New Jersey District Court
Judge:Georgette Castner
Referred: Rukhsanah L Singh
Case #: 3:25-cv-00007
Nature of Suit440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights
Cause42:1981 Civil Rights
Case Filed:Jan 02, 2025
Last checked: Sunday Feb 16, 2025 6:55 AM EST
Defendant
ABC ENTITIES 1-10
Defendant
BOROUGH OF FAR HILLS
Represented By
RICHARD A GRODECK
Piro Zinna
contact info
Defendant
MARY CHIMENTI
Represented By
RICHARD A GRODECK
Piro Zinna
contact info
Defendant
MICHAEL DECAROLIS
Represented By
RICHARD A GRODECK
Piro Zinna
contact info
Defendant
DOROTHY HICKS
Represented By
RICHARD A GRODECK
Piro Zinna
contact info
Defendant
JOHN DOES 1-10
Defendant
SHEILA TWEEDIE
Represented By
RICHARD A GRODECK
Piro Zinna
contact info
Defendant
KEVIN WELSH
Plaintiff
CHARLES SCHWESTER
Represented By
DAMIAN CHRISTIAN SHAMMAS
Law Offices Of Damian Christian Shammas, LLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 2 hours ago
Monday, February 10, 2025
5 5 respm Reply Brief to Opposition to Motion Mon 02/10 4:47 PM
REPLY BRIEF to Opposition to Motion filed by BOROUGH OF FAR HILLS re3 First MOTION to Dismiss (GRODECK, RICHARD)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 03, 2025
4 4 respm Brief in Opposition to Motion Mon 02/03 12:46 PM
BRIEF in Opposition filed by CHARLES SCHWESTER re3 First MOTION to Dismiss (SHAMMAS, DAMIAN)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Certification Damian Christian Shammas
Monday, January 27, 2025
utility Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings Mon 01/27 8:37 AM
Set Deadlines as to3 First MOTION to Dismiss . Motion set for 2/18/2025 before Judge Georgette Castner. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (kht)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 24, 2025
3 3 motion Dismiss Fri 01/24 5:10 PM
First MOTION to Dismiss by BOROUGH OF FAR HILLS, SHEILA TWEEDIE, MARY CHIMENTI, MICHAEL DECAROLIS, DOROTHY HICKS. Responses due by 1/24/2025.(GRODECK, RICHARD)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Certification Certification of Counsel,
Att: 2 Brief Legal Brief,
Att: 3 Text of Proposed Order Order
Thursday, January 02, 2025
2 2 service Summons Issued Thu 01/02 3:45 PM
SUMMONS ISSUED as to BOROUGH OF FAR HILLS, MARY CHIMENTI, MICHAEL DECAROLIS, DOROTHY HICKS, SHEILA TWEEDIE, KEVIN WELSH. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (dmr3)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Thu 01/02 11:07 AM
COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing and Admin fee $ 405 receipt number ANJDC-15910430) with JURY DEMAND, filed by CHARLES SCHWESTER.(SHAMMAS, DAMIAN)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Summons SUMMONS TO FAR HILLS,
Att: 3 Summons SUMMONS TO KEVIN WELSH,
Att: 4 Summons SUMMONS TO MARY CHIMENTI,
Att: 5 Summons SUMMONS TO SHEILA TWEEDIE,
Att: 6 Summons SUMMONS TO MICHAEL DECAROLIS,
Att: 7 Summons SUMMONS TO DOROTHY HICKS
qc QC - Attorney Case Opening Thu 01/02 2:32 PM
CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - The case you electronically filed has been processed, however, the following deficiencies were found: In the future when choosing parties please choose each party individually. Do NOT select the ALL PLAINTIFFS or ALL DEFENDANTS button . The Clerk's Office has made the appropriate changes. Please refer to the Attorney Case Opening Guide for processing electronically filed cases. (jjc, )
Related: [-]
utility Add and Terminate Judges Thu 01/02 3:41 PM
Judge Georgette Castner and Magistrate Judge Rukhsanah L. Singh added. (dmr3)
Related: [-]
notice Notice of Judicial Preferences Thu 01/02 3:41 PM
Notice of Judicial Preferences.[LINK:Click here] for the Judge's Individual Procedure Requirements. (dmr3)
Related: [-]