF has been mailed to MATTHEW STEPHEN MEANOR. (keh) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Monday, April 21, 2025 | ||
40 | 40
![]() MOTION for Waiver for Exhaustion of State Remedies by MATTHEW STEPHEN MEANOR. (keh) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
39 | 39
![]() MOTION for Summary Judgment by MATTHEW STEPHEN MEANOR. (keh) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Friday, April 18, 2025 | ||
38 | 38
![]() CONSENT to Trial/Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge OR District Judge Option, by DISTRICT ATTORNEY OF BEAVER COUNTY. (Cobbs, Sarah) |
|
Friday, April 11, 2025 | ||
37 | 37
![]() MOTION for Declaratory Judgment by MATTHEW STEPHEN MEANOR. (keh) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Wednesday, April 09, 2025 | ||
36 | 36
order
Order for Consent/DJO form
Wed 04/09 12:54 PM
TEXT ORDER: In accordance with the case management system in place in this district, this case has been assigned to the undersigned for all pretrial matters. Therefore, it is ORDERED that on or before April 18, 2025 , counsel for RESPONDENTS shall complete an election form either consenting to jurisdiction by the Magistrate Judge or electing to have a District Judge assigned to the case, and shall file the form with the Clerk's Office. A copy of the form can be found on[LINK:the court's website.] Signed by Magistrate Judge Kezia O. L. Taylor on April 9, 2025. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (kcb) |
|
Tuesday, April 01, 2025 | ||
35 | 35
![]() Errata re34 Response to Habeas Petition by DISTRICT ATTORNEY OF BEAVER COUNTY, WARDEN OF BEAVER COUNTY JAIL. Reason for Correction: Filed on behalf of Defendant District Attorney of Beaver County AND Warden of Beaver County. (Cobbs, Sarah) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Att: 2
![]() |
||
Att: 3
![]() |
||
34 | 34
![]() RESPONSE, TO 7 PETITION FOR WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS filed by DISTRICT ATTORNEY OF BEAVER COUNTY. (Cobbs, Sarah) Modified text to add link on 4/1/2025. Document removed from public view and refiled as Errata at35 . (keh) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Att: 2
![]() |
||
Att: 3
![]() |
||
Wednesday, March 26, 2025 | ||
33 | 33
order
Order on Motion for Preliminary Injunction
Wed 03/26 11:02 AM
ORDER denying31 Petitioner's Motion for injunction to end probation and continued prosecution in state court criminal case Nos. 1308-24 and 0473-21. This Motion is denied for the same reasons stated by the Court in its Order dated March 11, 2025. See ECF No. 24. Respondents have been directed to file a response to the petition for writ of habeas corpus by April 1, 2025. A ruling on the petition will be issued shortly thereafter. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kezia O. L. Taylor on March 26, 2025. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (kcb) |
|
Monday, March 24, 2025 | ||
32 | 32
![]() BRIEF in Support of7 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by MATTHEW STEPHEN MEANOR. (keh) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Att: 2
![]() |
||
31 | 31
![]() MOTION for Injunction by MATTHEW STEPHEN MEANOR. (keh) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Att: 2
![]() |
||
Att: 3
![]() |
||
Att: 4
![]() |
||
Att: 5
![]() |
||
Att: 6
![]() |
||
Att: 7
![]() |
||
Friday, March 21, 2025 | ||
30 | 30
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
Fri 03/21 1:43 PM
ORDER denying as moot29 Respondents' Motion for Extension of Time. The Court has already granted the requested extension. See ECF No. 27. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kezia O. L. Taylor on March 21, 2025. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (kcb) |
|
29 | 29
![]() MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to7 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus by DISTRICT ATTORNEY OF BEAVER COUNTY. (Cobbs, Sarah) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Thursday, March 20, 2025 | ||
28 | 28
![]() NOTICE of Appearance by Sarah Cobbs on behalf of DISTRICT ATTORNEY OF BEAVER COUNTY. (Cobbs, Sarah) |
|
Wednesday, March 19, 2025 | ||
27 | 27
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
Wed 03/19 12:40 PM
ORDER granting26 Respondents' Motion for Extension of Time. Respondents shall respond to the Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus by April 1, 2025. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kezia O. L. Taylor on March 19, 2025. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (kcb) |
|
Tuesday, March 18, 2025 | ||
26 | 26
![]() MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to13 Habeas Corpus Service by WARDEN OF BEAVER COUNTY JAIL. (Cobbs, Sarah) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
25 | 25
![]() NOTICE of Appearance by Sarah Cobbs on behalf of WARDEN OF BEAVER COUNTY JAIL. (Cobbs, Sarah) |
