California Central District Court
Judge:Margo A Rocconi
Case #: 2:25-cv-00038
Nature of Suit190 Contract - Other Contract
Cause28:1441 Notice of Removal -- Other Contract
Case Filed:Jan 02, 2025
Last checked: Sunday Feb 16, 2025 3:33 AM PST
Defendant
Does
Defendant
Porsche Cars North America, Inc.
Represented By
Richard L Stuhlbarg
Bowman And Brooke LLP
contact info
Jason Jacobs
Bowman And Brooke LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Brian Matthew Ludlow
Represented By
Kevin Y Jacobson
Quill And Arrow LLP
contact info
Joshua Kohanoff
Quill And Arrow LLP
contact info
Gregory Sogoyan
Quill And Arrow LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 1 hours ago
Monday, March 31, 2025
13 13 misc Disclosure Mon 03/31 5:13 PM
INITIAL DISCLOSURE filed by Defendant Porsche Cars North America, Inc. (Jacobs, Jason)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 28, 2025
12 12 order Order/Referral to ADR (No 3) (Private Mediator) (ADR-12) Fri 02/28 2:03 PM
ORDER/REFERRAL to ADR Procedure No 3 by Magistrate Judge Margo A. Rocconi. Case ordered to a private mediator based upon a stipulation of the parties or by the court order. ADR Proceeding to be held no later than 10/17/2025. (vam)
Related: [-]
11 11 order Scheduling Order ~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings ~Util - Terminate Hearings Fri 02/28 1:55 PM
CIVIL TRIAL SCHEDULING ORDER by Magistrate Judge Margo A. Rocconi. Last date to conduct settlement conference is 10/17/2025. Pretrial Conference is set for 1/21/2026 11:00 AM. Jury Trial is set for 2/9/2026 at 9:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Margo A. Rocconi. SEE ORDER FOR FURTHER DETAILS. (vam)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 27, 2025
10 10 misc Statement Thu 02/27 6:01 PM
STATEMENT regarding Schedule Conference filed by Plaintiff Brian Matthew Ludlow filed jointly re: Order,,9 , Order,8 . (Sogoyan, Gregory)
Related: [-]
9 9 1 pgs order Order Thu 02/27 3:24 PM
(In Chambers) ORDER RE: SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Magistrate Judge Margo A. Rocconi. The Court is in receipt of the parties' Joint Rule 26(f) Report. ECF Docket No. (Dkt.) [7.] The Court is inclined to issue a scheduling order without a scheduling conference. Accordingly, the parties shall file a joint statement on or before Wednesday, February 26, 2025 at noon, stating (a) whether any party would like the Court to hold a telephonic scheduling conference hearing; and (b) if so, what issues they seek to have resolved at the hearing. (vam)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 19, 2025
8 8 1 pgs order Order Wed 02/19 11:23 AM
(In Chambers) ORDER RE: SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Magistrate Judge Margo A. Rocconi. The Court is inclined to issue a scheduling order without a scheduling conference. Accordingly, the parties shall file a joint statement on or before Wednesday, February 26, 2025 at noon, stating (a) whether any party would like the Court to hold a telephonic scheduling conference hearing; and (b) if so, what issues they seek to have resolved at the hearing. (vam)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 18, 2025
7 7 misc Joint Report Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan Tue 02/18 6:20 PM
JOINT REPORT Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan ; estimated length of trial 4-5 days, filed by Plaintiff Brian Matthew Ludlow..(Sogoyan, Gregory)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Schedule of Pretrial and Trial Dates
Monday, January 27, 2025
6 6 order Scheduling Order ~Util - Set/Reset Hearings Mon 01/27 3:38 PM
ORDER SETTING TELEPHONIC SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Magistrate Judge Margo A. Rocconi. The scheduling conference is set for March 5, 2025 at 11:30 a.m. and will be held telephonically via a dial-in number that will be circulated prior to the scheduling conference. The Joint Rule 26(f) Report, which shall be filed not later than 14 days before the scheduling conference. SEE ORDER FOR DETAILS. (vam)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 22, 2025
5 5 textonly MJDAP Opt-Out Expired Wed 01/22 11:10 AM
The period to decline consent to a magistrate judge has expired. No timely declination of consent has been received by the Court. Each party is deemed to have knowingly and voluntarily consented to proceed before a Magistrate Judge for all purposes pursuant to the Local Rules. The case shall now proceed before a Magistrate Judge for all purposes. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (vam)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 09, 2025
4 4 answer Answer to Complaint Thu 01/09 5:42 PM
ANSWER to Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening),,1 DEFENDANT PORSCHE CARS NORTH AMERICA, INC.S ANSWER TO PLAINTIFF BRIAN MATTHEW LUDLOWS COMPLAINT filed by Porsche Cars North America, Inc. Porsche Cars North America, Inc..(Stuhlbarg, Richard)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 06, 2025
3 3 notice Deficiency in Attorney Case Opening Mon 01/06 11:07 AM
NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Attorney Case Opening RE: Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening),,1 . The following error(s) was found: Other error(s) with document(s): Attachment(s): # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 4 Supplement Notice of Interested Parties. The document(s) should have been filed separately using their true events. You are not required to take any action to correct this deficiency unless the Court so directs. (sh)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Notice of Assignment to U.S. Magistrate Judge and Declination of Consent CV-20B optional html form Mon 01/06 11:03 AM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to a U.S. Magistrate Judge and Declination of Consent. This case has been randomly assigned to Magistrate Judge Margo A. Rocconi. (sh)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 02, 2025
1 1 notice Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening) Thu 01/02 6:26 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Los Angeles Superior Court of California, case number 24VECV05755 Receipt No: ACACDC-38847117 - Fee: $405, filed by Defendant, Porsche Cars North America, Inc. Porsche Cars North America, Inc.. (Attorney Richard L Stuhlbarg added to party Porsche Cars North America, Inc.(pty:dft))(Stuhlbarg, Richard)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Exhibit Exhibit A. Complaint & Summons,
Att: 3 Exhibit Exhibit B. Notice of Removal to State Court,
Att: 4 Supplement Notice of Interested Parties