California Eastern District Court
Judge:Dena M Coggins
Referred: Carolyn K Delaney
Case #: 2:25-cv-00028
Nature of Suit440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights
Cause28:1983 Civil Rights
Case Filed:Jan 02, 2025
Last checked: Sunday Feb 16, 2025 3:03 AM PST
Defendant
Jenni Bentley
Defendant
Max Castellanes
Defendant
Daniella Chapman
Defendant
General Manager Homecoming at CreekSide Apartments
Defendant
John Graff
Defendant
Karissa Halor
Defendant
Dave Helgestad
Defendant
Lewis Management Corp.
Defendant
Cameron Meglashan
Defendant
Doug V. Mull
Defendant
Britney Muniz
Defendant
Stephanie Nakken
Plaintiff
Henry Ortiz
9088 Salmon Falls Drive
Sacramento, CA 95826

GPO Jan 10 2025
ORDER signed by District Judge Dena M. Coggins on 1/10/2025 REFERRING this action to United States Magistrate Judge Sean C. Riordan for issuance of findings and recommendations. (Deputy Clerk RRB)
GPO Jan 16 2025
ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Sean C. Riordan on 1/16/2025 RECUSING himself from this case. Magistrate Judge Sean C. Riordan recused. Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney for all further proceedings. The new case number is: 2:25-cv-0028 DC SCR. (Deputy Clerk VLK)

Docket last updated: 05/02/2025 11:59 PM PDT
Tuesday, February 25, 2025
9 9 1 pgs order Order ~Util - 1 Set/Reset Deadlines and Hearings Order on Motion for Extension of Time Tue 02/25 8:56 AM
ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 2/24/2025 GRANTING8 Motion for Extension of Time. Plaintiff has 90 days from the date of this order to file a First Amended Complaint. (Deputy Clerk OML)
Related: [-]
service Service by Mail Tue 02/25 8:56 AM
SERVICE BY MAIL:9 Order served on Henry Ortiz. (Deputy Clerk OML)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 20, 2025
8 8 motion Extension of Time Fri 02/21 8:03 AM
MOTION for EXTENSION OF TIME to File First Amended Complaint by Henry Ortiz. (Deputy Clerk OML)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 18, 2025
7 7 2 pgs order Order Adopting Findings and Recommendations Order on Motion for Preliminary Injunction Tue 02/18 11:15 AM
ORDER signed by District Judge Dena M. Coggins on 2/18/2025 ADOPTING6 Findings and Recommendations in Full, DENYING3 Motion for Injunctive Relief, and REFERRING this matter back to the assigned magistrate judge for further proceedings. (Deputy Clerk AMW)
Related: [-]
service Service by Mail Tue 02/18 11:24 AM
SERVICE BY MAIL:7 Order Adopting Findings and Recommendations served on Henry Ortiz. (Deputy Clerk AMW)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 22, 2025
service Service by Mail Wed 01/22 1:25 PM
SERVICE BY MAIL:6 Order and Findings and Recommendations served on Henry Ortiz. (Deputy Clerk AS)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 21, 2025
6 6 motion Findings and Recommendations Order Order on Motion to Proceed In Forma Pauperis Tue 01/21 12:29 PM
ORDER and FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 1/21/25, GRANTING2 plaintiff's motion to proceed in forma pauperis and DISMISSING with leave to amend1 plaintiff's complaint. Within 30 days of the date of this order, plaintiff shall file either an amended complaint or a notice of voluntary dismissal. It is RECOMMENDED that plaintiff's3 petition for injunctive relief be denied. Matter REFERRED to District Judge Dena M. Coggins. Within 14 days after being served with these findings and recommendations, plaintiff may file written objections with the court and serve a copy on all parties. (Deputy Clerk AS)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 16, 2025
5 5 1 pgs order Order of Recusal Thu 01/16 11:23 AM
ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Sean C. Riordan on 1/16/2025 RECUSING himself from this case. Magistrate Judge Sean C. Riordan recused. Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney for all further proceedings. The new case number is: 2:25-cv-0028 DC SCR. (Deputy Clerk VLK)
Related: [-]
service Service by Mail Thu 01/16 11:24 AM
SERVICE BY MAIL:5 Order of Recusal, served on Henry Ortiz. (Deputy Clerk VLK)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 10, 2025
4 4 1 pgs order Order Fri 01/10 12:40 PM
ORDER signed by District Judge Dena M. Coggins on 1/10/2025 REFERRING this action to United States Magistrate Judge Sean C. Riordan for issuance of findings and recommendations. (Deputy Clerk RRB)
Related: [-]
service Service by Mail Fri 01/10 12:41 PM
SERVICE BY MAIL:4 Order served on Henry Ortiz. (Deputy Clerk RRB)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 08, 2025
3 3 motion Preliminary Injunction Fri 01/10 8:46 AM
Petition for Injunctive Relief by Henry Ortiz. (Deputy Clerk VLK)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 03, 2025
misc IFP Application Fri 01/03 10:37 AM
APPLICATION TO PROCEED IFP filed - Court Action Required. (Deputy Clerk KEZ)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 02, 2025
2 2 motion In Forma Pauperis Fri 01/03 10:36 AM
MOTION to PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS by Henry Ortiz. (Deputy Clerk KEZ)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Fri 01/03 10:35 AM
COMPLAINT against all Defendants by Henry Ortiz. (Deputy Clerk KEZ)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet