Idaho District Court
Judge:Amanda K Brailsford
Case #: 1:25-cv-00002
Nature of Suit550 Prisoner Petitions - Habeas Corpus - Civil Rights
Cause42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Case Filed:Jan 02, 2025
Defendant
Ada County Commissioners Department
Defendant
Ada County Jail Investigator Deputy Hanson
Defendant
Alex Adams
Defendant
Ashley Dowell
Defendant
Brad Little
Defendant
Brandon Wolf
Defendant
Dave Jespen
Defendant
Idaho State Police Department
Defendant
Jan Bennits
Defendant
Josh Hurwit
Defendant
Josh Tewalt
Defendant
Matthew Clifford
Defendant
Phil McGrane
Defendant
Ryan O'niel
Defendant
Steven Bartlett
Defendant
Steven Hippler
Defendant
Teresa Jones
Plaintiff
Amy Rose Ingram Bonning

GPO Apr 07 2025
INITIAL REVIEW ORDER BY SCREENING JUDGE - The Complaint fails to state a claim upon which relief may be granted. Plaintiff has twenty-eight (28) days within which to file an amended complaint. If Plaintiff does not file a timely amended complaint, this case may be dismissed with prejudice and without further notice for failure to state a claim upon which relief may be granted, failure to prosecute, or failure to comply with a Court order. See 28 U.S.C. §§ 1915 and 1915A; Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(b). Because an amended complaint is required for Plaintiff to proceed, Plaintiffs Emergency Motion for Appointment of Counsel (Dkt. 7) is DENIED. Because an amended complaint is required for Plaintiff to proceed, Plaintiffs Emergency Motion for Injunction (Dkt. 8) is DENIED AS MOOT. Signed by Judge Amanda K Brailsford. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (lm)

Docket last updated: 05/22/2025 11:59 PM MDT
Monday, April 21, 2025
11 11 cmp Amended Complaint Mon 04/21 1:08 PM
FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT against 3 Unnamed Wadda Workers, Director of Wadda Farms, Teresa Jones, Josh Tewalt, filed by All Plaintiffs.(lm)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Envelope
10 10 motion Amend/Correct Mon 04/21 1:02 PM
MOTION to Review First Amended Complaint by Plaintiff Amy Rose Ingram Bonning. Responses due by 5/12/2025(lm)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Envelope
Monday, April 07, 2025
9 9 14 pgs order Memorandum Decision Order ~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings Mon 04/07 8:56 AM
INITIAL REVIEW ORDER BY SCREENING JUDGE - The Complaint fails to state a claim upon which relief may be granted. Plaintiff has twenty-eight (28) days within which to file an amended complaint. If Plaintiff does not file a timely amended complaint, this case may be dismissed with prejudice and without further notice for failure to state a claim upon which relief may be granted, failure to prosecute, or failure to comply with a Court order. See 28 U.S.C. §§ 1915 and 1915A; Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(b). Because an amended complaint is required for Plaintiff to proceed, Plaintiffs Emergency Motion for Appointment of Counsel (Dkt.7 ) is DENIED. Because an amended complaint is required for Plaintiff to proceed, Plaintiffs Emergency Motion for Injunction (Dkt.8 ) is DENIED AS MOOT. Signed by Judge Amanda K Brailsford. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (lm)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 26, 2025
8 8 motion Preliminary Injunction Wed 03/26 12:41 PM
MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by Plaintiff Amy Rose Ingram Bonning. Responses due by 4/16/2025(jd)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Envelope
Wednesday, February 12, 2025
7 7 motion Appoint Counsel Wed 02/12 3:15 PM
EMERGENCY MOTION to Appoint Counsel by Plaintiff Amy Rose Ingram Bonning. Responses due by 3/5/2025(lm)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Envelope
Thursday, January 16, 2025
6 6 misc Letter Thu 01/16 12:01 PM
Letter from Amy Bonning - Copy of the complaint was mailed to the plaintiff(lm)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Envelope
Monday, January 13, 2025
5 5 3 pgs order Order Directing Prisoner Payment Mon 01/13 9:46 AM
ORDER FOR IN FORMA PAUPERIS STATUS AND WITHDRAWAL OF INMATE FILING FEE FROM JAIL TRUST ACCOUNT - Plaintiffs Application for Leave to Proceed in Forma Pauperis (Dkt.1 ) is GRANTED. The Sheriff of Ada County or a designee will collect from Plaintiffs inmate trust account the $350.00 balance of the filing fee and will forward payments to the Clerk of Court in accordance with 28 U.S.C. § 1915(b). The Clerk of Court is directed to serve a copy of this order on the Sheriff of Ada County as follows: Matt Clifford, Ada County Sheriff Attn: Inmate Accounts 7200 Barrister Dr. Boise, Idaho 83704. (Notice sent to Finance). Signed by Judge Amanda K Brailsford. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (lm)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 02, 2025
4 4 2 pgs order Order of Conditional Filing Thu 01/02 4:28 PM
ORDER of Conditional Filing - caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (jd)
Related: [-]
3 3 cmp Complaint Thu 01/02 4:24 PM
COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Amy Rose Ingram Bonning.(jd)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Cover Letter,
Att: 2 Exhibit,
Att: 3 Exhibit,
Att: 4 Envelope
2 2 misc Statement of Prisoner Trust Fund Account Thu 01/02 4:22 PM
Statement of Prisoner Trust Fund Account, This is a sealed document. re1 APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Amy Rose Ingram Bonning. (jd)
Related: [-]
1 1 motion Proceed In Forma Pauperis Thu 01/02 4:21 PM
APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff Amy Rose Ingram Bonning. Responses due by 1/23/2025. (jd)
Related: [-]