JENKINS v. BONONI et al
Pennsylvania Western District Court | |
Judge: | William S Stickman |
Case #: | 2:25-cv-00003 |
Nature of Suit | 440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights |
Cause | 28:1331 Fed. Question: Civil Rights Violation |
Case Filed: | Jan 02, 2025 |
Last checked: Sunday Feb 16, 2025 6:20 AM EST |
Defendant
MICHELE BONONI
|
|
Defendant
RITA HATHAWAY
|
|
Plaintiff
CHERYL JENKINS
424 Reagan St.
Sunbury, PA 17801 |
Docket last updated: 2 hours ago |
Wednesday, April 30, 2025 | ||
16 | 16
utility
Remark
Wed 04/30 10:04 AM
Remark: A copy of ECF No 15 was returned to the Court on today's date as "Return to Sender. Not Deliverable As Addressed. Unable to Forward." Text-only entry. No PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (mqe) |
|
Monday, April 21, 2025 | ||
15 | 15
![]() REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION that4 COMPLAINT against MICHELE BONONI, and RITA HATHAWAY, filed by CHERYL JENKINS be dismissed for failure to prosecute. Objections to R&R due by 5/5/2025. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patricia L. Dodge on 4/21/2025. (mqe) |
|
utility
Add and Terminate Judges
Mon 04/21 1:11 PM
Magistrate Judge Patricia L. Dodge no longer assigned to case. (rjr) |
||
utility
Add and Terminate Judges
Mon 04/21 1:13 PM
Judge William S. Stickman presiding and Magistrate Judge Patricia L. Dodge referred. (rjr) |
||
Friday, April 18, 2025 | ||
14 | 14
order
Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
Fri 04/18 10:05 AM
ORDER denying Plaintiff's12 motion to allow to appear via computer or telephone. While the Court may, as appropriate, schedule conferences by telephone, Plaintiff must appear and attend court proceedings in person in this District when required to do so. The Court further notes that Plaintiff has not provided any current address to which this order and any other communication from the Court or the parties may be sent. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patricia L. Dodge on 4/18/2025. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (mqe) |
|
13 | 13
order
Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
Fri 04/18 10:04 AM
ORDER denying Plaintiff's11 motion to allow to use old address for safety purposes. The Complaint states that Plaintiff has not resided at the "old address" she listed in her Complaint since 2022. Previous mail sent by the Court to this address has been returned as undeliverable and unable to forward. Recent mail sent by Plaintiff to the Court has come from at least three states, none of which are Pennsylvania. As Plaintiff was previously advised, she must provide her address to the Court so that the Court and the parties can provide her with orders, pleadings and other communications. Additionally, Plaintiff continues to disregard Rule 11(a), as the recent motions do not state, among other things, the signer's address.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patricia L. Dodge on 4/18/2025. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (mqe) |
|
Wednesday, April 16, 2025 | ||
12 | 12
![]() MOTION to allow to appear via computer or phone by CHERYL JENKINS. (jkn) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
11 | 11
![]() MOTION to allow to use old address for safety purposes by CHERYL JENKINS. (jkn) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Thursday, March 13, 2025 | ||
10 | 10
notice
Notice (Other) - Do Not Use for ADR Documents
Thu 03/13 4:08 PM
NOTICE. Plaintiff is advised that the Court has received her most recent mailing, containing service documents, dated March 3, 2025. The envelope contains tracking information indicating that the mail originated in Saint Louis, MO. Previously, the Court received mail from Plaintiff dated January 25, 2025 that appeared to originate in Hollywood, FL. On both of the envelopes in the return address line, Plaintiff listed this Court's address instead of an address where she herself can receive mail. As previously stated in the Court's Order (ECF No. 8), Rule 11(a) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure requires that every pleading, motion or other paper must, among other things, state the signer's address. Without Plaintiff's address, this case cannot proceed as neither the Court nor any defendant has any means to serve her with orders, pleadings, motions or other papers. The Court will not take any action to serve the Defendants without an updated address. If Plaintiff wishes to proceed with this case, she must provide an address where she can receive mail from the Court and the parties. The failure to do so may result in the dismissal of this case for failure to prosecute. (mqe) |
|
Friday, February 07, 2025 | ||
9 | 9
order
Order
Fri 02/07 9:15 AM
