Massachusetts District Court
Judge:Richard G Stearns
Case #: 1:25-cv-10007
Nature of Suit890 Other Statutes - Other Statutory Actions
Cause28:1441 Petition For Removal--Other Contract
Case Filed:Jan 02, 2025
Case in other court:Superior Court of Massachusetts, Suffolk County, 2484CV03147
Last checked: Sunday Feb 16, 2025 6:51 AM EST
Defendant
Board of Trustees of Teachers College, Columbia University
Represented By
Felicia H. Ellsworth
Wilmer Cutler Pickering Hale And Dorr Llp (bos)
contact info
Daryl J. Lapp
Troutman Pepper Locke LLP
contact info
Defendant
Lucy Calkins
Represented By
Felicia H. Ellsworth
Wilmer Cutler Pickering Hale And Dorr Llp (bos)
contact info
David G. Thomas
Greenberg Traurig, LLP
contact info
Angela Bunnell
Greenberg Traurig, LLP
contact info
Defendant
Irene Fountas
Represented By
Felicia H. Ellsworth
Wilmer Cutler Pickering Hale And Dorr Llp (bos)
contact info
Javier F. Flores
Dinsmore & Shohl LLP
contact info
Defendant
Fountas and Pinnell, LLC
Represented By
Felicia H. Ellsworth
Wilmer Cutler Pickering Hale And Dorr Llp (bos)
contact info
Javier F. Flores
Dinsmore & Shohl LLP
contact info
Defendant
HMH Education Company
Represented By
Felicia H. Ellsworth
Wilmer Cutler Pickering Hale And Dorr Llp (bos)
contact info
Andres R. O'Laughlin
Wilmer Hale LLP
contact info
Defendant
Gay Su Pinnell
Represented By
Felicia H. Ellsworth
Wilmer Cutler Pickering Hale And Dorr Llp (bos)
contact info
Javier F. Flores
Dinsmore & Shohl LLP
contact info
Defendant
Greenwood Publishing Group, LLC
Represented By
Felicia H. Ellsworth
Wilmer Cutler Pickering Hale And Dorr Llp (bos)
contact info
Andres R. O'Laughlin
Wilmer Hale LLP
contact info
Defendant
RWPN, LLC
Represented By
Felicia H. Ellsworth
Wilmer Cutler Pickering Hale And Dorr Llp (bos)
contact info
David G. Thomas
Greenberg Traurig, LLP
contact info
Angela Bunnell
Greenberg Traurig, LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
K.C.
Represented By
Benjamin D. Elga
Justice Catalyst Law
contact info
Janet Marie Herold
Justice Catalyst Law
contact info
Charles J. LaDuca
Cuneo Gilbert & Laduca, LLP
contact info
Amelia Caramadre
Kaplan & Grady, LLC
contact info
Michael J. Flannery
Cuneo Gilbert & Laduca, LLP
contact info
Sarah Grady
Kaplan & Grady
contact info
Ralph Michael Smith
Cuneo Gilbert & Laduca, LLP
contact info
Alexandra C. Warren
Cuneo Gilbert & Laduca LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
R.H.
Represented By
Benjamin D. Elga
Justice Catalyst Law
contact info
Janet Marie Herold
Justice Catalyst Law
contact info
Charles J. LaDuca
Cuneo Gilbert & Laduca, LLP
contact info
Amelia Caramadre
Kaplan & Grady, LLC
contact info
Michael J. Flannery
Cuneo Gilbert & Laduca, LLP
contact info
Sarah Grady
Kaplan & Grady
contact info
Alexandra C. Warren
Cuneo Gilbert & Laduca LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
S.C.
Represented By
Benjamin D. Elga
Justice Catalyst Law
contact info
Janet Marie Herold
Justice Catalyst Law
contact info
Charles J. LaDuca
Cuneo Gilbert & Laduca, LLP
contact info
Amelia Caramadre
Kaplan & Grady, LLC
contact info
Michael J. Flannery
Cuneo Gilbert & Laduca, LLP
contact info
Sarah Grady
Kaplan & Grady
contact info
Alexandra C. Warren
Cuneo Gilbert & Laduca LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 2 hours ago
Monday, May 12, 2025
68 68 order Order on Motion for Leave to File Document Mon 05/12 11:34 AM
Judge Richard G. Stearns: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting 67 Motion for Leave to File Document. Defendant Teachers College may file a reply of no more than ten (10) pages by May 21, 2025. (RGS, law3)
Related: [-]
67 67 motion Leave to File Document Mon 05/12 11:13 AM
Assented to MOTION for Leave to File Reply by Board of Trustees of Teachers College, Columbia University.(Lapp, Daryl)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 09, 2025
66 66 order Order on Motion for Leave to File Document Fri 05/09 1:03 PM
Judge Richard G. Stearns: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting65 Motion for Leave to File Document. Defendants may file a reply of no more than 20 pages by May 21, 2025. (RGS, law3)
Related: [-]
65 65 motion Leave to File Document Fri 05/09 12:17 PM
Assented to MOTION for Leave to File Reply to Plaintiffs' Opposition to Defendants' Rule 12 Motion by Lucy Calkins, Irene Fountas, Fountas and Pinnell, LLC, Greenwood Publishing Group, LLC, HMH Education Company, Gay Su Pinnell, RWPN, LLC.(Ellsworth, Felicia)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 07, 2025
64 64 respm Opposition to Motion Wed 05/07 3:48 PM
Opposition re57 MOTION to Dismiss filed by K.C., R.H., S.C.. (Warren, Alexandra)
Related: [-]
63 63 respm Opposition to Motion Wed 05/07 3:45 PM
Opposition re52 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM and, in the Alternative, Motion to Strike Class Allegations filed by K.C., R.H., S.C.. (Warren, Alexandra)
Related: [-]