Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 2:24-bk-10724

Arizona Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Madeleine C Wanslee
Case #: 2:25-ap-00003
Nature of Suit1 null
91 Bankruptcy - Declaratory judgment
14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other
Case Filed:Jan 02, 2025
Terminated:Feb 28, 2025
Last checked: never
Defendant
CASEY A. LANDRY
9689 E. Oberlin Way
Scottsdale, AZ 85262
Represented By
CHRIS D. BARSKI
Barski Law
contact info
Plaintiff
Ronald A. Landry
Parker Schwartz, PLLC 7310 North 16th Street Suite 330
Phoenix, AZ 85020
Represented By
Ronald A. Landry
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/08/2025 1:05 PM MST
Friday, February 28, 2025
court Close Adversary Fri 02/28 8:41 AM
Adversary Terminated . (ETS)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 27, 2025
6 6 order o~Generic~ Order Fri 02/28 8:40 AM
ORDER Regarding Removal and Directing Clerk to Close Adversary Proceeding signed on 2/27/2025 Related [+] . (ETS)
Related: [-] 3 Motion to Deny
5 5 notice Lodging Proposed Order (Notice of) Thu 02/27 3:05 PM
Notice of Lodging Proposed Order Regarding Removal filed by LAWRENCE D. HIRSCH of PARKER SCHWARTZ, PLLC on behalf of Ronald A. Landry Related [+]. (HIRSCH, LAWRENCE)
Related: [-] 3 Motion to Deny
Wednesday, February 26, 2025
4 4 court Minute Entry Wed 02/26 2:38 PM
Copy of Minute Entry filed in 2:24-bk-10724-MCW at docket 7 Related [+] (TAH)
Related: [-] 1 Notice of Removal
Monday, February 10, 2025
3 3 motion Deny (Motion to) Mon 02/10 10:01 AM
Motion to Deny Removal filed by LAWRENCE D. HIRSCH of PARKER SCHWARTZ, PLLC on behalf of Ronald A. Landry. (HIRSCH, LAWRENCE)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 06, 2025
2 2 answer Objection Mon 01/06 12:42 PM
Response / , Objection to Removal and Motion for Abstention and to Remand filed by LAWRENCE D. HIRSCH of PARKER SCHWARTZ, PLLC on behalf of Ronald A. Landry Related [+]. (HIRSCH, LAWRENCE)
Related: [-] 1 Notice of Removal
Friday, January 03, 2025
crditcrd Auto-Docket of Credit Card Payment Fri 01/03 4:19 PM
Receipt of Notice of Removal([LINK:2:25-ap-00003-MCW] ) [cmp,ntcremvl] ( 350.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number A37136529. Fee amount 350.00. (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 02, 2025
1 1 cmp Notice of Removal Thu 01/02 3:09 PM
Adversary case 2:25-ap-00003. Notice of Removal (350.00 fee) filed by CHRIS D. BARSKI of Barski Law on behalf of CASEY A. LANDRY. Nature of Suit: 01 (Determination of removed claim or cause) 14 Related [+] 91 (Declaratory judgment) . (BARSKI, CHRIS)
Related: [-] covery of money/property - other