Nevada District Court
Judge:Richard F Boulware, II
Referred: Nancy J Koppe
Case #: 2:25-cv-00007
Nature of Suit440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights
Cause42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Case Filed:Jan 02, 2025
Last checked: Sunday Feb 16, 2025 3:49 AM PST
Defendant
Jacob Barr
Defendant
Justin Garcia
Defendant
Las Vegas Metropolitan Police Department
Defendant
Dalley Williams
Plaintiff
Lorraine Alvarado
2721417 Clark County Detention Center 330 S. Casino Center Blvd.
Las Vegas, NV 89101


Docket last updated: 05/14/2025 11:59 PM PDT
Friday, April 25, 2025
13 13 minord Minute Order Order on Motion to Extend/Shorten Time Fri 04/25 1:37 PM
MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Judge Richard F. Boulware, II on 4/25/25. Before the Court is the 12 Motion to Extend Time. Good cause being found, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the 12 Motion is GRANTED. Plaintiff shall have until May 23, 2025, to file an objection. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - HBG)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 22, 2025
12 12 motion Motion Extend/Shorten Time Wed 04/23 1:34 PM
MOTION to Extend Time (First Request) re11 Report and Recommendation, by Plaintiff Lorraine Alvarado. Responses due by 5/6/2025. (ALZ)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 08, 2025
11 11 motion Report and Recommendation Wed 04/09 12:00 PM
REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION. The undersigned RECOMMENDS that Defendant Las Vegas Metropolitan Police Department be DISMISSED without further leave to amend and that the case proceed instead only against Defendants Williams, Barr, and Garcia on Plaintiff's excessive force claim. Objections to R&R due by 4/22/2025. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 4/8/2025. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ALZ)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 04, 2025
10 10 service Summons Returned Unexecuted Mon 04/07 4:55 PM
SUMMONS Returned Unexecuted by Lorraine Alvarado as to Jacob Barr, Justin Garcia, Dalley Williams re7 Summons Issued. (ALZ)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 24, 2025
9 9 cmp Complaint Amended Tue 03/25 3:02 PM
AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Jacob Barr, Justin Garcia, Las Vegas Metropolitan Police Department, Dalley Williams by Lorraine Alvarado. No changes to parties. (CAH)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 24, 2025
8 8 3 pgs order Order ~Util - Add and Terminate Parties Mon 02/24 4:37 PM
ORDER. IT IS SO ORDERED that Defendant Las Vegas Metropolitan Police Department is DISMISSED from the case with leave to amend. Plaintiff will have until March 24, 2025, to file an Amended Complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 2/24/2025. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ALZ)
Related: [-]
7 7 service Summons Issued Mon 02/24 4:03 PM
SUMMONS ISSUED as to Jacob Barr, Justin Garcia, Dalley Williams re6 Complaint. (ALZ)
Related: [-]
6 6 cmp Complaint Mon 02/24 3:59 PM
COMPLAINT against Jacob Barr, Justin Garcia, Las Vegas Metropolitan Police Department, Dalley Williams by Lorraine Alvarado. Certificate of Interested Parties due by 3/6/2025. Proof of service due by 5/25/2025. (cc: USM - ALZ)
Related: [-]
5 5 4 pgs order Order Mon 02/24 3:56 PM
ORDER. IT IS ORDERED that: Plaintiff's excessive force claim against Defendants Williams, Barr, and Garcia may proceed past the screening phase. The Clerk's Office is INSTRUCTED to file Plaintiffs complaint (Docket No. 1 -1) on the docket. The Clerk of the Court shall issue summons for Defendants Dalley Williams, Jacob Barr, and Justin Garcia, and deliver the same to the U.S. Marshal for service. Plaintiff shall have twenty days in which to furnish the U.S. Marshal with the required Form USM-285. Pursuant to Rule 4(m) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, service must be accomplished within 90 days from the date this order is entered. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 2/24/2025. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - cc: USM - ALZ)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 22, 2025
4 4 misc Receipt Payment Thu 01/23 1:48 PM
RECEIPT of Payment: $ 29.13, receipt number 200012800 (ALZ)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 03, 2025
3 3 2 pgs order Order on Motion/Application to Proceed In Forma Pauperis Mon 01/06 2:55 PM
ORDER. Plaintiff's1 Application to Proceed in Forma Pauperis without having to prepay the full filing fee is GRANTED. However, Plaintiff shall be required to pay an initial installment fee in the amount of $29.13 toward the full filing fee of $350. Plaintiff shall have the designated fee sent to the Clerk's Office no later than February 7, 2025. Failure to do so may result in dismissal of this action. Furthermore, even if this action is dismissed, the full filing fee must still be paid pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 1915(b)(2). Plaintiff is permitted to maintain this action to conclusion without the necessity of prepayment of any additional fees or costs or the giving of security therefor. This Order granting in forma pauperis status shall not extend to the issuance and/or service of subpoenas at government expense. The Clerk's Office shall provide Plaintiff with two copies of this Order. Plaintiff is ordered to make the necessary arrangements to have one copy of this Order attached to the check in the amount of the designated fee. The Clerk's Office shall send a copy of this Order to the attention of the inmate accounts department at Clark County Detention Center, 3330 South Casino Center Boulevard, Las Vegas, Nevada 89101. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 1915(b)(2), Clark County Detention Center shall forward to the Clerk of the United States District Court, District of Nevada, twenty percent of the preceding month's deposits to Plaintiffs inmate trust account (in the months that the account exceeds $10.00) until the full $350 filing fee has been paid for this action. The Clerk's Office shall provide a copy of this Order to the Finance Division of the Clerk's Office. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 1/3/2025.(Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - cc: CCDC/Finance - ALZ)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Order
2 2 notice Advisory Letter Pro Se non-habeas Fri 01/03 1:23 PM
ADVISORY LETTER to litigant. (ALZ)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 02, 2025
1 1 motion Motion/Application Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis Fri 01/03 11:46 AM
MOTION/APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff Lorraine Alvarado.(ALZ)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Complaint
utility Assign Judges in Civil Case Thu 01/02 3:46 PM
Case randomly assigned to Judge Richard F. Boulware, II and Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe. (AMMi)
Related: [-]