Tennessee Western District Court
Judge:S Thomas Anderson
Referred: Jon A York
Case #: 1:25-cv-01001
Nature of Suit360 Torts - Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury
Cause42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Case Filed:Jan 02, 2025
Last checked: Sunday Feb 16, 2025 5:20 AM CST
Defendant
City of Huntingdon, Tennessee
Defendant
Ethan Parham
Defendant
Justen Roberts
Plaintiff
Trent J. McGregor
PO Box 130
Camden, TN 38320
Represented By
Terry J. Leonard
Law Offices Of Terry J. Leonard
contact info


Docket last updated: 2 hours ago
Friday, May 02, 2025
30 30 notice Setting Letter Fri 05/02 10:08 AM
SETTING LETTER: Scheduling Conference set for 6/5/2025 09:00 AM in Jackson Courtroom 1 before Judge S. Thomas Anderson. (mbb)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 01, 2025
29 29 answer Answer to Complaint Thu 05/01 5:38 PM
ANSWER to1 Complaint by All Defendants.(Hill, Michael)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 16, 2025
28 28 service Summons Returned Executed Wed 04/16 4:45 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Trent J. McGregor as to Justen Roberts. (Leonard, Terry)
Related: [-]
27 27 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Wed 04/16 10:11 AM
ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND TO PLAINTIF'S COMPLAINT. Signed by Judge S. Thomas Anderson on 4/16/2025. (gkp)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 15, 2025
26 26 motion Extension of Time to File Answer Tue 04/15 3:07 PM
MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re1 Complaint proposed order submitted by All Defendants.(Rast, Mary)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Memorandum in support of Motion to Extend the Deadline to file a Responsive Pleading,
Att: 2 Certificate of Consultation on Defendants' Motion to Extend the Deadline to file a Responsive Pleading
25 25 notice Notice of Appearance Tue 04/15 3:02 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Mary Beth Rast on behalf of Ethan Parham, Justen Roberts (Rast, Mary)
Related: [-]
24 24 notice Notice of Appearance Tue 04/15 2:26 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Michael R. Hill on behalf of Ethan Parham, Justen Roberts (Hill, Michael)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 04, 2025
23 23 service Summons Issued Fri 04/04 2:44 PM
Summons Issued as to Justen Roberts. The filer has been notified electronically that the summons has been issued, and the new docket entry reflects this. Upon notification of the new docket entry, the filer is to print the issued summons in order to effect service. (gkp)
Related: [-]
22 22 2 pgs order Order Fri 04/04 2:38 PM
ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME FOR SERVICE. Signed by Judge S. Thomas Anderson on 4/4/2025. (gkp)
Related: [-]
21 21 misc Response to Order to Show Cause Fri 04/04 10:56 AM
RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by Trent J. McGregor.(Leonard, Terry)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Exhibit A,
Att: 2 Exhibit Exhibit B
Thursday, April 03, 2025
20 20 2 pgs order Order to Show Cause Thu 04/03 3:37 PM
ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. Signed by Judge S. Thomas Anderson on 4/3/25. (cdi)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 31, 2025
19 19 service Summons Returned Unexecuted Mon 03/31 3:54 PM
Summons Returned Unexecuted by Trent J. McGregor as to Justen Roberts. (Leonard, Terry)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 28, 2025
18 18 notice Notice of Appearance Fri 03/28 9:58 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Mary Beth Rast on behalf of City of Huntingdon, Tennessee (Rast, Mary)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 27, 2025
17 17 notice Notice of Summons Thu 03/27 3:39 PM
NOTICE of Summons by Terry J. Leonard on behalf of Trent J. McGregor. (Leonard, Terry)
Related: [-]
16 16 notice Notice of Appearance Thu 03/27 3:36 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Michael R. Hill on behalf of City of Huntingdon, Tennessee (Hill, Michael) STAFF NOTE: Notice was filed using wrong attorney account. Filer has been instructed to re-file. (cbs)
Related: [-]
