Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 5:23-bk-00998

North Carolina Eastern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:Joseph N Callaway
Case #: 5:24-ap-00145
Nature of Suit12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference
13 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §548 fraudulent transfer
14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other
Case Filed:Dec 31, 2024
Last checked: never
Defendant
Ruso Installations, LLC
2002 Huffine Mill Road
McLeansville, NC 27301
Represented By
Ruso Installations, LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
John C. Bircher III, Trustee
Davis Hartman Wright, PLLC 209 Pollock Street
New Bern, NC 28560
Represented By
Joseph Zachary Frost
Buckmiller & Frost, PLLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 4 hours ago
Saturday, April 05, 2025
9 9 court BNC Certificate Of Mailing - Order Sun 04/06 12:33 AM
BNC Certificate Of Mailing - Order Notice Date 04/05/2025. Related [+] (Admin.)
Related: [-] 8
Thursday, April 03, 2025
8 8 order Directing Filing of Joint Report Thu 04/03 11:21 AM
Order Directing Parties to File Joint Report. Pre-Conference Report due by 5/5/2025. (Angel, Sharon)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 02, 2025
utility Calendar - Schedule Wed 04/02 10:24 AM
Note to Courtroom Deputy - Schedule Hearing Date Preliminary Pre-Trial Conference (Gibson, Aileen)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 01, 2025
7 7 answer Answer to Complaint Tue 04/01 2:55 PM
Answer to Complaint filed by Charles M. Ivey III on behalf of Ruso Installations, LLC. Responses due by 4/1/2025. (Ivey, Charles)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 28, 2025
6 6 order Consent Order (No Motion) Fri 02/28 12:21 PM
Stipulation and Order Extending Deadline To Answer or Otherwise Respond To Complaint. Answer Due 4/1/2025 . (Gibson, Aileen)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 03, 2025
5 5 order Extend Time Mon 02/03 9:43 AM
Order Granting Motion to Extend Time Related [+] Answer due by 3/1/2025. (Gibson, Aileen)
Related: [-] 4
Thursday, January 30, 2025
4 4 motion Extend Time/Deadlines Thu 01/30 2:44 PM
Motion to Extend Time to File Answer, filed by Samantha K. Brumbaugh on behalf of Ruso Installations, LLC Related [+]. (Brumbaugh, Samantha)
Related: [-] ument no.1 Complaint
Wednesday, January 22, 2025
3 3 admis Return of Service Wed 01/22 11:59 AM
Return of Service filed by Joseph Zachary Frost on behalf of John C. Bircher III, Trustee Related [+]. (Frost, Joseph)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint,2 Summons Issued (auto)
Tuesday, December 31, 2024
2 2 court Summons Issued (auto) Tue 12/31 12:47 PM
Summons Issued on Ruso Installations, LLC Answer Due 01/30/2025 (Frost, Joseph)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Tue 12/31 12:47 PM
Adversary case 24-00145 5. Complaint by John C. Bircher, III, Chapter 7 Trustee for Covenant Solar Tech, LLC against Ruso Installations, LLC (Fee Deferred) (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)),(13 (Recovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer)),(14 (Recovery of money/property - other)) (Frost, Joseph)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1 - List of Transfers / Payments to Ruso Installations, LLC
utility Set Deadline (Private) Wed 01/01 7:00 AM
Answer due by 01/30/2025 (adi)
Related: [-]