New York Southern District Court
Judge:Jesse M Furman
Referred: Jennifer E Willis
Case #: 1:25-cv-00017
Nature of Suit446 Civil Rights - Amer w/Disabilities - Other
Cause42:12101 The Americans with Disabilities Act of 1990
Case Filed:Jan 02, 2025
Last checked: Sunday Feb 16, 2025 6:12 AM EST
Defendant
Whisk 197 Atlantic Ave, Inc.
Represented By
David Stein
Stein & Nieporent LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Jacqueline Fernandez
Represented By
Mark Rozenberg
Stein Saks, PLLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 5 hours ago
Wednesday, April 30, 2025
24 24 notice Notice of Appearance Wed 04/30 7:46 PM
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by David Marc Nieporent on behalf of Whisk 197 Atlantic Ave, Inc...(Nieporent, David)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 24, 2025
23 23 7 pgs discov Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan Report Thu 04/24 5:37 PM
RULE 26(f) DISCOVERY PLAN REPORT.Document filed by Jacqueline Fernandez..(Salim, Rami)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 18, 2025
22 22 2 pgs order Order for Initial Pretrial Conference Tue 03/18 4:40 PM
INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT TELEPHONE CONFERENCE ORDER: Counsel is directed to call the court's telephone conference line at the scheduled time. Please dial +1 646-453-4442 and enter passcode: 840107584#. As further set forth by this Order. SO ORDERED. Initial Conference set for 5/1/2025 at 10:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Jennifer E. Willis. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer E. Willis on 3/18/2025) (tg)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 17, 2025
21 21 answer Answer to Complaint Mon 03/17 6:10 PM
ANSWER to1 Complaint. Document filed by Whisk 197 Atlantic Ave, Inc...(Stein, David)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 28, 2025
20 20 1 pgs order Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney Fri 02/28 2:34 PM
MEMO ENDORSED ORDER granting19 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. ENDORSEMENT: Application GRANTED. The Clerk of Court is directed to terminate ECF No. 19. SO ORDERED. (Attorney Mark Rozenberg terminated.) (Signed by Judge Jesse M. Furman on 2/28/25) (yv)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 27, 2025
19 19 motion Withdraw as Attorney Thu 02/27 11:04 PM
MOTION for Mark Rozenberg to Withdraw as Attorney . Document filed by Jacqueline Fernandez..(Rozenberg, Mark)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 21, 2025
18 18 notice Notice of Appearance Fri 02/21 1:19 PM
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Rami Salim on behalf of Jacqueline Fernandez..(Salim, Rami)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 14, 2025
17 17 order Stipulation and Order ~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings Fri 02/14 4:02 PM
STIPULATION VACATING CLERK'S ENTRY OF DEFAULT: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED, by and between Plaintiff Jacqueline Fernandez and Defendant Whisk 197 Atlantic Ave, Inc., through their undersigned counsel, as follows: 1. The Clerk's Entry of Default, dated February 10, 2025 (Doc. 11) against Whisk 197 Atlantic Ave, Inc., for failure to respond to the Complaint is hereby vacated; and 2. Plaintiff consents to the filing of defendant's Response to the Complaint by no later than March 17, 2025. The Clerk of Court is directed to vacate ECF No. 11. The Court's Order of February 11, 2025, ECF No. 12, is also vacated, although the Clerk of Court need not remove it from the docket. The undersigned reminds the parties that, per ECF No. 6, the case is referred to Magistrate Judge Willis for General Pretrial Purposes. So Ordered. Whisk 197 Atlantic Ave, Inc. answer due 3/17/2025. (Signed by Judge Jesse M. Furman on 2/14/2025) (tg)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 13, 2025
16 16 misc Proposed Stipulation and Order Thu 02/13 4:47 PM
PROPOSED STIPULATION AND ORDER. Document filed by Whisk 197 Atlantic Ave, Inc...(Stein, David)
Related: [-]
15 15 misc Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement Thu 02/13 4:28 PM
RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Whisk 197 Atlantic Ave, Inc...(Stein, David)
Related: [-]
14 14 notice Notice of Appearance Thu 02/13 4:28 PM
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by David Stein on behalf of Whisk 197 Atlantic Ave, Inc...(Stein, David)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 11, 2025
13 13 notice Notice (Other) Tue 02/11 1:17 PM
NOTICE of proof of service of order. Document filed by Jacqueline Fernandez..(Rozenberg, Mark)
Related: [-]
