Georgia Northern District Court
Judge:Richard W Story
Case #: 2:25-cv-00002
Nature of Suit110 Contract - Insurance
Cause28:1335 Interpleader Action
Case Filed:Jan 02, 2025
Terminated:May 08, 2025
Last checked: Sunday Feb 16, 2025 6:38 AM EST
Defendant
Rhonda Mechelle Tipton
Represented By
Douglas W. McDonald, Sr.
Mcdonald, Cody & Cook, LLC
contact info
Defendant
Paige N. Yarber
Plaintiff
Southern Farm Bureau Life Insurance Company
Represented By
Aaron Edward Pohlmann
Womble Bond Dickinson (us) Llp-Atl
contact info


Docket last updated: 5 hours ago
Thursday, May 08, 2025
misc Clerks Entry of Dismissal Thu 05/08 8:16 AM
Clerk's Entry of Dismissal APPROVING16 Stipulation of Dismissal pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P.41(a)(1)(A)(ii). Each party shall bear her/its own attorney's fees and costs. (ddm)
Related: [-]
utility Terminate Civil Case Thu 05/08 8:17 AM
Civil Case Terminated. (ddm)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 07, 2025
16 16 misc Stipulation of Dismissal Wed 05/07 4:50 PM
STIPULATION of Dismissal by Southern Farm Bureau Life Insurance Company. (Pohlmann, Aaron)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 02, 2025
15 15 answer Answer to Amended Complaint Wed 04/02 12:04 PM
ANSWER to10 Amended Complaint by Paige N. Yarber. Discovery ends on 9/2/2025.(Hoover, Michael)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 25, 2025
14 14 service Waiver of Service Executed Tue 03/25 1:51 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Rhonda Mechelle Tipton. (McDonald, Douglas)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 19, 2025
13 13 order Order on Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice Wed 03/19 10:45 AM
ORDER granting12 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice filed by Michael J. Hoover. Signed by Judge Richard W. Story on 03/19/2025. If the applicant does not have CM/ECF access in the Northern District of Georgia already, they must request access at http://pacer.gov. If they have electronically filed in this district in a previous case, please omit this step.(ddm)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 18, 2025
misc Approval of Application for Admission PHV Tue 03/18 10:32 AM
APPROVAL by Clerks Office re:12 APPLICATION for Admission of Michael J. Hoover Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 100, receipt number AGANDC-14147962). Attorney Michael J. Hoover added appearing on behalf of Paige N. Yarber. E-filing access may be requested after an order granting the application is entered. (mh)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 17, 2025
12 12 motion Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice Mon 03/17 3:05 PM
APPLICATION for Admission of Michael J. Hoover Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 100, receipt number AGANDC-14147962).by Paige N. Yarber. (Freed, Gary)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 14, 2025
11 11 service Certificate of Service Fri 03/14 4:20 PM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Rhonda Mechelle Tipton (McDonald, Douglas)
Related: [-]
10 10 cmp Amended Complaint Fri 03/14 4:17 PM
Second AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by Southern Farm Bureau Life Insurance Company.(Pohlmann, Aaron)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A,
Att: 2 Exhibit B,
Att: 3 Exhibit C,
Att: 4 Exhibit D,
Att: 5 Exhibit E
9 9 service Certificate of Service Fri 03/14 3:57 PM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Rhonda Mechelle Tipton (McDonald, Douglas)
Related: [-]
8 8 service Waiver of Service Executed Fri 03/14 11:36 AM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Rhonda Mechelle Tipton. Rhonda Mechelle Tipton waiver mailed on 3/14/2025, answer due 5/13/2025. (McDonald, Douglas)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 11, 2025
7 7 notice Notice (Other) Tue 03/11 3:37 PM
NOTICE of Leave of Absence filed by Aaron E. Pohlmann, counsel for Southern Farm Bureau Life Insurance Company, for the dates of April 4, 2025 - April 14, 2025. (Pohlmann, Aaron) Modified on 3/11/2025 (ddm)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 07, 2025
6 6 service Waiver of Service Executed Fri 03/07 11:26 AM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Southern Farm Bureau Life Insurance Company. Paige N. Yarber waiver mailed on 3/6/2025, answer due 5/5/2025. (Pohlmann, Aaron)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 14, 2025
5 5 8 pgs cmp Amended Complaint Fri 02/14 5:07 PM
AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by Southern Farm Bureau Life Insurance Company.(Pohlmann, Aaron)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A,
Att: 2 Exhibit B,
Att: 3 Exhibit C,
Att: 4 Exhibit D
Wednesday, January 29, 2025
4 4 2 pgs notice Notice of Appearance Wed 01/29 1:16 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Douglas W. McDonald, Sr on behalf of Rhonda Mechelle Tipton (McDonald, Douglas)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 03, 2025
3 3 notice Notice of Filing Fri 01/03 11:21 AM
COURT NOTICE OF FILING: Standing Order Regarding Civil Litigation by Judge Richard W. Story. (sk)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 02, 2025
2 2 misc Certificate of Interested Persons/Corporate Disclosure Statement Thu 01/02 3:47 PM
Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement by Southern Farm Bureau Life Insurance Company identifying Other Affiliate Arkansas Farm Bureau Investment Corporation, Other Affiliate Florida Farm Bureau Holding Corporation, Other Affiliate Kentucky Farm Bureau Investment Corporation, Other Affiliate Louisiana Farm Bureau Investment Corporation, Other Affiliate Mississippi Farm Bureau Investment Corporation, Other Affiliate North Carolina Farm Bureau Investment Corporation, Other Affiliate South Carolina Farm Bureau Investment Corporation, Other Affiliate Texas Farm Bureau Investment Corporation, Other Affiliate Georgia Farm Bureau Federation Holding Co., Inc., Other Affiliate Virginia Farm Bureau Holding Corporation for Southern Farm Bureau Life Insurance Company. (Pohlmann, Aaron)
Related: [-]
1 1 7 pgs cmp Complaint Thu 01/02 3:01 PM
COMPLAINT filed by Southern Farm Bureau Life Insurance Company. (Filing fee $405, receipt number AGANDC-13961255)(rsg) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A,
Att: 2 Exhibit B,
Att: 3 Exhibit C,
Att: 4 Exhibit D,
Att: 5 Civil Cover Sheet