New York Southern District Court
Judge:Louis L Stanton
Case #: 1:25-cv-00005
Nature of Suit820 Property Rights - Copyrights
Cause17:501 Copyright Infringement
Case Filed:Jan 02, 2025
Terminated:Feb 27, 2025
Last checked: Sunday Feb 16, 2025 6:10 AM EST
Defendant
Top Hat NY Horse & Carriage LLC
Plaintiff
Helayne Seidman
Represented By
Craig B. Sanders
Sanders Law Group
contact info


Docket last updated: 4 hours ago
Wednesday, February 26, 2025
9 9 notice Notice of Voluntary Dismissal Wed 02/26 2:31 PM
NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(i) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, the plaintiff(s) and or their counsel(s), hereby give notice that the above-captioned action is voluntarily dismissed, with prejudice against the defendant(s) Top Hat NY Horse & Carriage LLC. Document filed by Helayne Seidman. Proposed document to be reviewed and processed by Clerk's Office staff (No action required by chambers). ..(Sanders, Craig)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 13, 2025
8 8 service Summons Returned Executed Mon 01/13 3:30 PM
SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED. Top Hat NY Horse & Carriage LLC served on 1/13/2025, answer due 2/3/2025. Service was accepted by Sue Zouky, Clerk. Document filed by Helayne Seidman..(Sanders, Craig)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 03, 2025
7 7 service Summons Issued Fri 01/03 5:00 PM
ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Top Hat NY Horse & Carriage LLC..(pc)
Related: [-]
6 6 misc AO 121 Form Copyright - Case Opening - Submitted Fri 01/03 4:23 PM
AO 121 FORM COPYRIGHT - CASE OPENING - SUBMITTED. In compliance with the provisions of 17 U.S.C. 508, the Register of Copyrights is hereby advised that a court action has been filed on the following copyright(s) in the U.S. District Court Southern District of New York. Form e-mailed to Register of Copyrights..(pc)
Related: [-]
notice Case Opening Initial Assignment Notice Fri 01/03 10:42 AM
CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Louis L. Stanton. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges] . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions] ..(pc)
Related: [-]
utility Case Designation Fri 01/03 10:45 AM
Magistrate Judge Robyn F. Tarnofsky is designated to handle matters that may be referred in this case. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link:[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf] . (pc)
Related: [-]
utility Case Designated ECF Fri 01/03 10:45 AM
Case Designated ECF. (pc)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 02, 2025
5 5 service Request for Issuance of Summons Thu 01/02 8:06 AM
REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Top Hat NY Horse & Carriage LLC, re:1 Complaint,. Document filed by Helayne Seidman..(Sanders, Craig)
Related: [-]
4 4 misc AO 121 Form Copyright - Notice of Submission by Attorney Thu 01/02 8:00 AM
AO 121 FORM COPYRIGHT - NOTICE OF SUBMISSION BY ATTORNEY. AO 121 Form Copyright for case opening submitted to court for review..(Sanders, Craig)
Related: [-]
3 3 service Request for Issuance of Summons Thu 01/02 8:00 AM
REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Top Hat NY Horse & Carriage LLC, re:1 Complaint,. Document filed by Helayne Seidman..(Sanders, Craig)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Civil Cover Sheet Thu 01/02 7:59 AM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Sanders, Craig)
Related: [-]
1 1 8 pgs cmp Complaint Thu 01/02 7:58 AM
COMPLAINT against Top Hat NY Horse & Carriage LLC. (Filing Fee $ 405.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-30395657)Document filed by Helayne Seidman..(Sanders, Craig)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Original Photograph,
Att: 2 Exhibit Infringing uses of Photograph