California Eastern District Court
Judge:Dennis M Cota
Case #: 2:24-cv-03791
Nature of Suit863 Social Security - DIWC/DIWW (405(g))
Cause42:205 Denial Social Security Benefits
Case Filed:Dec 30, 2024
Last checked: Friday Jan 03, 2025 7:04 PM PST
Defendant
Commissioner of Social Security
Woodlawn, MD 21235
Represented By
Social Security Admin- SS E-Service
Office Of General Counsel
contact info
US Attorney's Office- SS E-Service
contact info
Plaintiff
Jacqueline L. Davis
Represented By
John David Metsker
The Metsker Law Firm
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/07/2025 11:59 PM PDT
Friday, May 02, 2025
18 18 misc Designation of Counsel Fri 05/02 3:25 PM
DESIGNATION of COUNSEL FOR SERVICE. Added attorney Edmund (Jack) Darcher, GOVT for Commissioner of Social Security, attorney Mary Tsai, GOVT terminated (Darcher, Edmund)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 30, 2025
17 17 misc Clerk's Notice Reassigning Case Wed 04/30 11:09 AM
CLERK'S NOTICE REASSIGNING CASE (TEXT ONLY). Pursuant to the 16 Minute Order of Recusal, this case is REASSIGNED to Magistrate Judge Dennis M. Cota for all further proceeding. Magistrate Judge Chi Soo Kim no longer associated with the case. The new case number is: 2:24-cv-3791 DMC (SS). (Deputy Clerk JJD)
Related: [-]
16 16 order Minute Order Wed 04/30 9:52 AM
MINUTE ORDER issued by Courtroom Deputy for Magistrate Judge Chi Soo Kim on 4/30/2025: Due to Judge Kim's recusal from this case, the Clerk's Office is directed to reassign this case to another Magistrate Judge. (Text Only Entry). (Deputy Clerk AW)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 29, 2025
15 15 notice Notice of Lodging Social Security Administrative Transcript Tue 04/29 2:11 PM
NOTICE OF LODGING SOCIAL SECURITY ADMINISTRATIVE TRANSCRIPT IN ELECTRONIC FORMAT by Commissioner of Social Security. Attorney Boesch, Victoria L. added.(Boesch, Victoria)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Certification Page,
Att: 2 Court Transcript Index,
Att: 3 Documents Related to Administrative Process,
Att: 4 Payment Documents,
Att: 5 Jurisdictional Documents,
Att: 6 Non-Disability Related Development,
Att: 7 Disability Related Development,
Att: 8 Medical Records Part 1,
Att: 9 Medical Records Part 2,
Att: 10 Administrative Record in OCR Format (Pages 1-1601 ,
Att: 11 Administrative Record in OCR Format (Pages 1602-1956)
Tuesday, April 22, 2025
14 14 2 pgs order Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief Tue 04/22 10:42 AM
ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Chi Soo Kim on 4/22/2025 GRANTING13 Motion to Expunge and Replace Certified Administrative Record. The Clerk is DIRECTED to delete 8 Notice of Lodging and the Commissioner of Social Security is DIRECTED to refile the Administrative Record in its entirety. (Deputy Clerk JJD)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 21, 2025
13 13 misc Stipulation and Proposed Order Mon 04/21 5:05 PM
STIPULATION and PROPOSED ORDER expunge and replace CAR by Commissioner of Social Security. (Tsai, Mary)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 15, 2025
12 12 order Stipulation and Order ~Util - 1 Set/Reset Deadlines and Hearings Tue 04/15 11:05 AM
STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Chi Soo Kim on 4/15/2025 EXTENDING the deadline for the defendant to respond to the9 Motion for Summary Judgment to 5/23/25. (Deputy Clerk AMW)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 14, 2025
11 11 misc Stipulation and Proposed Order Mon 04/14 12:04 PM
STIPULATION and PROPOSED ORDER extension of time to file responsive brief by Commissioner of Social Security. (Tsai, Mary)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 11, 2025
10 10 misc Designation of Counsel Fri 04/11 9:28 AM
DESIGNATION of COUNSEL FOR SERVICE. Added attorney Mary Tsai, GOVT for Commissioner of Social Security, attorney Justin Lane Martin, GOVT terminated (Tsai, Mary)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 02, 2025