12 12 2 pgs order Order Tue 02/11 12:50 PM
ORDER. Defendant in this action appears to be in default. Plaintiff shall file any motion for default judgment, in accordance with the Court's Individual Rules and Practices for Civil Cases (available at https://nysd.uscourts.gov/hon-jesse-m-furman), within two weeks of the date of this Order. Plaintiff shall serve a copy of this Order electronically and/or by first-class mail on Defendant within two business days from the date of this Order and shall file proof of such service within three business days of the date of this Order. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Jesse M. Furman on 2/11/25) (yv)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 10, 2025
11 11 misc Clerk's Certificate of Default Mon 02/10 4:26 PM
CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF DEFAULT as to Whisk 197 Atlantic Ave, Inc..(nd)
Related: [-]
10 10 service Certificate of Service Other Mon 02/10 11:37 AM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Proposed Certificate of Default and Affirmation in Support of Request for Certificate of Default served on Whisk 197 Atlantic Ave, Inc. on 2/10/2025. Service was made by mail. Document filed by Jacqueline Fernandez..(Rozenberg, Mark)
Related: [-]
9 9 respoth Affirmation in Support (non-motion) Mon 02/10 11:35 AM
AFFIRMATION of Mark Rozenberg in Support re:8 Proposed Clerk's Certificate of Default. Document filed by Jacqueline Fernandez..(Rozenberg, Mark)
Related: [-]
8 8 misc Proposed Clerk's Certificate of Default Mon 02/10 11:34 AM
PROPOSED CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF DEFAULT. Document filed by Jacqueline Fernandez..(Rozenberg, Mark) Proposed document to be reviewed and processed by Clerk's Office staff (No action required by chambers). Modified on 2/10/2025 (nd)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 17, 2025
7 7 service Summons Returned Executed Fri 01/17 12:19 PM
SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED. Whisk 197 Atlantic Ave, Inc. served on 1/16/2025, answer due 2/6/2025. Service was accepted by Peter Rott. Document filed by Jacqueline Fernandez..(Rozenberg, Mark)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 07, 2025
6 6 1 pgs order Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge Tue 01/07 11:31 AM
ORDER REFERRING CASE TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE. Order that case be referred to the Clerk of Court for assignment to a Magistrate Judge for General Pretrial (includes scheduling, discovery, non-dispositive pretrial motions, and settlement). Referred to Magistrate Judge Jennifer E. Willis. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Jesse M. Furman on 1/6/25) (yv)
Related: [-]
5 5 1 pgs order Order Tue 01/07 11:27 AM
ORDER. By separate Order to be entered today, the Court is referring this case to the assigned Magistrate Judge for General Pretrial Purposes, including settlement. To be clear, the referral does not encompass any dispositive motions, which will be handled by the undersigned in the normal course. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Jesse M. Furman on 1/6/25) (yv)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 03, 2025
4 4 2 pgs service Summons Issued Fri 01/03 5:04 PM
ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Whisk 197 Atlantic Ave, Inc...(pc)
Related: [-]
notice Case Opening Initial Assignment Notice Fri 01/03 11:39 AM
CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Jesse M. Furman. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges] . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions] ..(pc)
Related: [-]
utility Case Designation Fri 01/03 11:39 AM
Magistrate Judge Jennifer Willis is designated to handle matters that may be referred in this case. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link:[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf] . (pc)
Related: [-]
utility Case Designated ECF Fri 01/03 11:39 AM
Case Designated ECF. (pc)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 02, 2025
3 3 2 pgs service Request for Issuance of Summons Thu 01/02 12:25 PM
REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to WHISK 197 ATLANTIC AVE, INC., re:1 Complaint. Document filed by Jacqueline Fernandez..(Rozenberg, Mark)
Related: [-]
2 2 2 pgs misc Civil Cover Sheet Thu 01/02 11:54 AM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Rozenberg, Mark)
Related: [-]
1 1 22 pgs cmp Complaint Thu 01/02 11:53 AM
COMPLAINT against Whisk 197 Atlantic Ave, Inc.. (Filing Fee $ 405.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-30397723)Document filed by Jacqueline Fernandez..(Rozenberg, Mark)
Related: [-]