|
Tuesday, March 11, 2025 | ||
24 | 24
order
Order on Motion for Preliminary Injunction
Tue 03/11 12:13 PM
ORDER denying23 Motion for Injunction insofar as Petitioner is asking this Court to terminate his probation at 473-2021. This is similar to the relief that Petitioner is seeking in his petition for writ of habeas corpus before this Court, which is not yet ripe for review. As the Court explained in its Order dated February 25, 2025, a ruling on the petition will be issued in due course after the Respondents file a response to the petition. The response, which, contrary to Petitioner's understanding, is to be filed by the Office of the District Attorney of Beaver County and NOT the Beaver County Court of Common Pleas, is not yet due. There is nothing for Petitioner to do at this time. The Court understands that Petitioner is frustrated with aspects of the criminal proceedings against him and that he is anxious for a ruling on his petition in this case. However, this Court is not an appeals court to the Beaver County Court of Common Pleas and its habeas jurisdiction is limited. See 28 USC 2241, 2254. The purpose of a writ of habeas corpus is to challenge the legal authority under which a prisoner is held in custody, and, while 2241 provides federal courts with jurisdiction to issue a writ of habeas corpus before a state judgment is rendered, it is very limited in the circumstances in which it applies. The Court encourages Petitioner to be patient as a ruling will be forthcoming after a response is filed to his petition. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kezia O. L. Taylor on March 11, 2025. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (kcb) |
|
Monday, March 10, 2025 | ||
23 | 23
![]() MOTION for Injunction by MATTHEW STEPHEN MEANOR. (keh) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Att: 2
![]() |
||
Att: 3
![]() |
||
Friday, March 07, 2025 | ||
22 | 22
![]() Remark: Correspondence to the Court (keh) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
21 | 21
![]() SUMMONS/Return of Service Returned Executed by MATTHEW STEPHEN MEANOR. ATTORNEY GENERAL OF THE STATE OF PENNSYLVANIA served on 2/21/2025, answer due 3/13/2025; DISTRICT ATTORNEY OF BEAVER COUNTY served on 3/3/2025, answer due 3/24/2025; WARDEN OF BEAVER COUNTY JAIL served on 2/20/2025, answer due 3/12/2025. (keh) |
|
20 | 20
![]() NOTICE of Appearance by Alicia Hronek on behalf of ATTORNEY GENERAL OF THE STATE OF PENNSYLVANIA, DISTRICT ATTORNEY OF BEAVER COUNTY, WARDEN OF BEAVER COUNTY JAIL. (Hronek, Alicia) |
|
Tuesday, February 25, 2025 | ||
19 | 19
order
Order
Tue 02/25 12:13 PM
ORDER re15 and18 two pieces of Correspondence to the Court from Petitioner titled "Subject: Information" that were received on February 4 and 21, 2025. It is unclear what Petitioner is requesting, if anything, in these letters, as they appear to just be updates on the status of his ongoing state court criminal proceedings. Filings such as these are not permitted. Unless otherwise directed, all communication to the Court concerning this case must be in the form of a pleading, motion, response to a motion, or other filing authorized or directed by the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, the Local Rules of this Court, or prior order of this Court. There is currently a petition for writ of habeas corpus that is pending before the Court, which is in the process of being served on Respondents. After the Respondents file a response to petition, the Court will issue a ruling on it in due course. There is nothing for Petitioner to file at this time and the Court does not need updates on Petitioner's criminal matters unless it directs the filing of such updates. Petitioner is not to send correspondence to the Court as the Court will not consider any requests for relief or arguments presented in correspondence. Similarly, the Court will not respond to correspondence requesting advice concerning matters of procedure. If Petitioner desires any relief from the Court then he should make sure to make that request in the form of a motion with a proper heading and title. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kezia O. L. Taylor on February 25, 2025. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (kcb) |
|
Friday, February 21, 2025 | ||
18 | 18
![]() Remark: Correspondence to the Court (keh) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Thursday, February 06, 2025 | ||
16 | 16
![]() BRIEF in Support of7 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by MATTHEW STEPHEN MEANOR.. Exhibits B, D, F, J, Y removed from public view for PII. (keh) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Att: 2
![]() |
||
Att: 3
![]() |
||
Att: 4
![]() |
||
Att: 5
![]() |
||
Att: 6
![]() |
||
Att: 7
![]() |
||
Att: 8
![]() |
||
Att: 9
![]() |
