Texas Western District Court
Case #: 2:24-cr-03212
Case Filed:Dec 04, 2024
Last checked: Friday Jan 03, 2025 1:16 AM CST
Defendant
Estin Cole West (1)
Represented By
Sostenes Mireles, II
Sostenes Mireles Ii Law & Associates
contact info
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
Nallely Duarte
Doj-Usao
contact info

GPO Mar 24 2025
FINDINGS OF FACT AND RECOMMENDATION on felony guilty plea before the United States Magistrate Judge Joseph A Cordova as to Estin Cole West. Signed by Judge Joseph A Cordova. (vg)
GPO Apr 15 2025
ORDER accepting re 25 Findings of Fact on Plea as to Estin Cole West. Guilty plea accepted. Signed by Chief Judge Alia Moses. (ah2)

Docket last updated: 01/03/2025 1:25 AM CST
Wednesday, December 04, 2024
3 3 SEALED INDICTMENT Related [+] with Notice of Forfeiture included as to Estin Cole West. Unredacted document sealed pursuant to E-Government Act of 2002 as to Estin Cole West (1) count(s) 1. (bot2)
Related: [-] dacted Version
5 5 Personal Data Sheet (SEALED) as to Estin Cole West (bot2)
Related: [-]