New Hampshire District Court
Case #: 1:24-mj-00339
Case Filed:Dec 30, 2024
Last checked: Wednesday Jan 01, 2025 2:15 AM EST
Defendant
Marc Jacques (1)
Represented By
Behzad Mirhashem (FPD)
Federal Defender'S Office
contact info
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
Kasey A Weiland
Us Attorney'S Office (nh)
contact info


Docket last updated: 01/01/2025 2:47 AM EST
Monday, December 30, 2024
Arrest Warrant Issued as to Marc Jacques by US Magistrate Judge Talesha L. Saint-Marc. Original warrant and copies to US Marshal and US Probation.(kad)
Related: [-]
NOTICE OF HEARING as to Marc Jacques. Initial Appearance set for 1/14/2025 02:00 PM before US Magistrate Judge Talesha L. Saint-Marc. (kad)
Related: [-]
1 1 COMPLAINT signed by US Magistrate Judge Talesha L. Saint-Marc as to Marc Jacques (1). (kad)
Related: [-]