California Central District Court
Judge:James V Selna
Referred: Autumn D Spaeth
Case #: 8:24-cv-02820
Nature of Suit840 Property Rights - Trademark
Cause15:1125 Trademark Infringement (Lanham Act)
Case Filed:Dec 31, 2024
Last checked: Friday Feb 14, 2025 3:18 AM PST
Defendant
Blenders Eyewear, LLC
Represented By
J. Michael Keyes
Dorsey And Whitney LLP
contact info
Defendant
Does
Defendant
The Legends Brand, Inc.
Plaintiff
Sunscape Eyewear, Inc.
Represented By
Rod S. Berman
Jeffer Mangels Butler And Mitchell LLP
contact info
Jessica Bromall Sparkman
Jeffer Mangels Butler And Mitchell LLP
contact info
Madeline Lei Momi Goossen
Jeffer Mangels Butler And Mitchell LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 2 hours ago
Tuesday, April 29, 2025
20 20 order Extending Answer Due Deadline Wed 04/30 8:50 AM
ORDER GRANTING STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME FOR DEFENDANT BLENDERS EYEWEAR, LLC TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT19 , by Judge James V. Selna. The deadline for Defendant Blenders Eyewear, LLC to respond to the Complaint in this matter is extended to May 28, 2025. (es)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 28, 2025
19 19 stip Extending Time to Answer (30 days or less) Mon 04/28 3:36 PM
STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Blenders Eyewear, LLC answer now due 5/28/2025, re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),1 filed by Defendant Blenders Eyewear, LLC.(Keyes, J.)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Tuesday, March 04, 2025
18 18 order Extending Answer Due Deadline Tue 03/04 5:34 PM
ORDER GRANTING STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME FOR DEFENDANT BLENDERS EYEWEAR, LLC TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT17 by Judge James V. Selna. The deadline for Defendant Blenders Eyewear, LLC to respond to the Complaint in this matter is extended to April 28, 2025. (es)
Related: [-]
Sunday, March 02, 2025
17 17 stip Extending Time to Answer (More than 30 days) Sun 03/02 5:18 PM
STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File Answer to 04/28/25 re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),1 filed by Defendant Blenders Eyewear, LLC.(Keyes, J.)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Wednesday, January 29, 2025
16 16 stip Extending Time to Answer (30 days or less) Wed 01/29 10:27 AM
STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Blenders Eyewear, LLC answer now due 2/27/2025, re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),1 filed by Defendant Blenders Eyewear, LLC.(Attorney J. Michael Keyes added to party Blenders Eyewear, LLC(pty:dft))(Keyes, J.)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 14, 2025
15 15 service Proof of Service (subsequent documents) Tue 01/14 10:23 AM
PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Plaintiff Sunscape Eyewear, Inc., (Bromall Sparkman, Jessica)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 09, 2025
14 14 service Proof of Service (subsequent documents) Thu 01/09 10:17 AM
PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Plaintiff Sunscape Eyewear, Inc., served on Jan 07 2025. (Bromall Sparkman, Jessica)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 03, 2025
13 13 order Initial Order upon Filing of Complaint - form only Fri 01/03 12:15 PM
STANDING ORDER by Judge James V. Selna. (dve)
Related: [-]
12 12 notice Deficiency in Attorney Case Opening Fri 01/03 10:10 AM
NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Attorney Case Opening RE: Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),1 . The following error(s) was found: Other error(s) with document(s): Attachment(s): #1 Civil Cover Sheet. The document(s) should have been filed separately using their true events. You are not required to take any action to correct this deficiency unless the Court so directs.. (sh)
Related: [-]
11 11 service Summons Issued (Attorney Civil Case Opening) Fri 01/03 9:53 AM
21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),1 as to Defendant The Legends Brand, Inc.. (sh)
Related: [-]
10 10 service Summons Issued (Attorney Civil Case Opening) Fri 01/03 9:52 AM
21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),1 as to Defendant Blenders Eyewear, LLC. (sh)
Related: [-]
9 9 notice Notice to Counsel Re: Consent to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge - optional html form Fri 01/03 9:38 AM
Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (sh)
Related: [-]
8 8 adr Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form Fri 01/03 9:38 AM
NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (sh)
Related: [-]
7 7 notice Notice of Assignment to United States Judges (CV-18) - optional html form Fri 01/03 9:37 AM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge James V. Selna and Magistrate Judge Autumn D. Spaeth. (sh)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 31, 2024
6 6 2 pgs notice Summons Request Tue 12/31 4:12 PM
Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),1 filed by Plaintiff Sunscape Eyewear, Inc., a California corporation. (Bromall Sparkman, Jessica)
Related: [-]
5 5 2 pgs notice Summons Request Tue 12/31 4:11 PM
Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),1 filed by Plaintiff Sunscape Eyewear, Inc., a California corporation. (Bromall Sparkman, Jessica)
Related: [-]
4 4 1 pgs misc Report on Filing of Patent/Trademark Action (Initial Notification) (AO 120) Tue 12/31 4:10 PM
REPORT ON THE FILING OF AN ACTION Regarding a Patent or a Trademark (Initial Notification) filed by Sunscape Eyewear, Inc., a California corporation. (Bromall Sparkman, Jessica)
Related: [-]
3 3 notice Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties Tue 12/31 4:08 PM
CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Sunscape Eyewear, Inc., a California corporation, (Bromall Sparkman, Jessica)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Corporate Disclosure Statement Tue 12/31 4:07 PM
CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Plaintiff Sunscape Eyewear, Inc., a California corporation (Bromall Sparkman, Jessica)
Related: [-]
1 1 19 pgs cmp Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) Tue 12/31 4:06 PM
COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-38838489 - Fee: $405, filed by Plaintiff Sunscape Eyewear, Inc., a California corporation. (Attorney Jessica Bromall Sparkman added to party Sunscape Eyewear, Inc., a California corporation(pty:pla))(Bromall Sparkman, Jessica)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet