Tennessee Middle District Court
Judge:Eli J Richardson
Referred: Alistair Newbern
Case #: 3:25-cv-00013
Nature of Suit790 Labor - Other Labor Litigation
Cause29:2101 Worker Adjustment/Retraining Notification Act
Case Filed:Jan 03, 2025
Last checked: Monday Feb 17, 2025 2:55 AM CST
Defendant
Xtend Healthcare, LLC
Represented By
Tracey A. Jordan
Cozen O'Connor (miami Office)
contact info
Aaron Krauss
Cozen O'Conner
contact info
Plaintiff
Kristal Dargon
Represented By
Jack A. Raisner
Raisner Roupinian LLP
contact info
Heather M. Collins
Hmc Civil Rights Law, PLLC
contact info
Rene' S. Roupinian
Raisner Roupinian LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 41 minutes ago
Friday, April 25, 2025
35 35 13 pgs respoth Memorandum in Support Fri 04/25 2:15 PM
MEMORANDUM in Support of34 MOTION to Dismiss Amended Complaint filed by Navient Corporation . (Roberts, Lauren)
Related: [-]
34 34 motion Dismiss Fri 04/25 2:11 PM
MOTION to Dismiss Amended Complaint by Navient Corporation. (Roberts, Lauren)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 08, 2025
33 33 respm Response in Support of Motion Tue 04/08 11:22 AM
RESPONSE in Support re27 MOTION to Dismiss the Amended Complaint filed by Xtend Healthcare, LLC. (Krauss, Aaron)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 01, 2025
32 32 3 pgs order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Wed 04/02 8:38 AM
ORDER: The Motion30 for Extension of Time to Answer is GRANTED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Alistair Newbern on 04/01/2025. (ad)
Related: [-]
31 31 respm Response in Opposition to Motion Tue 04/01 12:39 PM
RESPONSE in Opposition re27 MOTION to Dismiss the Amended Complaint filed by Kristal Dargon. (Raisner, Jack)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 31, 2025
30 30 motion Extension of Time to File Answer Mon 03/31 1:52 PM
Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re21 Amended Complaint by Navient Corporation. (Roberts, Lauren)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 21, 2025
29 29 order Appear Pro Hac Vice Fri 03/21 4:53 PM
ORDER granting26 : Having satisfied the requirements of Local Rule 83.01(b), the Motion for Jason Alexander Cabrera to Appear Pro Hac Vice is granted. Signed by Lynda M. Hill, Clerk of Court, on 03/21/2025. (lh)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 19, 2025
misc Annotation - Bar Status Wed 03/19 9:21 AM
PA State Bar status verified as active for Jason Alexander Cabrera not admitted to this court - Local counsel secured . (ad)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 18, 2025
28 28 25 pgs respoth Memorandum in Support Tue 03/18 3:17 PM
MEMORANDUM in Support of27 MOTION to Dismiss the Amended Complaint filed by Xtend Healthcare, LLC .(Krauss, Aaron)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit K. Dargon Offer Letter
27 27 motion Dismiss Tue 03/18 3:14 PM
MOTION to Dismiss the Amended Complaint by Xtend Healthcare, LLC.(Krauss, Aaron)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Attachment Proposed Order
Monday, March 17, 2025
26 26 motion Appear Pro Hac Vice Mon 03/17 10:48 AM
MOTION for attorney Jason Alexander Cabrera to Appear Pro Hac Vice (paid $150 PHV fee; receipt number ATNMDC-4280522) by Xtend Healthcare, LLC. (Jordan, Tracey)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 13, 2025
25 25 1 pgs order Order 1 - Terminate Hearings ~Util - Set Hearings Thu 03/13 1:16 PM
ORDER: On March 6, 2025, Plaintiff Kristal Dargon filed an amended complaint adding defendant Navient Corporation as a party in this matter. (Doc. No.21 .) To allow the plaintiff to effect service on the defendant, the initial case management conference set on March 19, 2025, is CANCELLED. The initial case management conference is RESET for May 12, 2025, at 9:30 a.m. Counsel for each party shall call (650) 479-3207 and enter access code 2317 604 8628# to participate. Signed by Magistrate Judge Alistair Newbern on 03/13/2025. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.) (ad)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 12, 2025
24 24 misc Proposed Case Management Order Wed 03/12 3:14 PM
PROPOSED CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER by Plaintiff and Xtend Healthcare LLC filed by Xtend Healthcare, LLC. (Krauss, Aaron)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 10, 2025
23 23 service Summons Issued Mon 03/10 1:28 PM
Summons issued as to Navient Corporation. (ad)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 06, 2025
22 22 notice Notice of Summons to be Issued Thu 03/06 12:18 PM
NOTICE of Summons to be Issued as to Navient Corporation. Counsel is responsible for printing and serving the summons after it is issued by the Clerk's Office. (Collins, Heather)
Related: [-]
21 21 cmp Amended Complaint Thu 03/06 11:03 AM
AMENDED COMPLAINT against Xtend Healthcare, LLC, Navient Corporation, filed by Kristal Dargon.(Raisner, Jack)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 04, 2025
20 20 respm Response in Opposition to Motion Tue 03/04 5:00 PM
RESPONSE in Opposition re16 MOTION to Stay Discovery and Further Proceedings Until Deposition of a Motion to Dismiss and to Set a Briefing Schedule filed by Kristal Dargon. (Raisner, Jack)
Related: [-]
19 19 order Appear Pro Hac Vice Tue 03/04 4:18 PM
ORDER granting14 : Having satisfied the requirements of Local Rule 83.01(b), the Motion for Aaron Krauss to Appear Pro Hac Vice is granted. Signed by Lynda M. Hill, Clerk of Court, on 03/04/2025. (lh)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 25, 2025
18 18 1 pgs order Order 1 - Terminate Hearings ~Util - Set Hearings Tue 02/25 3:25 PM
ORDER: The initial case management conference set February 26, 2025, at 9:30 a.m. (Doc. No.5 .), is CANCELLED and RESET for March 19, 2025 at 10:30 a.m. Counsel for each party shall call (650) 479-3207 and enter access code 2317 604 8628# to participate. Signed by Magistrate Judge Alistair Newbern on 02/25/2025. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.) (ad)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 21, 2025
17 17 misc Proposed Case Management Order Fri 02/21 2:28 PM
PROPOSED CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER filed by Xtend Healthcare, LLC. (Jordan, Tracey)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 18, 2025
16 16 motion Stay Tue 02/18 3:44 PM
MOTION to Stay Discovery and Further Proceedings Until Deposition of a Motion to Dismiss and to Set a Briefing Schedule by Xtend Healthcare, LLC. (Jordan, Tracey)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 10, 2025
15 15 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Mon 02/10 3:39 PM
ORDER: The parties have filed a "stipulation for extension of time to respond to the complaint" asking the Court to extend Defendant Xtend Healthcare, LLC's deadline to answer Plaintiff Kristal Dargon's complaint to March 18, 2025. (Doc. No.13 .) Because the parties ask the Court to grant specific relief, their request should have been filed as a motion. The Clerk's Office is DIRECTED to redocket the parties' filing as a motion. Construing their stipulation as a motion, the motion (Doc. No.13 ) is GRANTED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Alistair Newbern on 02/10/2025. (ad)
Related: [-]
misc Annotation - Bar Status Mon 02/10 2:25 PM
PA State Bar status verified as active for Aaron Krauss not admitted to this court - Local counsel secured . (ad)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 07, 2025
14 14 motion Appear Pro Hac Vice Fri 02/07 12:45 PM
MOTION for attorney Aaron Krauss to Appear Pro Hac Vice (paid $150 PHV fee; receipt number ATNMDC-4255826) by Xtend Healthcare, LLC.(Jordan, Tracey)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Attachment Certificate of Good Standing
13 13 misc Stipulation Fri 02/07 9:30 AM
STIPULATION For Extension of Time to Respond to the Complaint by Xtend Healthcare, LLC. (Jordan, Tracey)
Related: [-]
misc Annotation - Bar Status Fri 02/07 9:43 AM
TN State Bar status verified as active for Tracey A. Jordan admitted to this court . (ad)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 06, 2025
12 12 notice Notice of Appearance Thu 02/06 2:03 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Tracey A. Jordan on behalf of Xtend Healthcare, LLC (Jordan, Tracey)
Related: [-]
11 11 service Summons Returned Executed Thu 02/06 10:37 AM
SUMMONS returned executed by Kristal Dargon. Xtend Healthcare, LLC served on 1/28/2025. (Collins, Heather)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 03, 2025
10 10 order Appear Pro Hac Vice Mon 02/03 2:57 PM
ORDER granting8 and9 : Having satisfied the requirements of Local Rule 83.01(b), the Motions for Jack A. Raisner and Rene S. Roupinian to Appear Pro Hac Vice are granted. Signed by Lynda M. Hill, Clerk of Court, on 02/03/2025. (lh)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 24, 2025
9 9 motion Appear Pro Hac Vice Fri 01/24 9:36 AM
MOTION for attorney Rene S. Roupinian to Appear Pro Hac Vice (paid $150 PHV fee; receipt number ATNMDC-4244966) by Kristal Dargon.(Collins, Heather)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Attachment Certificate of Good Standing
8 8 motion Appear Pro Hac Vice Fri 01/24 9:32 AM
MOTION for attorney Jack A. Raisner to Appear Pro Hac Vice (paid $150 PHV fee; receipt number ATNMDC-4244958) by Kristal Dargon.(Collins, Heather)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Attachment Certificate of Good Standing
Wednesday, January 22, 2025
7 7 service Summons Issued Wed 01/22 2:27 PM
Summons issued as to Xtend Healthcare, LLC. (ad)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 21, 2025
6 6 notice Notice of Summons to be Issued Tue 01/21 1:32 PM
NOTICE of Summons to be Issued as to Xtend Healthcare, LLC. Counsel is responsible for printing and serving the summons after it is issued by the Clerk's Office.(Collins, Heather)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Attachment Summons
Friday, January 03, 2025
5 5 notice Notice of Case Management Conference Fri 01/03 3:05 PM
NOTICE of Initial Case Management Conference by Telephone set for 2/26/2025 at 09:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Alistair Newbern. (ch)
Related: [-]
4 4 notice Notice of Business Entity Disclosure Statement Filing Requirement Fri 01/03 3:01 PM
NOTICE of Business Entity Disclosure Statement filing requirement. (ch)
Related: [-]
3 3 notice Notice/Information re Consent of the Parties to MJ Fri 01/03 3:00 PM
NOTICE/INFORMATION regarding Consent of the Parties to the Magistrate Judge. (ch)
Related: [-]
2 2 notice Notice of Admin Order 217 Fri 01/03 3:00 PM
NOTICE OF ADMINISTRATIVE ORDER NO. 217 to parties re obligation of counsel to keep Court apprised of current contact information. (ch)
Related: [-]
1 1 13 pgs cmp Complaint Fri 01/03 3:00 PM
CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT FOR VIOLATION OF WARN ACT AND NEW JERSEY MILLVILLE DALLAS AIRMOTIVE PLANT JOB LOSS NOTIFICATION ACT against Xtend Healthcare, LLC (Filing fee $405, Receipt number ATNMDC-4230639), filed by Kristal Dargon.(ch)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Attachment - Civil Cover Sheet
misc Annotation - Bar Status Fri 01/03 3:01 PM
TN State Bar status verified as active for Heather M. Collins admitted to this court . (ch)
Related: [-]
misc Annotation - Bar Status Fri 01/03 3:03 PM
NY State Bar status verified as active for Jack A. Raisner, Rene' S. Roupinian not admitted to this court - Local counsel secured . (ch)
Related: [-]
misc Annotation - PHV Fri 01/03 3:03 PM
NOTICE TO COUNSEL Jack A. Raisner, Rene' S. Roupinian: WITHIN 21 DAYS, counsel shall file a Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, a Certificate of Good Standing signed by the Clerk of a United States District Court or a U. S. appellate court where admitted, and pay a fee of $150.00 (LR 83.01(b)). PHV due by 1/24/2025. (ch)
Related: [-]