Connecticut Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Julie A Manning
Case #: 5:25-bk-50005
Case Filed:Jan 03, 2025
Claims Deadline:Apr 03, 2025

TypeCorporation
Tax IDsubscribers only
# of Creditors1-49
Est. Assets$0 to $50,000
Est. Liabilities $1,000,001 to $10 million
Nature of Business Other
Nature of Debts Primarily Business

Debtor
News Direct Corp.
23 S Main St
Norwalk, CT 06854-5903
Represented By
Scott M. Charmoy
Charmoy & Charmoy
contact info
Last checked: never
U.S. Trustee
U. S. Trustee
Office of the U.S. Trustee Giaimo Federal Building 150 Court Street, Room 302
New Haven, CT 06510


Docket last updated: 7 hours ago
Wednesday, April 30, 2025
109 109 misc Chapter 11 Monthly Operating Report UST Form 11-MOR Wed 04/30 3:07 PM
Chapter 11 Monthly Operating Report for the Month Ending: 03/31/25 Filed by Scott M. Charmoy on behalf of News Direct Corp. Debtor. . (Charmoy, Scott)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Appendix Attachments
Att: 2 Appendix Cover sheet
Tuesday, April 29, 2025
108 108 misc Amended Schedules/Amended List of Creditors Tue 04/29 2:17 PM
Amended Schedules AB,. Filed by Scott M. Charmoy on behalf of News Direct Corp. Debtor. . (Charmoy, Scott)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 25, 2025
107 107 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document Sat 04/26 12:18 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document. Related [+]. Notice Date 04/25/2025. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 105 Order on Motion for Order
106 106 misc Certificate/Affidavit of Service Fri 04/25 1:20 PM
Certificate of Service Filed by Scott M. Charmoy on behalf of News Direct Corp. Debtor. Related [+]. (Charmoy, Scott)
Related: [-] 105 Order on Motion for Order
Wednesday, April 23, 2025
105 105 7 pgs order Order on Motion for Order Wed 04/23 10:58 AM
Order Instructing Debtor to Complete, File, and Serve Notice of Disputed, Contingent, or Unliquidated Claim and Notice of Deadline for Filing Proof of Claim Related [+] . (rms)
Related: [-] 104