Vermont District Court
Judge:Christina Reiss
Case #: 2:25-cv-00006
Nature of Suit485 Other Statutes - Telephone Consumer Protection Act
Cause47:227 Restrictions of Use of Telephone Equipment
Case Filed:Jan 02, 2025
Terminated:Mar 14, 2025
Last checked: Sunday Feb 16, 2025 6:22 AM EST
Defendant
Nathan Brown
Defendant
Walrus Rodeo LLC
Plaintiff
Tyler Baker
Represented By
Jennille Smith, Esq.
Landkey Consulting PLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 43 minutes ago
Friday, March 14, 2025
4 4 notice Notice of Dismissal (Case) Fri 03/14 9:57 AM
NOTICE of Dismissal Without Prejudice by Tyler Baker.(Smith, Jennille)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 02, 2025
3 3 service Summons Issued Thu 01/02 5:39 PM
ISSUED Summons as to Nathan Brown, Walrus Rodeo LLC.(law)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Summons as to Nathan Brown
2 2 utility Notice of Docket Entry Correction (PDF) Thu 01/02 5:38 PM
NOTICE OF DOCKET ENTRY CORRECTION re:1 Complaint filed by Tyler Baker. The JS 44 Civil Cover Sheet has been replaced to remove the instructional page. The corrected document is now attached to1 and this entry. (law)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Thu 01/02 4:46 PM
COMPLAINT against Nathan Brown, Walrus Rodeo LLC filed by Tyler Baker. ( Filing fee $ 405 receipt number AVTDC-2014323)(Smith, Jennille) (Attachment 4 replaced and text clarified on 1/2/2025) (law)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A,
Att: 2 Exhibit B,
Att: 3 Exhibit C,
Att: 4 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 5 Proposed Summons as to Walrus Rodeo LLC,
Att: 6 Proposed Summons as to Nathan Brown
utility Add and Terminate Judges Thu 01/02 4:49 PM
Case assigned to Chief District Judge Christina Reiss. (cdc)
Related: [-]