New York Southern District Court
Judge:Nelson Stephen Roman
Case #: 7:25-cv-00095
Nature of Suit360 Torts - Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury
Cause28:1332nm Diversity-Non-Motor Vehicle
Case Filed:Jan 03, 2025
Last checked: Monday Feb 17, 2025 3:53 AM EST
Defendant
The Ferrara Management Group, Inc.
Represented By
Scott A. Brody
Brody, O'Connor & O'Connor, Esqs.
contact info
Plaintiff
Oscar Gonzalez
Represented By
Sandra Laura Bonder
Sandra L. Bonder, Esq.
contact info
Matthew Aaron Haicken
Haicken Law PLLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 6 hours ago
Monday, April 07, 2025
15 15 misc Proposed Scheduling Order Mon 04/07 9:57 PM
PROPOSED SCHEDULING ORDER. Document filed by Oscar Gonzalez..(Bonder, Sandra)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 18, 2025
14 14 4 pgs order Order Tue 03/18 11:57 AM
ORDER: The Court is in receipt of Defendant the Ferrara Management Group's Answer (ECF No. 12) to Plaintiff Oscar Gonzalez's Complaint (ECF No. 6). The Court waives the Initial Pre-trial Conference and directs the parties to jointly complete a Case Management Plan and Scheduling Order (blank form attached hereto). Said Scheduling Order shall be filed on the docket by April 7, 2025. After review and approval of the Scheduling Order, the Court will issue an Order of Reference to Magistrate Judge Victoria Reznik for general pretrial purposes. The parties are directed to contact Judge McCarthy within seven (7) business days of the date of the Order of Reference to schedule a conference. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Nelson Stephen Roman on 3/18/2025) (mml)
Related: [-]
13 13 notice Notice of Appearance Tue 03/18 9:45 AM
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Magdalene P. Skountzos on behalf of The Ferrara Management Group, Inc...(Skountzos, Magdalene)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 26, 2025
12 12 answer Answer to Complaint Wed 02/26 5:10 PM
ANSWER to6 Complaint. Document filed by The Ferrara Management Group, Inc...(Brody, Scott)
Related: [-]
11 11 misc Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement Wed 02/26 5:07 PM
RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by The Ferrara Management Group, Inc...(Brody, Scott)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 04, 2025
10 10 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Extension of Time Tue 02/04 2:20 PM
ORDER granting8 Letter Motion for Extension of Time. Defendant's assented to request for an extension of time to reply to the Complaint is granted. Defendant shall reply on or before February 26, 2025. The Clerk of Court is kindly directed to terminate the motion at ECF No. 8. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Nelson Stephen Roman on 2/4/2025) (mml)
Related: [-]
utility Set/Reset Deadlines Tue 02/04 2:24 PM
Set/Reset Deadlines: The Ferrara Management Group, Inc. answer due 2/26/2025. (mml)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 03, 2025
9 9 service Affidavit of Service Complaints Mon 02/03 7:57 PM
AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. The Ferrara Management Group, Inc. served on 1/8/2025, answer due 1/29/2025. Service was accepted by Michelle Pellitteri-Resale Department/Authorized to Accept Service. Document filed by Oscar Gonzalez..(Bonder, Sandra)
Related: [-]
8 8 motion Extension of Time Mon 02/03 1:34 PM
LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer the Complaint addressed to Judge Nelson Stephen Roman from Scott A. Brody, Esq. dated 02/03/2025. Document filed by The Ferrara Management Group, Inc...(Brody, Scott)
Related: [-]
7 7 notice Notice of Appearance Mon 02/03 1:16 PM
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Scott A. Brody on behalf of The Ferrara Management Group, Inc...(Brody, Scott)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 06, 2025
6 6 11 pgs cmp Complaint Mon 01/06 12:28 PM
COMPLAINT against The Ferrara Management Group, Inc.. Document filed by Oscar Gonzalez..(Haicken, Matthew)
Related: [-]
5 5 service Summons Issued Mon 01/06 12:18 PM
ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to The Ferrara Management Group, Inc.. (sj)
Related: [-]
misc Notice to Attorney Regarding Deficient Pleading Mon 01/06 12:05 PM
***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT PLEADING. Notice to Attorney Matthew Aaron Haicken to RE-FILE Document No. 1 Complaint. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the wrong party/parties whom the pleading is against were selected. Re-file the pleading using the event type Complaint found under the event list Complaints and Other Initiating Documents - attach the correct signed PDF - select the individually named filer/filers - select the individually named party/parties the pleading is against. (sj)
Related: [-]
notice Case Opening Initial Assignment Notice Mon 01/06 12:12 PM
CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Nelson Stephen Roman. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges] . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions] ..(sj)
Related: [-]
utility Case Designation Mon 01/06 12:13 PM
Magistrate Judge Andrew E. Krause is designated to handle matters that may be referred in this case. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link:[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf] . (sj)
Related: [-]
utility Case Designated ECF Mon 01/06 12:14 PM
Case Designated ECF. (sj)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 03, 2025
4 4 notice Notice of Appearance Fri 01/03 11:18 PM
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Sandra Laura Bonder on behalf of Oscar Gonzalez..(Bonder, Sandra)
Related: [-]
3 3 service Request for Issuance of Summons Fri 01/03 11:16 PM
REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to The Ferrara Management Group, Inc., re:1 Complaint. Document filed by Oscar Gonzalez..(Haicken, Matthew)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Civil Cover Sheet Fri 01/03 11:14 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Haicken, Matthew)
Related: [-]
1 1 11 pgs cmp Complaint Fri 01/03 11:10 PM
COMPLAINT against Oscar Gonzalez. (Filing Fee $ 405.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-30408451)Document filed by Oscar Gonzalez..(Haicken, Matthew)
Related: [-]