Mistretta v. Bisignano
New York Northern District Court | |
Judge: | Glenn T Suddaby |
Case #: | 1:25-cv-00009 |
Nature of Suit | 864 Social Security - SSID Title XVI |
Cause | 42:405 Review of HHS Decision (SSID) |
Case Filed: | Jan 03, 2025 |
Terminated: | May 08, 2025 |
Create an account to get the full party report for this case.
Docket last updated: 05/09/2025 11:59 PM EDT |
Thursday, May 08, 2025 | ||
13 | 13
![]() JUDGMENT that, pursuant to the Stipulation and Order (Dkt. No.12 ) issued on May 8, 2025 by the Honorable Glenn T. Suddaby, the parties stipulate that the Commissioner's final decision be reversed and this action be remanded to the Commissioner for further administrative proceedings pursuant to the fourth sentence of 42 U.S.C. § 405(g). On remand, the Commissioner will offer Plaintiff the opportunity for a hearing; update the evidence and take any further actions necessary to complete the administrative record; and issue a decision. The parties consent to the entry of judgment pursuant to Rule 58 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. All of the above pursuant to the Stipulation and Order dated May 8, 2025 issued by the Honorable Glenn T. Suddaby. Dkt. No.12 . (sal ) |
|
12 | 12
![]() STIPULATION AND ORDER FOR REMAND: The parties stipulate that the Commissioner's final decision be reversed and this action be remanded to the Commissioner for further administrative proceedings pursuant to the fourth sentence of 42 U.S.C. § 405(g). On remand, the Commissioner will offer Plaintiff the opportunity for a hearing; update the evidence and take any further actions necessary to complete the administrative record; and issue a decision. The parties consent to the entry of judgment pursuant to Rule 58 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Signed by U.S. District Judge Glenn T Suddaby on 5/8/025. (sal) |
|
11 | 11
![]() STIPULATION between the parties to remand this case to the SSA for further administrative proceedings by Leland Dudek submitted to Judge Glenn T. Suddaby. (Peters, Geoffrey) |
|
Monday, April 14, 2025 | ||
misc
Clerk Correction of Docket Entry
Mon 04/14 1:51 PM
CLERK'S CORRECTION OF DOCKET ENTRY - Deleted Dkt. No. 11 Social Security Administrative Record/Transcript that was filed today for it was an exact duplication of Dkt. No. 9 and filed in error. (jel, ) |
||
Thursday, April 10, 2025 | ||
10 | 10
![]() NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Adam T. DeFayette on behalf of Christopher J. Mistretta (DeFayette, Adam) |
|
Wednesday, April 09, 2025 | ||
9 | 9
![]() Social Security Administrative Record / Transcript. Plaintiff Brief due by 5/27/2025. (Peters, Geoffrey) |
|
Tuesday, January 14, 2025 | ||
8 | 8
notice
Notice of Initial Attorney Appearance - Commissioner
Tue 01/14 12:07 PM
NOTICE OF INITIAL ATTORNEY APPEARANCE - COMMISSIONER: Geoffrey M. Peters appearing for Commissioner of Social Security. Social Security Administrative Transcript due by 4/14/2025. (Peters, Geoffrey) |
|
Wednesday, January 08, 2025 | ||
7 | 7
order
Order Reassigning Case (Text-Order)
Wed 01/08 3:31 PM
TEXT ORDER REASSIGNING CASE to U.S. District Judge Glenn T Suddaby and Magistrate Judge Mitchell J. Katz for all further proceedings. Parties have not consented. Authorized by the Chief Judge pursuant to General Order #18. (jel, ) |
|
Tuesday, January 07, 2025 | ||
6 | 6
order
Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis
Tue 01/07 9:36 AM
TEXT ORDER: Granting3 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. SO ORDERED by Magistrate Judge Mitchell J. Katz on 1/7/2025. (kck) |
|
Friday, January 03, 2025 | ||
5 | 5
![]() SOCIAL SECURITY CONSENT / DECLINATION FORM filed by Christopher J. Mistretta advising of declination of consent to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge. (Telfer, Michael) |
|
4 | 4
![]() Social Security Appeal Case Assignment Form and General Order #18 Issued. Pursuant to General Order #18, in the event the Plaintiff does not timely consent, or if the United States timely withdraws its consent, the case will be reassigned to a District Judge consistent with General Order #12 . Social Security Consent/Declination Form due by 1/24/2025. (tll) |
|
3 | 3
![]() MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Christopher J. Mistretta (tll) |
|
2 | 2
![]() Social Security Identification Form [LODGED] [Pursuant to General Order #18, this document has been electronically lodged with the Court. Viewable by case participants and court personnel only, it is not a filed document, therefore is not available for public inspection. Any further distribution or dissemination is prohibited] . (tll) |
|
1 | 1
![]() COMPLAINT - Social Security Appeal. [Pursuant to General Order #18, Section B(3), the CM/ECF system will generate a Notice of Electronic Filing to the USAO-NDNY and Regional Counsel for the Social Security Administration. Service of a Complaint along with the Social Security Identification Form will be considered complete only when the three steps in paragraph 2(A), 2(B) and 2(C) of General Order #18 have been completed.] .(tll) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Att: 2
![]() |