New York Eastern District Court
Judge:Eric R Komitee
Referred: Cheryl L Pollak
Case #: 1:25-cv-00008
Nature of Suit350 Torts - Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Auto Negligence
Case Filed:Jan 02, 2025
Terminated:Feb 05, 2025
Last checked: Sunday Feb 16, 2025 6:05 AM EST
Defendant
Thomas H. Huber
Defendant
PHC Toys Inc.
Represented By
Peter Cantone
Law Offices Of Gerard E. O'Connor
contact info
Plaintiff
Juanisabel Garcia Placencio
Represented By
Stephen John Liakas
Liakas Law, P.C.
contact info
Plaintiff
Carlos Lanz-Tienda
Represented By
Stephen John Liakas
Liakas Law, P.C.
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/04/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Wednesday, February 05, 2025
order ~Util - Terminate Civil Case Wed 02/05 4:58 PM
Pursuant to the parties' Stipulation of Voluntary Dismissal10 , filed on February 3, 2025, this action is dismissed without prejudice and without costs to either party. Civil case terminated. (APJ)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 03, 2025
10 10 misc Stipulation of Dismissal Mon 02/03 2:22 PM
STIPULATION of Dismissal without Prejudice by PHC Toys Inc. (Cantone, Peter)
Related: [-]
order 1 - Terminate Hearings Mon 02/03 2:28 PM
ELECTRONIC ORDER: In light of10 , the Initial Conference previously scheduled for 2/4/2025 is adjourned sine die . So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl L. Pollak on 2/3/2025. (LMD)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 10, 2025
9 9 order Scheduling Order Fri 01/10 10:32 AM
SCHEDULING ORDER: An Initial Conference is set for 2/4/2025 @ 12:15 PM before Magistrate Judge Cheryl L. Pollak. Initial conference will proceed via CISCO conference call. Please dial 571-353-2301 at 12:15 PM . Enter Meeting ID: 022-788-537. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl L. Pollak on 1/10/2025. (DC)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 09, 2025
8 8 answer Answer to Complaint Thu 01/09 7:54 PM
ANSWER to Complaint by PHC Toys Inc.. (Cantone, Peter)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Certificate of Service
Tuesday, January 07, 2025
7 7 misc Jury Demand Tue 01/07 3:42 PM
DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Carlos Lanz-Tienda, Juanisabel Garcia Placencio (Liakas, Stephen)
Related: [-]
6 6 notice Notice of Appearance Tue 01/07 3:41 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Stephen John Liakas on behalf of All Plaintiffs (notification declined or already on case) (Liakas, Stephen)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 02, 2025
5 5 service Affidavit of Service Thu 01/02 2:54 PM
AFFIDAVIT of Service for NOTICE OF FILING OF NOTICE OF REMOVAL, NOTICE OF REMOVAL WITH EXHIBITS, and CIVIL COVER SHEET served on LIAKAS LAW PC on January 2, 2025, filed by PHC Toys Inc.. (Cantone, Peter)
Related: [-]
4 4 misc Quality Control Check - Attorney Case Opening Thu 01/02 12:53 PM
This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (CV)
Related: [-]
3 3 misc Clerks Notice of Rule 73 Thu 01/02 12:51 PM
Clerk's Notice Re: Consent. A United States Magistrate Judge has been assigned to this case and is available to conduct all proceedings. In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent, the assigned Magistrate Judge is available to conduct all proceedings in this action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to this Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. Any party may withhold its consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent.The form may also be accessed at the following link:[LINK:https://img.nyed.uscourts.gov/files/forms/MJConsentForm.pdf] (CV)
Related: [-]
2 2 notice Notice(Other) Thu 01/02 12:20 PM
NOTICE by PHC TOYS INC. re1 Notice of Removal, Civil Cover Sheet (Cantone, Peter)
Related: [-]
1 1 notice Notice of Removal Thu 01/02 12:13 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL by PHC TOYS INC. from Kings County Supreme Court, case number 532894/2024. ( Filing fee $ 405 receipt number ANYEDC-18625509) (Cantone, Peter)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Exhibit A - Summons & Complaint,
Att: 2 Exhibit Exhibit B - Affidavits of Service,
Att: 3 Exhibit Exhibit C - Notice of Filing
utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Thu 01/02 12:50 PM
Case Assigned to Judge Eric R. Komitee and Magistrate Judge Cheryl L. Pollak. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our[LINK:website] . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (CV)
Related: [-]
misc ECF Admission and Registration Notification - Removal Thu 01/02 12:52 PM
This case has been opened in the Eastern District of New York. If you plan to continue representing your client(s), you must be admitted to practice before this court. You must do so by applying for Pro Hac Vice or permanent admission. To apply for Pro Hac Vice admission, you must first register for an ECF login and password. Please visit the Court's website at www.nyed.uscourts.gov/attorney-admissions for guidance. Once registered, you must electronically file a Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. You must pay the required pro hac vice fee online. (CV)
Related: [-]