Florida Northern District Court
Case #: 1:24-mj-00075
Case Filed:Dec 30, 2024
Last checked: Wednesday Jan 01, 2025 2:15 AM EST
Defendant
FORREST KENDALL PEMBERTON (1)
Represented By
DARREN JAMES JOHNSON
Federal Public Defender Office - Gainesville Fl
contact info
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
ADAM MICHAEL HAPNER
United States Attorney'S Office
contact info


Docket last updated: 01/01/2025 2:46 AM EST
Monday, December 30, 2024
1 1 Rule 5(c)(3) Documents Received from Southern District of Florida as to FORREST KENDALL PEMBERTON - Initial Appearance set for 12/30/2024 at 02:00 PM in U.S. Courthouse Gainesville before MAGISTRATE JUDGE MIDORI A LOWRY. (tss)
Related: [-]
2 2 ARREST Warrant Returned Executed on 12/30/24 in case as to FORREST KENDALL PEMBERTON. (tss)
Related: [-]
3 3 COMPLAINT from Southern District of Florida signed by U. S. MAGISTATE JUDGE PATRICK M HUNT as to FORREST KENDALL PEMBERTON (1). (tss)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Affidavit in support of Complaint,
Att: 2 Motion and Order to Seal
4 4 MOTION FOR PRETRIAL DETENTION by USA as to FORREST KENDALL PEMBERTON. (tss)
Related: [-]
5 5 Minute Entry for proceedings held before MAGISTRATE JUDGE MIDORI A LOWRY:Initial Appearance in Rule 5(c)(3) Proceedings as to FORREST KENDALL PEMBERTON held on 12/30/2024. Preliminary Hearing, Identity Hearing and Detention Hearing deferred. All set for 1/6/25 at 10:00 a.m. (Court Reporter DCR 2024-1230-135425) (tss)
Related: [-]
6 6 ORDER TEMPORARILY APPOINTING FEDERAL PUBLIC DEFENDER as to FORREST KENDALL PEMBERTON signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE MIDORI A LOWRY on 12/30/24. DARREN JAMES JOHNSON for FORREST KENDALL PEMBERTON appointed. (tss)
Related: [-]
7 7 ORE TENUS MOTION to Unseal Case by USA as to FORREST KENDALL PEMBERTON (tss)
Related: [-]
8 8 ORDER granting 7 Ore Tenus Motion to Unseal Case as to FORREST KENDALL PEMBERTON (1)entered in open Court by MAGISTRATE JUDGE MIDORI A LOWRY on 12/30/24. (tss)
Related: [-]
9 9 ORDER as to FORREST KENDALL PEMBERTON re Due Process Protections Act signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE MIDORI A LOWRY on 12/30/24. (tss)
Related: [-]
10 10 ORDER SCHEDULING A DETENTION HEARING AND OF TEMPORARY DETENTION as to FORREST KENDALL PEMBERTON igned by MAGISTRATE JUDGE MIDORI A LOWRY on 12/30/24. Detention Hearing set for 1/6/2025 at 10:00 AM in U.S. Courthouse Gainesville before MAGISTRATE JUDGE MIDORI A LOWRY. (tss)
Related: [-]
11 11 NOTICE OF HEARING as to FORREST KENDALL PEMBERTON Identity Hearing and Preliminary Examination Hearing, both set for 1/6/2025 at 10:00 AM in U.S. Courthouse Gainesville before MAGISTRATE JUDGE MIDORI A LOWRY. Note: If you or any party, witness or attorney in this matter has a disability that requires special accommodations, such as a hearing impairment that requires a sign-language interpreter or a wheelchair restriction that requires ramp access, please contact the Clerk's Office at least one week prior to the hearing (or as soon as possible) so arrangements can be made. s/TiAnn Stark Courtroom Deputy Clerk (tss)
Related: [-]