California Southern District Court
Judge:Robert S Huie
Referred: Jill L Burkhardt
Case #: 3:25-cv-00015
Nature of Suit830 Property Rights - Patent
Cause35:0271 Patent Infringement
Case Filed:Jan 03, 2025
Last checked: Tuesday Feb 25, 2025 3:01 AM PST
Defendant
Luminous Global Inc.
Represented By
Jesse A Salen
Sheppard Mullin Richter & Hampton LLP
contact info
Donald William Geiger, Jr
Sheppard, Mullin, Richter & Hampton
contact info
Plaintiff
JLC-Tech LLC
Represented By
Lukas Sosnicki
Thompson Coburn LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/13/2025 11:59 PM PDT
Friday, May 09, 2025
26 26 motion Protective Order Fri 05/09 4:34 PM
Joint MOTION for Protective Order by Luminous Global Inc..(Salen, Jesse)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A
Monday, May 05, 2025
25 25 notice Joint Discovery Plan Mon 05/05 3:13 PM
JOINT DISCOVERY PLAN by JLC-Tech LLC(Fonda, Nathan)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Stipulated Proposed ESI Order
Thursday, April 24, 2025
24 24 motion Dismiss Thu 04/24 7:36 PM
MOTION to Dismiss Counterclaims and Strike Defenses by JLC-Tech LLC.(Fonda, Nathan)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Memo of Points and Authorities
Friday, April 18, 2025
23 23 minutes Status Conference Fri 04/18 2:52 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Jill L. Burkhardt: Status Conference held on 4/18/2025. (Plaintiff Attorney Nathan C. Fonda). (Defendant Attorney Jesse A Salen, Donald William Geiger, Jr). (no document attached) (cxe)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 11, 2025
22 22 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Fri 04/11 5:03 PM
ORDER Granting Joint Motion for Extension of Time (ECF No.20 ). Plaintiff shall file a response to Defendant's Answer by no later than 4/24/25. Signed by District Judge Robert S. Huie on 4/11/25. (jmo)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 10, 2025
21 21 order Minute Order (No Time) ~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings Thu 04/10 10:30 AM
MINUTE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Jill L. Burkhardt: On 4/4/2025, the parties left a joint voicemail with Chambers requesting a Status Conference to discuss Defendant's request for an in-person Early Neutral Evaluation Conference. Accordingly, the Court hereby SETS a telephonic, counsel-only Status Conference for 4/18/2025, at 2:15 PM before Judge Burkhardt to discuss the request. For purposes of the conference, counsel shall call the Court's conference line at 619-657-0677, and use conference ID #: 834 851 124. (cxe)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 09, 2025
20 20 motion Extension of Time to File Wed 04/09 2:31 PM
Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Plaintiff JLC-Tech's Response to Defendant's Answer and Counterclaims by JLC-Tech LLC. (Sosnicki, Lukas)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 26, 2025
19 19 12 pgs order Order for Early Neutral Evaluation Wed 03/26 4:05 PM
Notice And Order Setting Early Neutral Evaluation And Case Management Conferences. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jill L. Burkhardt on 03/26/2025. (stn)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 24, 2025
18 18 misc Corporate Disclosure Statement Mon 03/24 6:01 PM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by Luminous Global Inc. identifying Corporate Parent and Certificate of Interested Entities for Luminous Global Inc... (Salen, Jesse)
Related: [-]
17 17 answer Answer to Complaint Counterclaim Mon 03/24 5:36 PM
ANSWER to1 Complaint,, with Jury Demand and , COUNTERCLAIM against JLC-Tech LLC by Luminous Global Inc..(Salen, Jesse)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A,
Att: 2 Exhibit B,
Att: 3 Exhibit C,
Att: 4 Exhibit D,
Att: 5 Exhibit E,
Att: 6 Exhibit F,
Att: 7 Exhibit G,
Att: 8 Exhibit H
Thursday, February 27, 2025
16 16 2 pgs order Order re Pro Hac Vice Application Thu 02/27 3:27 PM
ORDER Approving the Pro Hac Vice Application of Michael L. Nepple, re12 Request to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by District Judge Robert S. Huie on 2/27/2025.(exs)
Related: [-]
15 15 2 pgs order Order re Pro Hac Vice Application Thu 02/27 3:25 PM
ORDER Approving the Pro Hac Vice Application of Nathan C. Fonda, re11 Request to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by District Judge Robert S. Huie on 2/27/2025.(exs)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 26, 2025
