California Southern District Court
Judge:Robert S Huie
Referred: Michael S Berg
Case #: 3:25-cv-00004
Nature of Suit890 Other Statutes - Other Statutory Actions
Cause47:0227(b)(3) Telephone Consumer Protection Act of 1991
Case Filed:Jan 02, 2025
Last checked: Sunday Feb 16, 2025 3:07 AM PST
Defendant
AT&T Mobility LLC
Plaintiff
Jack Rockwell
Represented By
Gerald D. Lane, Jr.
The Law Offices Of Jibrael S. Hindi, PLLC
contact info
TERMINATED PARTIES
Defendant
AT&T, Inc.
Terminated: 01/24/2025


Docket last updated: 1 hours ago
Tuesday, April 29, 2025
8 8 notice Notice of Voluntary Dismissal Tue 04/29 5:36 PM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Jack Rockwell without prejudice (Lane, Gerald)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 11, 2025
7 7 motion Compel Fri 04/11 12:01 PM
MOTION to Compel Arbitration and Stay Litigation by AT&T Mobility LLC.(Abdul-Rahim, Walid)Attorney Walid S. Abdul-Rahim added to party AT&T Mobility LLC (pty:dft)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration of Sharp ISO Motion to Compel,
Att: 2 Exhibit 1 to Sharp Dec,
Att: 3 Exhibit 2 to Sharp Dec
Monday, February 10, 2025
6 6 service Waiver of Service Executed Mon 02/10 2:39 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Jack Rockwell, as to AT&T Mobility LLC. (Lane, Gerald)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 27, 2025
5 5 service Summons Issued Mon 01/27 9:38 AM
Amended Summons Issued. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should print this summons and serve it in accordance with Rule 4, Fed.R.Civ.P and LR 4.1. (stn)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 24, 2025
4 4 cmp Amended Complaint Fri 01/24 2:18 PM
AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against AT&T Mobility LLC, filed by Jack Rockwell.New Summons Requested. (Lane, Gerald)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 06, 2025
3 3 order Order of Judge Transfer Mon 01/06 4:47 PM
MINUTE ORDER OF TRANSFER. Magistrate Judge Barbara Lynn Major is no longer assigned. Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge Michael S. Berg for all further proceedings. The new case number is 25-cv-0004-RSH-MSB.(no document attached) (stn)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 02, 2025
2 2 service Summons Issued Thu 01/02 12:49 PM
Summons Issued. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should print this summons and serve it in accordance with Rule 4, Fed.R.Civ.P and LR 4.1. (axi)
Related: [-]
1 1 13 pgs cmp Complaint Thu 01/02 12:46 PM
COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against AT&T, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 405 receipt number ACASDC-19471434.), filed by Jack Rockwell. The new case number is 3:25-cv-4-RSH-BLM. Judge Robert S. Huie and Magistrate Judge Barbara Lynn Major are assigned to the case. (Lane, Gerald)(axi)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet