Texas Western District Court
Case #: 6:24-mj-00277
Case Filed:Dec 31, 2024
Terminated:Dec 31, 2024
Last checked: Thursday Jan 02, 2025 1:29 AM CST
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
Mark Frazier
U.S. Attorney'S Office
contact info
TERMINATED PARTIES
Defendant
Steven Andrew Zachary Ebner (1)
Terminated: 12/31/2024
Represented By
Duty Pub. Defender-Waco
Office Of The Federal Public Defender
contact info


Docket last updated: 01/02/2025 1:56 AM CST
Tuesday, December 31, 2024
Proceedings Complete in Arresting Division as to Steven Andrew Zachary Ebner. Documents emailed by Charging Division. (lad)
Related: [-]
1 1 Appearance on Writ ( Rule 32.1) of Steven Andrew Zachary Ebner (lad)
Related: [-]
2 2 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Derek T. Gilliland:Initial Appearance in Rule 32.1 Proceedings as to Steven Andrew Zachary Ebner held on 12/31/2024. Defendant HAS completed the CJA23 financial affidavit and counsel will be appointed in the court of jurisdiction. (Minute entry documents are not available electronically.) (Court Reporter FTR.) (lad)
Related: [-]
3 3 CJA 23 Financial Affidavit by Steven Andrew Zachary Ebner (SEALED pursuant to E-Government Act of 2002). (lad)
Related: [-]
4 4 ORDER APPOINTING FEDERAL PUBLIC DEFENDER Duty Pub. Defender-Waco for Steven Andrew Zachary Ebner. Signed by Judge Derek T. Gilliland. (lad)
Related: [-]
5 5 WAIVER - Rule 5/Rule 32.1 as to Steven Andrew Zachary Ebner. (lad)
Related: [-]
6 6 COMMITMENT TO ANOTHER DISTRICT as to Steven Andrew Zachary Ebner. Defendant committed to TXWD Del Rio. Signed by Judge Derek T. Gilliland. (lad)
Related: [-]