Texas Northern District Court
Judge:Reed C O'Connor
Case #: 4:24-cv-01272
Nature of Suit442 Civil Rights - Employment
Cause42:2000 Job Discrimination (Sex)
Case Filed:Dec 30, 2024
Last checked: Friday Feb 14, 2025 6:14 AM CST
Defendant
The Trinity Valley School
Plaintiff
Carrie Skains
Represented By
Stefanie M Klein
Hill Gilstrap PC
contact info
Frank W Hill
Hill Gilstrap PC
contact info
Anne Michels
Hill Gilstrap PC
contact info


Docket last updated: 4 hours ago
Monday, April 21, 2025
17 17 7 pgs misc Status Report Mon 04/21 5:20 PM
Joint STATUS REPORT filed by Carrie Skains. (Taylor, Walter)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 11, 2025
16 16 26 pgs respm Brief/Memorandum In Support Fri 04/11 4:43 PM
Brief/Memorandum in Support filed by The Trinity Valley School re15 Amended MOTION to Dismiss (Englert, Laura)
Related: [-]
15 15 2 pgs motion Dismiss Fri 04/11 4:40 PM
Amended MOTION to Dismiss filed by The Trinity Valley School (Englert, Laura)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 31, 2025
14 14 1 pgs order Order on Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Mon 03/31 10:50 AM
ORDER: Before the Court is Plaintiff's12 First Amended Complaint. Pursuant to the filing of Plaintiff's Frist Amended Complaint, the Court DENIES as MOOT Defendants Motions to Dismiss. (Ordered by Judge Reed C. O'Connor on 3/31/2025) (mmw)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 28, 2025
13 13 2 pgs respm Response/Objection Fri 03/28 11:11 PM
RESPONSE filed by Carrie Skains re:7 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim (Taylor, Walter)
Related: [-]
12 12 21 pgs cmp Amended Complaint Fri 03/28 11:08 PM
AMENDED COMPLAINT WITH JURY DEMAND against The Trinity Valley School filed by Carrie Skains. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here:[LINK:Attorney Information - Bar Membership] . If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Taylor, Walter)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 24, 2025
11 11 9 pgs order Order for Scheduling Order Proposal Mon 03/24 12:23 PM
ORDER REQUIRING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE AND REPORT FOR CONTENTS OF SCHEDULING ORDER: The Joint Report shall be filed on or before April 21, 2025. (Ordered by Judge Reed C. O'Connor on 3/24/2025) (mmw)
Related: [-]
10 10 1 pgs order Order on Motion to Substitute Attorney Mon 03/24 12:20 PM
ORDER : Before the Court is Plaintiff's9 Motion to Substitute Counsel. The Court is of the opinion that the Motion should be GRANTED. It is ORDERED that Frank W. Hill, Anne Michels and Stephanie M. Klein are hereby withdrawn as counsel for Plaintiff. (Ordered by Judge Reed C. O'Connor on 3/24/2025) (mmw)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 21, 2025
9 9 2 pgs motion Substitute Attorney Fri 03/21 4:09 PM
Unopposed MOTION to Substitute Attorney, added attorney Walter L Taylor,Walter L Taylor,Walter L Taylor for Carrie Skains. Motion filed by Carrie Skains Attorney Walter L Taylor added to party Carrie Skains(pty:pla) (Taylor, Walter)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 07, 2025
8 8 18 pgs respm Brief/Memorandum In Support Fri 03/07 1:24 PM
Brief/Memorandum in Support filed by The Trinity Valley School re7 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim (Englert, Laura)
Related: [-]
7 7 2 pgs motion Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Fri 03/07 1:22 PM
Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by The Trinity Valley School Attorney Laura Balhoff Englert added to party The Trinity Valley School (pty:dft) (Englert, Laura)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 04, 2025
6 6 1 pgs service Waiver of Service Returned Tue 02/04 5:19 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to The Trinity Valley School. Waiver sent on 1/8/2025. (Hill, Frank)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 31, 2024
5 5 2 pgs qcref O' Connor (FORT WORTH CASES) Tue 12/31 4:42 PM
New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. File to: Judge O Connor. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge. Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. Attorneys are further reminded that, if necessary, they must comply with Local Rule 83.10(a) within 14 days or risk the possible dismissal of this case without prejudice or without further notice. (mmw)
Related: [-]
4 4 4 pgs order Order Transferring to Another Division Tue 12/31 12:23 PM
Order transferring case to the Fort Worth Division of the Northern District of Texas. (Ordered by Judge Sam A. Lindsay on 12/31/2024) (kcr)
Related: [-]
3 3 2 pgs service Summons Issued Tue 12/31 9:32 AM
Summons Issued as to The Trinity Valley School. (knb)
Related: [-]
utility Case Transferred In - Divisional Transfer (Public Entry) Tue 12/31 4:38 PM
NEW CASE NUMBER 4:24-cv-1272 has been opened following the order of transfer entered in case number 3:24-cv-03271-L. Future filings should reflect only the new case number and be directed to the proper division (see LR 5.1(a)). Clerk to complete new case processing and mail notice of this entry to any party who did not receive it electronically. Related [+]
Related: [-] kc
Monday, December 30, 2024
2 2 qcref Lindsay Tue 12/31 9:30 AM
New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Horan). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (knb)
Related: [-]
1 1 7 pgs COMPLAINT WITH JURY DEMAND against Trinity Valley School filed by Carrie Skains. (Filing fee $405; Receipt number ATXNDC-15156279) Clerk to issue summons(es). In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the[LINK:Judges Copy Requirements] and[LINK:Judge Specific Requirements] is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here:[LINK:Attorney Information - Bar Membership] . If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Hill, Frank)
Related: [-]