Arizona District Court
Case #: 2:25-mj-01000
Case Filed:Jan 02, 2025
Last checked: Saturday Jan 04, 2025 12:12 AM MST
Defendant
Ramon Eduardo Imperial-Carrizosa (1)
Represented By
George Jacob Romero
Federal Public Defenders Office - Yuma
contact info
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
Sydney Yew
Us Attorneys Office - Phoenix, Az
contact info


Docket last updated: 01/04/2025 1:24 AM MST
Tuesday, December 31, 2024
Arrest of Ramon Eduardo Imperial-Carrizosa on 12/31/2024. (JMA)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 02, 2025
1 1 COMPLAINT as to Ramon Eduardo Imperial-Carrizosa. (JMA)
Related: [-]