15 15 service Affidavit of Service Thu 03/27 3:35 PM
AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons served on Chad Edwards on 03/27/2025, filed by Trent J. McGregor. (Leonard, Terry)
Related: [-]
14 14 notice Notice of Appearance Thu 03/27 3:35 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Michael R. Hill on behalf of City of Huntingdon, Tennessee (Hill, Michael)
Related: [-]
13 13 service Affidavit of Service Thu 03/27 3:34 PM
AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons served on Ethan Parham on 03/27/2025, filed by Trent J. McGregor. (Leonard, Terry)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 07, 2025
12 12 service Summons Issued Fri 03/07 4:04 PM
Summons Issued as to City of Huntingdon, Tennessee, Ethan Parham, Justen Roberts. The filer has been notified electronically that the summons has been issued, and the new docket entry reflects this. Upon notification of the new docket entry, the filer is to print the issued summons in order to effect service.(gkp)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Leonard,
Att: 2 Roberts
Thursday, March 06, 2025
11 11 notice Notice of Correction Thu 03/06 2:37 PM
Notice of Correction to7 Notice of Summons . (Leonard, Terry)
Related: [-]
10 10 2 pgs notice Notice of Correction Thu 03/06 2:37 PM
Notice of Correction to8 Notice of Summons . (Leonard, Terry)
Related: [-]
9 9 notice Notice of Correction Thu 03/06 2:33 PM
Notice of Correction to6 Notice of Summons . (Leonard, Terry)
Related: [-]
8 8 notice Notice of Summons Thu 03/06 2:12 PM
NOTICE of Summons by Terry J. Leonard on behalf of Trent J. McGregor. (Leonard, Terry)
Related: [-]
7 7 notice Notice of Summons Thu 03/06 2:12 PM
NOTICE of Summons by Terry J. Leonard on behalf of Trent J. McGregor. (Leonard, Terry)
Related: [-]
6 6 notice Notice of Summons Thu 03/06 2:11 PM
NOTICE of Summons by Terry J. Leonard on behalf of Trent J. McGregor. (Leonard, Terry)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 02, 2025
5 5 notice Notice LR 72.1 - Right to Consent to Jurisdiction by Magistrate Judge Thu 01/02 4:06 PM
NOTICE OF RIGHT TO CONSENT TO THE EXERCISE OF CIVIL JURISDICTION BY A MAGISTRATE JUDGE Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c), Fed.R.Civ.P.73, and Local Rule 72.1, this Court has designated the Magistrate Judges of this District to conduct trials and otherwise dispose of any civil case that is filed in this Court. Your decision to consent, or not consent, to the referral of your case to a United States Magistrate Judge for trial and entry of a final judgment must be entirely voluntary. The judge or magistrate judge to whom the case has been assigned will not be informed of your decision unless all parties agree that the case may be referred to a magistrate judge for these specific purposes. A less than unanimous decision will not be communicated by this office to either the judge or magistrate judge. The consent form is available on the courts website at https://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/forms-and-applications.php (gkp)
Related: [-]
4 4 notice ADR Compliance Thu 01/02 4:06 PM
NOTICE TO COMPLY WITH PLAN FOR ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION (ADR): Pursuant to Section to 2.1 of the ADR Plan, all civil cases filed on or after Sept. 1, 2014, shall be referred automatically for ADR. For compliance requirements, refer to the ADR Plan at: http://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/pdf/content/ADRPlan.pdf (gkp)
Related: [-]
3 3 notice Notice LR 16.2 Thu 01/02 4:05 PM
NOTICE OF CASE TRACKING ASSIGNMENT PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE 16.2: Pursuant to Local Rule 16.2, this case has been assigned to the Standard track. http://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/pdf/content/LocalRules.pdf (gkp)
Related: [-]
2 2 1 pgs utility Add and Terminate Judges Thu 01/02 3:51 PM
Judge S. Thomas Anderson and Magistrate Judge Jon A. York added. (gkp)
Related: [-]
1 1 11 pgs cmp Complaint Thu 01/02 1:46 PM
COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 405 receipt number CTNWDC-4581868), filed by Trent J. McGregor.(Leonard, Terry)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet