Tennessee Middle District Court
Judge:Waverly D Crenshaw, Jr
Case #: 3:25-cv-00020
Nature of Suit440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights
Cause42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Case Filed:Jan 03, 2025
Last checked: Monday Feb 17, 2025 2:56 AM CST
Defendant
Joshua Tollett Masonry
Defendant
TN Unemployment
Plaintiff
Gregory Ryan Webb
329 East Tanner Street
Waverly, IL 62692


Docket last updated: 05/05/2025 11:59 PM CDT
Friday, April 11, 2025
18 18 8 pgs respoth Memorandum in Support Fri 04/11 2:16 PM
MEMORANDUM in Support of17 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Joshua Tollett Masonry . (Robison, Peter)
Related: [-]
17 17 motion Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Fri 04/11 2:14 PM
MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Joshua Tollett Masonry. (Robison, Peter)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 02, 2025
16 16 misc Business Entity Disclosure Statement Wed 04/02 11:32 AM
BUSINESS ENTITY DISCLOSURE STATEMENT (incomplete) filed by Gregory Ryan Webb. (kc)
Related: [-]
15 15 motion Miscellaneous Relief Wed 04/02 11:31 AM
MOTION to Serve Summons by Gregory Ryan Webb.(kc)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Attachment - Proposed Summons
14 14 motion Amend/Correct Wed 04/02 11:29 AM
MOTION to Amend/Correct6 Amended Complaint by Gregory Ryan Webb.(kc)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Attachment - Proposed Amended Complaint
Wednesday, March 12, 2025
13 13 motion Miscellaneous Relief Wed 03/12 12:23 PM
MOTION for Vacation Pay by Gregory Ryan Webb.(kc)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Attachment - Cover Letter
Friday, March 07, 2025
misc Annotation - Bar Status Fri 03/07 4:52 PM
TN State Bar status verified as active for Peter C. Robison admitted to this court . (kc)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 28, 2025
12 12 notice Notice of Appearance Fri 02/28 12:53 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Peter C. Robison on behalf of Joshua Tollett Masonry (Robison, Peter)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 29, 2025
11 11 motion Preliminary Injunction Wed 01/29 11:07 AM
MOTION for Preliminary Injunctive Relief by Gregory Ryan Webb. (ch)
Related: [-]
10 10 motion Supplement Wed 01/29 11:06 AM
MOTION in Support to6 Amended Complaint by Gregory Ryan Webb. (ch)
Related: [-]
9 9 motion Temporary Restraining Order Wed 01/29 11:04 AM
THIRD MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order by Gregory Ryan Webb. (ch)
Related: [-]
8 8 motion Temporary Restraining Order Wed 01/29 11:03 AM
SECOND MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order by Gregory Ryan Webb. (ch)
Related: [-]
7 7 motion Temporary Restraining Order Wed 01/29 11:02 AM
MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order by Gregory Ryan Webb. (ch)
Related: [-]
6 6 cmp Amended Complaint Wed 01/29 11:01 AM
AMENDED COMPLAINT against Joshua Tollett Masonry, TN Unemployment, filed by Gregory Ryan Webb.(ch)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 03, 2025
5 5 notice Notice/Information re Consent of the Parties to MJ Fri 01/03 5:00 PM
NOTICE/INFORMATION regarding Consent of the Parties to the Magistrate Judge. (mg)
Related: [-]
4 4 notice Notice of Admin Order 217 Fri 01/03 5:00 PM
NOTICE OF ADMINISTRATIVE ORDER NO. 217 to parties re obligation of counsel to keep Court apprised of current contact information. (mg)
Related: [-]
3 3 motion Proceed In Forma Pauperis Fri 01/03 4:57 PM
APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis by Gregory Ryan Webb. (mg)
Related: [-]
2 2 motion Miscellaneous Relief Fri 01/03 4:56 PM
MOTION by Gregory Ryan Webb. (mg)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Fri 01/03 4:55 PM
COMPLAINT against Joshua Tollett Masonry, TN Unemployment, filed by Gregory Ryan Webb.(mg)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Attachment - Civil Cover Sheet
misc Annotation - Docket Fri 01/03 5:01 PM
Notice mailed to pro se party regarding filing of new case (docket sheet & certificate of service form and Notice of Consent form included.) (mg)
Related: [-]