14 14 2 pgs order Order re Pro Hac Vice Application Wed 02/26 10:29 AM
ORDER Approving the Pro Hac Vice Application of Alan H. Norman, re13 Request to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by District Judge Robert S. Huie on 2/26/2025.(exs)
Related: [-]
13 13 notice Request to Appear Pro Hac Vice Wed 02/26 8:44 AM
Request to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee received: $ 224 receipt number ACASDC-19639800.) (Application to be reviewed by Clerk.) (Norman, Alan) (exs)
Related: [-]
12 12 notice Request to Appear Pro Hac Vice Wed 02/26 8:11 AM
Request to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee received: $ 224 receipt number ACASDC-19639602.) (Application to be reviewed by Clerk.) (Nepple, Michael) (exs)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 25, 2025
11 11 notice Request to Appear Pro Hac Vice Tue 02/25 12:20 PM
Request to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee received: $ 224 receipt number ACASDC-19636996.) (Application to be reviewed by Clerk.) (Fonda, Nathan) (exs)
Related: [-]
10 10 notice Request to Appear Pro Hac Vice Tue 02/25 11:08 AM
Request to Appear Pro Hac Vice, No payment Submitted. (Application to be reviewed by Clerk.) (Fonda, Nathan) ***QC Mailer sent re: incomplete application*** (exs)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 24, 2025
9 9 notice Notice of Appearance Mon 02/24 10:56 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Donald William Geiger, Jr on behalf of Luminous Global Inc. (Geiger, Donald)Attorney Donald William Geiger, Jr added to party Luminous Global Inc.(pty:dft)(stn)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 19, 2025
8 8 notice Notice of Appearance Wed 02/19 2:01 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Jesse A Salen on behalf of Luminous Global Inc. (Salen, Jesse)Attorney Jesse A Salen added to party Luminous Global Inc.(pty:dft)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 18, 2025
7 7 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Wed 02/19 8:54 AM
Order Granting Joint Motion For Extension Of Time [ECF No.6 ]. Signed by District Judge Robert S. Huie on 02/18/2025. (stn) (exs)
Related: [-]
6 6 motion Extension of Time to File Answer Tue 02/18 11:30 AM
Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re1 Complaint,, Joint Stipulation and [Proposed] Order to Extend Time for Defendant Luminos Global Inc. to File Its Response to the Complaint by JLC-Tech LLC. (Sosnicki, Lukas)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 07, 2025
5 5 order Order of Judge Transfer Tue 01/07 3:38 PM
MINUTE ORDER OF RECUSAL. Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel is no longer assigned. Case reassigned to District Judge Robert S. Huie for all further proceedings. The new case number is 25cv15-RSH-JLB.(no document attached) (jmo)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 06, 2025
4 4 misc Corporate Disclosure Statement Mon 01/06 6:39 AM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by JLC-Tech LLC. No Corporate Parents/Interested Parties. (Sosnicki, Lukas) (jmo)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 03, 2025
3 3 service Summons Issued Fri 01/03 3:51 PM
Summons Issued. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should print this summons and serve it in accordance with Rule 4, Fed.R.Civ.P and LR 4.1. (jmo)
Related: [-]
2 2 utility Report Regarding Patent & Trademark FORM Fri 01/03 3:47 PM
REPORT on the filing or determination of an action regarding patent and/or trademark number(s) *10,508,805*, *11,732,878* cc:USPTO (jmo)
Related: [-]
1 1 53 pgs cmp Complaint Fri 01/03 3:45 PM
COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Luminous Global Inc. ( Filing fee $ 405 receipt number ACASDC-19476422.), filed by JLC-Tech LLC. The new case number is 3:25-cv-15-GPC-JLB. Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel and Magistrate Judge Jill L. Burkhardt are assigned to the case. (Sosnicki, Lukas)(jmo)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Exhibit 1,
Att: 3 Exhibit 2,
Att: 4 Exhibit 3,
Att: 5 Exhibit 4,
Att: 6 Exhibit 5,
Att: 7 Exhibit 6,
Att: 8 Exhibit 7,
Att: 9 Exhibit 8,
Att: 10 Exhibit 9,
Att: 11 Exhibit 10,
Att: 12 Copyright Form [Copyright Form Mailed]