9 9 motion Summary Judgment Wed 04/02 10:05 PM
MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT by Jacqueline L. Davis. (Metsker, John)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 03, 2025
8 8 notice Notice of Lodging Social Security Administrative Transcript Mon 03/03 2:02 PM
NOTICE OF LODGING SOCIAL SECURITY ADMINISTRATIVE TRANSCRIPT IN ELECTRONIC FORMAT by Commissioner of Social Security. Attorney Olsen, Edward Alan added.(Olsen, Edward)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Certification Page,
Att: 2 Court Transcript Index,
Att: 3 Documents Related to Administrative Process,
Att: 4 Payment Documents,
Att: 5 Jurisdictional Documents,
Att: 6 Non Disability Related Development,
Att: 7 Disability Related Development,
Att: 8 Medical Records Part 1,
Att: 9 Medical Records Part 2,
Att: 10 Administrative Record in OCR Format
Wednesday, January 15, 2025
7 7 order Consent Minute Order Wed 01/15 4:46 PM
CONSENT MINUTE ORDER (Text Only) signed by Chief Judge Troy L. Nunley on 1/15/2025, Nunc Pro Tunc 1/10/2025: All parties have consented to the jurisdiction of a United States Magistrate Judge for all further proceedings in this action, including trial and entry of judgment, pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c)(1). Accordingly, this Court AUTHORIZES the action to proceed before the assigned United States Magistrate Judge for all further proceedings including trial and entry of judgment. All further papers filed in this action shall bear the case number 2:24-cv-03791-CSK (SS). (Deputy Clerk RRB)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 10, 2025
6 6 misc Consent/Decline of U.S. Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Fri 01/10 3:42 PM
CONSENT/DECLINE of U.S. Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1), this document is restricted to attorneys and court staff only. Judges do not have access to view this document and will be informed of a party's response only if all parties have consented to the referral. (Martin, Justin)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 02, 2025
5 5 service Summons Thu 01/02 1:07 PM
AMENDED SUMMONS ISSUED as to *Commissioner of Social Security* with answer to complaint due within *60* days. Attorney *John David Metsker* *The Metsker Law Firm* *P.O. Box 590881* *San Francisco, CA 94159*. [Served by Clerk on Commissioner via E-Service Agreement] (Deputy Clerk KEZ)
Related: [-]
4 4 misc Consent/Decline of U.S. Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Thu 01/02 10:09 AM
CONSENT/DECLINE of U.S. Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1), this document is restricted to attorneys and court staff only. Judges do not have access to view this document and will be informed of a party's response only if all parties have consented to the referral. (Metsker, John)
Related: [-]
3 3 order Social Security New Case Documents for MJ as Presider Thu 01/02 9:07 AM
SCHEDULING ORDER and ORDER RE CONSENT in SOCIAL SECURITY APPEAL. Consent or Decline due by 4/7/2025. [Served by Clerk on Commissioner via E-Service Agreement] (Deputy Clerk KEZ)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Order re Consent,
Att: 2 Consent Form
2 2 service Summons Thu 01/02 9:06 AM
SUMMONS ISSUED as to *Commissioner of Social Security* with answer to complaint due within *90* days. Attorney *John David Metsker* *The Metsker Law Firm* *P.O. Box 590881* *San Francisco, CA 94159*. [Served by Clerk on Commissioner via E-Service Agreement] (Deputy Clerk KEZ)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 30, 2024
1 1 SOCIAL SECURITY COMPLAINT against Commissioner of Social Security by Jacqueline L. Davis. Attorney Metsker, John David added. (Filing fee $ 405, receipt number ACAEDC-11949684) (Metsker, John)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet