Pennsylvania Western District Court
Judge:J Nicholas Ranjan
Case #: 2:25-cv-00002
Nature of Suit440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights
Cause42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Case Filed:Jan 02, 2025
Last checked: Sunday Feb 16, 2025 6:19 AM EST
Defendant
ALLEGHENY COUNTY DEPARTMENT OF HUMAN SERVICES, OFFICE OF CHILDREN YOUTH AND FAMILIES
Defendant
ALLEGHENY COUNTY, PENNSYLVANIA
Defendant
Candice Dewberry
Defendant
Mandeep Gill
DHS Deputy Director, CYF Children Youth and Families One Smithfield Street suite 400
Pittsburgh, PA 15222
Defendant
Kelly Pavilonis
Plaintiff
Breanna Airgood
Represented By
Aaron Sontz
Aaron Sontz Legal Services, P.C.
contact info
Plaintiff
Ryan Scholl
Represented By
Aaron Sontz
Aaron Sontz Legal Services, P.C.
contact info


Docket last updated: 7 hours ago
Wednesday, April 16, 2025
17 17 respm Reply Brief Wed 04/16 10:29 AM
REPLY BRIEF filed by ALLEGHENY COUNTY DEPARTMENT OF HUMAN SERVICES, OFFICE OF CHILDREN YOUTH AND FAMILIES, ALLEGHENY COUNTY, PENNSYLVANIA, Candice Dewberry, Mandeep Gill, Kelly Pavilonis. (Bacharach, John)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit
Monday, March 31, 2025
16 16 misc Proposed Order Mon 03/31 9:08 AM
Proposed Order by Breanna Airgood, Ryan Scholl. (Sontz, Aaron)
Related: [-]
15 15 respm Reply Brief Mon 03/31 9:00 AM
REPLY BRIEF In Opposition to the Defendants' Rule 12 Motion to Dismiss filed by Breanna Airgood, Ryan Scholl. (Sontz, Aaron)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 14, 2025
14 14 order Order ~Util - Set Deadlines Fri 03/14 12:45 PM
ORDER re12 Motion to Dismiss. Plaintiff shall file a brief in response to Defendants'12 motion on or before 4/4/2025; Defendants' reply brief due by 4/18/2025. No brief shall exceed 15 pages in length. Signed by Judge J. Nicholas Ranjan on 3/14/2025. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (pak)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 13, 2025
13 13 respm Brief / Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion Thu 03/13 2:33 PM
BRIEF in Support re12 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim, filed by ALLEGHENY COUNTY DEPARTMENT OF HUMAN SERVICES, OFFICE OF CHILDREN YOUTH AND FAMILIES, ALLEGHENY COUNTY, PENNSYLVANIA, Candice Dewberry, Mandeep Gill, Kelly Pavilonis. (Bacharach, John)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1,
Att: 2 Exhibit 2
12 12 motion Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Thu 03/13 2:31 PM
MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM re11 Amended Complaint, by ALLEGHENY COUNTY DEPARTMENT OF HUMAN SERVICES, OFFICE OF CHILDREN YOUTH AND FAMILIES, ALLEGHENY COUNTY, PENNSYLVANIA, Candice Dewberry, Mandeep Gill, Kelly Pavilonis. (Bacharach, John)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Thursday, March 06, 2025
11 11 cmp Amended Complaint Thu 03/06 9:15 AM
First AMENDED COMPLAINT against ALLEGHENY COUNTY DEPARTMENT OF HUMAN SERVICES, OFFICE OF CHILDREN YOUTH AND FAMILIES, ALLEGHENY COUNTY, PENNSYLVANIA, Candice Dewberry, Mandeep Gill, Kelly Pavilonis, filed by Ryan Scholl, Breanna Airgood. (Sontz, Aaron)
Related: [-]
10 10 misc Stipulation Thu 03/06 9:12 AM
STIPULATION to Amend the Complaint by Breanna Airgood, Ryan Scholl. (Sontz, Aaron)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 28, 2025
9 9 notice Notice of Appearance Fri 02/28 11:21 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by John A. Bacharach on behalf of Candice Dewberry, Mandeep Gill, Kelly Pavilonis. (Bacharach, John)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 26, 2025
8 8 misc Affidavit Wed 02/26 5:08 PM
AFFIDAVIT of service of Summons by Breanna Airgood, Ryan Scholl Affiant: Nieshia Duganne. (Sontz, Aaron)
Related: [-]
7 7 order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer Wed 02/26 10:37 AM
ORDER granting6 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Defendants shall file an answer or otherwise respond to the1 complaint on or before 3/11/2025. Signed by Judge J. Nicholas Ranjan on 2/26/2025. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (pak)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 25, 2025
6 6 motion Extend Time Tue 02/25 1:43 PM
Unopposed MOTION to Extend Time to March 11, 2025 by ALLEGHENY COUNTY DEPARTMENT OF HUMAN SERVICES, OFFICE OF CHILDREN YOUTH AND FAMILIES, ALLEGHENY COUNTY, PENNSYLVANIA. (Bacharach, John)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Monday, February 24, 2025
5 5 notice Notice of Appearance Mon 02/24 12:27 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by John A. Bacharach on behalf of ALLEGHENY COUNTY DEPARTMENT OF HUMAN SERVICES, OFFICE OF CHILDREN YOUTH AND FAMILIES, ALLEGHENY COUNTY, PENNSYLVANIA. (Bacharach, John)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 06, 2025
4 4 service Summons Issued Thu 02/06 11:33 AM
Summons Issued as to ALLEGHENY COUNTY, PENNSYLVANIA, Candice Dewberry, Mandeep Gill, Kelly Pavilonis (sdp)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 04, 2025
3 3 service Praecipe to Issue Summons Tue 02/04 1:15 PM
PRAECIPE to Issue Summons by Breanna Airgood, Ryan Scholl (Sontz, Aaron)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Summons,
Att: 2 Summons,
Att: 3 Summons,
Att: 4 Summons
Friday, January 03, 2025
2 2 misc Errata (to be used by filers) Fri 01/03 2:30 PM
Errata re1 COMPLAINT, by Ryan Scholl. Reason for Correction: redact minor child's name. (Sontz, Aaron)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet civil cover sheet
1 1 cmp ATTORNEY Complaint (Credit Card Required) Fri 01/03 1:37 PM
COMPLAINT against Kelly Pavilonis, Candice Dewberry, Mandeep Gill, ALLEGHENY COUNTY DEPARTMENT OF HUMAN SERVICES, OFFICE OF CHILDREN YOUTH AND FAMILIES, ALLEGHENY COUNTY, PENNSYLVANIA (Filing fee, including Administrative fee, $405, receipt number APAWDC-8631289), filed by Ryan Scholl, Breanna Airgood. (Sontz, Aaron) Modified on 1/3/2025 to correct parties, remove documents from public view. (sms)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet
utility Add and Terminate Judges Fri 01/03 2:08 PM
Judge J. Nicholas Ranjan added. (sms)
Related: [-]
misc QC - Generic (only use if no other QC events apply) Fri 01/03 2:09 PM
CLERK'S OFFICE QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE re1 COMPLAINT. ERROR: Minor child's name was not redacted in accordance with LCvR 5.2.D.2. CORRECTION: Attorney must redact the minor child's name to only initials in all documents in accordance with LCvR 5.2.D.2 and refile under Civil > Other Filings > Other Documents > Errata. (sms)
Related: [-]