||
Att: 10
![]() |
||
Att: 11
![]() |
||
Att: 12
![]() |
||
Att: 13
![]() |
||
Att: 14
![]() |
||
Tuesday, February 04, 2025 | ||
15 | 15
![]() Remark: Correspondence to the Court (keh) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Thursday, January 30, 2025 | ||
17 | 17
![]() BRIEF in Support of7 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by MATTHEW STEPHEN MEANOR. (keh) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Wednesday, January 29, 2025 | ||
14 | 14
utility
Remark
Wed 01/29 2:27 PM
Remark: Service copies were forwarded to the U.S. Marshal. Text-only entry. No PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (jmb) |
|
13 | 13
![]() ORDER DIRECTING that the United States Marshal shall make service of this order, together with a copy of the (ECF. No.7 ) Petition for Writ of Habeas upon the respondents, the Warden of the Beaver County Jail, the District Attorney of Beaver County and the Attorney General of the State of Pennsylvania, with costs to be advanced by the United States. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that within twenty (20) days of service of this order, respondents shall respond to the allegations of the petition for writ of habeas corpus. The District Attorney shall address both the merits of the petition and exhaustion of state court remedies. The answer shall comply with the requirements of Rule 5 of the Rules Governing Section 2254 cases in the United States District Courts. The District Attorney shall furnish this Court with the state court records, including all relevant transcripts, all briefs filed by petitioner, and all written opinions of the courts. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the parties are allowed fourteen (14) days from this date to appeal this order to a district judge pursuant to Rule 72.C.2 of the Local Rules. Failure to appeal within fourteen (14) days will constitute waiver of the right to appeal. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kezia O. L. Taylor on 01/29/2025. (jmb) |
|
Friday, January 24, 2025 | ||
12 | 12
order
Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis
Fri 01/24 2:40 PM
ORDER denying as moot9 Petitioner's Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis because the Court has already granted Petitioner leave to proceed IFP in this matter. See ECF No. 6. It is likely that Petitioner's current Motion crossed in the mail with that Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kezia O. L. Taylor on January 24, 2025. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (kcb) |
|
Wednesday, January 22, 2025 | ||
11 | 11
![]() Filing fee: $5.00, receipt number 20012602 (keh) |
|
10 | 10
![]() Remark: A duplicate copy of petition for writ of habeas corpus at ECF No. 7 received. (keh) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
9 | 9
![]() MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by MATTHEW STEPHEN MEANOR. (keh) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
8 | 8
![]() Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement by MATTHEW STEPHEN MEANOR. (keh) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Tuesday, January 21, 2025 | ||
7 | 7
![]() PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus, filed by MATTHEW STEPHEN MEANOR. (keh) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
6 | 6
order
Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis
Tue 01/21 12:24 PM
ORDER granting4 Petitioner's Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. The Clerk of Court is directed to reopen this case and to docket the Habeas Petition, as well as any exhibits that may be attached thereto. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kezia O. L. Taylor on January 21, 2025. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (kcb) |
|
Friday, January 17, 2025 | ||
5 | 5
![]() Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement by MATTHEW STEPHEN MEANOR. (keh) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
4 | 4
![]() MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by MATTHEW STEPHEN MEANOR. (keh) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Tuesday, January 07, 2025 | ||
3 | 3
![]() DEFICIENCY ORDER: The Clerk of Court is to mark this case administratively CLOSED. Submission of $5.00 filing fee or required paperwork to proceed IFP due by February 7, 2025. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kezia O. L. Taylor on January 7, 2024. (kcb) |
|
Tuesday, December 31, 2024 | ||
2 | 2
![]() CONSENT to Trial/Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge OR District Judge Option, by MATTHEW STEPHEN MEANOR. (dmh) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
1 | 1
![]() Remark: Habeas Petition lodged without Motion for In Forma Pauperis or payment of filing fee (dmh) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Att: 2
![]() |