California Southern District Court
Case #: 3:24-cr-02743
Case Filed:Dec 30, 2024
Last checked: Tuesday Dec 31, 2024 11:31 PM PST
Defendant
Carlos Uriel Valenzuela-Mendez (1)
Represented By
Juan Martin Cabrales
Federal Defenders Of San Diego, Inc.
contact info
Federal Defenders
Federal Defenders Of San Diego
contact info
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
Allison Rogge
Doj-Usao
contact info
U S Attorney CR
U S Attorneys Office Southern District Of California
contact info

GPO Apr 21 2025
JUDGMENT as to Carlos Uriel Valenzuela-Mendez (1), Count(s) 1, BOP for a term of Time Served. No Supervised Release Imposed. Special Assessment $100 Waived. Fine Waived. Signed by Judge Linda Lopez (bdc)

Docket last updated: 01/01/2025 12:15 AM PST
Monday, December 02, 2024
Arrest of Carlos Uriel Valenzuela-Mendez (no document attached) (fjp) [3:24-mj-04524-MMP]
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 03, 2024
1 1 COMPLAINT as to Carlos Uriel Valenzuela-Mendez.(fjp) [3:24-mj-04524-MMP]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Info Sheet
2 2 Set/Reset Duty Hearings as to Carlos Uriel Valenzuela-Mendez: Initial Appearance set for 12/3/2024 before Magistrate Judge Michelle M. Pettit. (no document attached) (gac) [3:24-mj-04524-MMP]
Related: [-]
3 3 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE Allison Rogge appearing for USA. (Rogge, Allison)Attorney Allison Rogge added to party USA(pty:pla) (axi). [3:24-mj-04524-MMP]
Related: [-]
4 4 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Michelle M. Pettit: Initial Appearance as to Carlos Uriel Valenzuela-Mendez held on 12/3/2024. Oral proffer confirmed. Appointed Federal Defenders for Carlos Uriel Valenzuela-Mendez. Detention Hearing as to Carlos Uriel Valenzuela-Mendez held on 12/3/2024. USA oral motion for detention(Flight); motion granted as to Carlos Uriel Valenzuela-Mendez. Defendant ordered detained without prejudice. Order of detention to be filed by Court. Bond set as to Carlos Uriel Valenzuela-Mendez (1) No Bail. Rule 5 advisement provided. (Preliminary Hearing set for 12/17/24 at 2:00pm before Magistrate Judge Michelle M. Pettit. Arraignment set for 12/30/24 at 1:30pm before Magistrate Judge Michelle M. Pettit.) (Interpreter Dan DeCoursey). (CD# 12/3/2024 MMP 24-1:2:13-2:20;3:07-3:13;Det Hrg 3:09-3:13). (Plaintiff Attorney Thomas Sommer AUSA). (Defendant Attorney Jeremy Dang FD-S/A). (aje) [3:24-mj-04524-MMP]
Related: [-]
5 5 ***Spanish Interpreter needed as to Carlos Uriel Valenzuela-Mendez (no document attached) (aje) [3:24-mj-04524-MMP]
Related: [-]
6 6 ORDER as to Carlos Uriel Valenzuela-Mendez: The Court orders the United States to comply with the continuing duty to disclose evidence which is favorable to the defendant as required by Brady v. Maryland, 373 U.S. 83 (1963), and its progeny. Upon finding that the government has failed to comply with this order, the Court may, as appropriate, order the production of such information, grant a continuance, impose evidentiary sanctions, or, in extreme cases, dismiss charges.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michelle M. Pettit on 12/3/24. (aje) [3:24-mj-04524-MMP]
Related: [-]
8 8 ORDER OF DETENTION as to Carlos Uriel Valenzuela-Mendez. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michelle M. Pettit on 12/03/2024. (bas1) [3:24-mj-04524-MMP]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 04, 2024
7 7 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Juan Martin Cabrales appearing for Carlos Uriel Valenzuela-Mendez (Cabrales, Juan); Attorney Juan Martin Cabrales added to party Carlos Uriel Valenzuela-Mendez (pty:dft)(jrd) [3:24-mj-04524-MMP]
Related: [-]
Monday, December 09, 2024
9 9 Order on Stipulated Continuance of a Preliminary Hearing as to Carlos Uriel Valenzuela-Mendez. Preliminary Hearing continued to 12/30/2024 at 1:30 PM before Magistrate Judge Michelle M. Pettit. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michelle M. Pettit on 12/9/2024. (yem) [3:24-mj-04524-MMP]
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 19, 2024
10 10 NOTICE of Lodgment of Information by USA (Rogge, Allison) (yxc). [3:24-mj-04524-MMP]
Related: [-]
Monday, December 30, 2024
11 11 INFORMATION as to Carlos Uriel Valenzuela-Mendez (1) count(s) 1. (yem)
Related: [-]
12 12 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Michelle M. Pettit: Arraignment on Count 1 of the Information as to Carlos Uriel Valenzuela-Mendez (1) held on 12/30/2024. Not guilty plea entered. Defendant waived Indictment in open court. Motion Hearing/Trial Setting set for 1/29/2025 at 2:00 PM before Judge Linda Lopez. (Interpreter Elizabeth Valera). (CD# 12/30/2024 MMP 24:1:53-2:07). (Plaintiff Attorney Anna Sebastian, AUSA; Stephen Smith, AUSA). (Defendant Attorney Juan Martin Cabrales, FD). (yem)
Related: [-]