Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 5:23-bk-00998

North Carolina Eastern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:Joseph N Callaway
Case #: 5:24-ap-00144
Nature of Suit12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference
13 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §548 fraudulent transfer
14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other
Case Filed:Dec 31, 2024
Last checked: never
Defendant
Channel Partners Capital, LLC
10900 Wayzata Boulevard Suite 300
Minnetonka, MN 55305
Represented By
Channel Partners Capital, LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
John C. Bircher III, Trustee
Davis Hartman Wright, PLLC 209 Pollock Street
New Bern, NC 28560
Represented By
Joseph Zachary Frost
Buckmiller & Frost, PLLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 4 hours ago
Monday, April 28, 2025
10 10 order Compromise Mon 04/28 1:15 PM
Order Granting Motion to Approve Compromise Related [+] (Gibson, Aileen)
Related: [-] 7
Tuesday, April 22, 2025
9 9 misc Supplement to Filing Tue 04/22 8:40 AM
Supplement to Filing filed by Joseph Zachary Frost on behalf of John C. Bircher III, Trustee Related [+]. (Frost, Joseph)
Related: [-] 7 Motion to Approve Compromise With Channel Partners Capital, LLC
Tuesday, April 01, 2025
8 8 misc Certificate of Service (Not for Summons) Tue 04/01 6:47 PM
Certificate of Service filed by Joseph Zachary Frost on behalf of John C. Bircher III, Trustee Related [+]. (Frost, Joseph)
Related: [-] 7 Motion to Approve Compromise With Channel Partners Capital, LLC
Monday, March 31, 2025
7 7 motion Compromise Mon 03/31 10:26 PM
Motion to Approve Compromise With Channel Partners Capital, LLC filed by Joseph Zachary Frost on behalf of John C. Bircher III, Trustee. (Frost, Joseph)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Friday, February 21, 2025
6 6 notice Notice of Settlement Fri 02/21 10:54 AM
Notice of Settlement filed by Joseph Zachary Frost on behalf of John C. Bircher III, Trustee. (Frost, Joseph)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 03, 2025
5 5 order Consent Order (No Motion) Mon 02/03 9:48 AM
Stipulation and Order Extending Deadline to Answer or Otherwise Respond to Complaint. Answer Due 2/28/2025. (Gibson, Aileen)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 28, 2025
4 4 misc Notice of Appearance Tue 01/28 3:21 PM
Notice of Appearance filed by Phillip Fajgenbaum on behalf of Channel Partners Capital, LLC. (Fajgenbaum, Phillip)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 06, 2025
3 3 misc Affidavit Mon 01/06 11:52 AM
Affidavit of Service filed by Joseph Zachary Frost on behalf of John C. Bircher III, Trustee Related [+]. (Frost, Joseph)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint,2 Summons Issued (auto)
Tuesday, December 31, 2024
2 2 court Summons Issued (auto) Tue 12/31 11:55 AM
Summons Issued on Channel Partners Capital, LLC Answer Due 01/30/2025 (Frost, Joseph)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Tue 12/31 11:55 AM
Adversary case 24-00144 5. Complaint by John C. Bircher, III, Chapter 7 Trustee for Covenant Solar Tech, LLC against Channel Partners Capital, LLC (Fee Deferred) (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)),(13 (Recovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer)),(14 (Recovery of money/property - other)) (Frost, Joseph)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1 - Business Loan and Security Agreement
utility Set Deadline (Private) Wed 01/01 7:00 AM
Answer due by 01/30/2025 (adi)
Related: [-]