ORDER. Plaintiff has called the Court's Chambers on several occasions during which she has been disrespectful, discourteous, abusive, and registered a number of unfounded complaints. While Plaintiff may contact Chambers related to administrative questions, Chambers staff cannot provide legal advice, must be treated with courtesy and respect, and are not required to explain why certain rules or procedures exist. By this order, Plaintiff is placed on notice that in the event that Plaintiff initiates or participates in any further telephone conferences in which she engages in discourteous or abusive behavior, any such call will be immediately terminated and she will be prohibited from contacting Chambers by telephone. Since the Court does not have Plaintiff's current address, this order will be read to her in the event that she contacts Chambers by telephone. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patricia L. Dodge on 2/7/2025. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (mqe) |
|
8 | 8
order
Order
Fri 02/07 9:08 AM
ORDER. In the Complaint filed by Plaintiff, she identifies only a former address and states that "if another address is necessary please call me." In telephone calls with Plaintiff, including most recently on February 5, 2025, she has refused to provide the Court with an address where she resides or can receive mail. Mail sent by the Court to the address provided by Plaintiff in the Complaint has been returned as undeliverable and unable to forward. Rule 11(a) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure requires that every pleading, motion or other paper must, among other things, state the signer's address. None of the documents filed by Plaintiff include her address. Without Plaintiff's address, this case cannot proceed as neither the Court nor any defendant has any means to serve her with orders, pleadings, motions or other papers. Therefore, if Plaintiff wishes to proceed with this case, she must provide an address where she can receive mail from the Court and the parties. The failure to do so may result in the dismissal of this case for failure to prosecute. As Plaintiff's only known address is the prior address provided in her Complaint, a copy of this order will be mailed to her there. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patricia L. Dodge on 2/7/2025. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (mqe) |
|
Monday, February 03, 2025 | ||
7 | 7
utility
Remark
Mon 02/03 3:37 PM
Remark: A copy of ECF No. 6 was returned to the Court on 2/3/2025 as "Return to Sender. Not Deliverable as Addressed. Unable to Forward." The Court is unable to re-mail the Order on today's date. Text-only entry. No PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (mqe) |
|
Wednesday, January 15, 2025 | ||
6 | 6
order
Order on Motion for Service by U.S. Marshal
Wed 01/15 11:06 AM
ORDER denying as premature Plaintiff's5 MOTION for Service by U.S. Marshal. Before the Court will order the U.S. Marshal to complete service on Plaintiff's behalf, Plaintiff must submit an accurate, identical copy of the complaint for each of the named defendants. If Plaintiff is unable to reproduce and provide to the Court one complete copy of the 6-page Complaint filed January 14, 2025 for each of the two Defendants named in the Complaint, she may tender to the Clerk of Court the appropriate fee for the copies to be made on her behalf. The fee for a single copy of the Complaint is $0.60 (6 pages at a cost of $0.10 per page); the fee for the two required copies is $1.20. Plaintiff must also provide "Process Receipt and Return" forms (USM-285), "Notice and Request for Waiver of Service of Summons," and "Waiver of the Service of Summons" forms for each of the two Defendants named in the Complaint. Blank copies of the required forms will be mailed to Plaintiff with this Order. On or before January 29, 2025 , Plaintiff shall submit all completed forms and the two copies of the Complaint to: Clerk of Court, 700 Grant Street, Suite 3110, Pittsburgh, PA 15219. Failure to do so may result in dismissal of this case for failure to prosecute. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patricia L. Dodge on 1/15/2025. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (mqe) |
|
Tuesday, January 14, 2025 | ||
5 | 5
![]() MOTION for Service by U.S. Marshal re4 Complaint by CHERYL JENKINS. (bjr) |
|
4 | 4
![]() COMPLAINT against MICHELE BONONI, RITA HATHAWAY, filed by CHERYL JENKINS. (bjr) |
|
3 | 3
order
Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis
Tue 01/14 12:17 PM
ORDER granting1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by CHERYL JENKIN. The Clerk of Court is directed to file the Complaint and Plaintiff's Motion for USM Service [1-3]. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patricia L. Dodge on 1/14/2025. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (mqe) |
|
Thursday, January 02, 2025 | ||
2 | 2
![]() CONSENT to Trial/Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge OR District Judge Option, by CHERYL JENKINS. (bjr) |
|
1 | 1
![]() MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by CHERYL JENKINS. (bjr) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Att: 2
![]() |
||
Att: 3
![]() |
||
utility
Add and Terminate Judges
Fri 01/03 12:05 PM
Magistrate Judge Patricia L. Dodge added. (bjr) |