California Central District Court
Judge:Percy Anderson
Referred: Alicia G Rosenberg
Case #: 2:24-cv-11231
Nature of Suit365 Torts - Personal Injury - Product Liability
Cause28:1331 Fed. Question
Case Filed:Dec 30, 2024
Terminated:Jan 15, 2025
Last checked: Friday Feb 14, 2025 3:20 AM PST
Defendant
U.S. District Court Eastern District of California Office of the Clerk
Plaintiff
Shannon O. Murphy, Sr.
P.O. Box 1756
Antiock, CA 94509


Docket last updated: 05/12/2025 11:59 PM PDT
Monday, March 24, 2025
10 10 order Reconsideration Mon 03/24 2:29 PM
MINUTES IN CHAMBERS-COURT ORDER by Judge Percy Anderson. For all of the foregoing reasons, the Court denies Plaintiff's Request for Reconsideration. With the exception of a Notice of Appeal, no further filings will be accepted in this closed case. Any future attempts to file documents in this closed case, with the exception of a Notice of Appeal, will be rejected and ordered stricken. (See document for further details).; denying8 REQUEST FOR RECONSIDERATION AFTER UNFAIR DUE-PROCESS LAW, OCCUR CONCERN COURT ERRORS, FAIR INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE, WAS UNFAIR DETOUR APPROPRIATE, BEFORE A DISMISSAL WAS APPLIED THIS COURT CASE BY AN UNFAIR JUDGE'S VENUE ADDED. (aco)
Related: [-]
9 9 notice Deficiency in Filed Documents (G-112A) - optional html form Mon 03/24 10:51 AM
NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronic Filed Document RE: REQUEST FOR RECONSIDERATION AFTER UNFAIR DUE-PROCESS LAW, OCCUR CONCERN COURT ERRORS, FAIR INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE, WAS UNFAIR DETOUR APPROPRIATE, BEFORE A DISMISSAL WAS APPLIED THIS COURT CASE BY AN UNFAIR JUDGE'S VENUE ADDED8 . The following error(s) was/were found: Proposed document was not submitted or was not submitted as a separate attachment. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (aco)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 13, 2025
8 8 motion Reconsideration Mon 03/24 10:48 AM
REQUEST FOR RECONSIDERATION AFTER UNFAIR DUE-PROCESS LAW, OCCUR CONCERN COURT ERRORS, FAIR INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE, WAS UNFAIR DETOUR APPROPRIATE, BEFORE A DISMISSAL WAS APPLIED THIS COURT CASE BY AN UNFAIR JUDGE'S VENUE ADDED filed by plaintiff Shannon O. Murphy, Sr. (aco)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 15, 2025
7 7 order Proceed In Forma Pauperis with Declaration in Support (CV-60) Thu 01/16 9:58 AM
ORDER ON REQUEST TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS (NON-PRISONER CASE) by Judge Percy Anderson. IT IS THEREFORE ORDERED that: As explained in the attached statement, the Request is DENIED because The action is frivolous or malicious. The action seeks monetary relief against defendant(s) immune from such relief. As explained in the attached statement, because it is absolutely clear that the deficiencies in the complaint cannot be cured by amendment, this case is hereby DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE.; denying2 REQUEST to Proceed in Forma Pauperis with Declaration in Support (CV-60). (MD JS-6, Case Terminated). (aco)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 07, 2025
6 6 cs_rasgn Reassign Case - Self -Recusal - (CV-52) Tue 01/07 4:23 PM
ORDER TO REASSIGN CASE due to self-recusal pursuant to this Court's General Order in the Matter of Assignment of Cases and Duties to the District Judges.by Judge Stephen V. Wilson. Case transferred from Judge Stephen V. Wilson to the calendar of Judge Percy Anderson for all further proceedings. Case number now reads as 2:24-cv-11231 PA(AGRx). (rn)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 03, 2025
5 5 notice Notice to Counsel Re: Consent to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge - optional html form Fri 01/03 12:44 PM
Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (jtil)
Related: [-]
4 4 adr Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form Fri 01/03 12:43 PM
NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (jtil)
Related: [-]
3 3 notice Notice of Assignment to United States Judges (CV-18) - optional html form Fri 01/03 12:43 PM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Stephen V. Wilson and Magistrate Judge Alicia G. Rosenberg. (jtil)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 30, 2024
2 2 motion Proceed In Forma Pauperis with Declaration in Support (CV-60) Fri 01/03 12:41 PM
REQUEST to Proceed In Forma Pauperis, Declaration in Support filed by Plaintiff Shannon O. Murphy, Sr. (jtil)
Related: [-]
1 1 6 pgs cmp Complaint - (Discovery) Fri 01/03 12:37 PM
COMPLAINT filed by Plaintiff Shannon O. Murphy, Sr. against Defendants U.S. District Court Eastern District of California Office of the Clerk. Case assigned to Judge Stephen V. Wilson for all further proceedings. Discovery referred to Magistrate Judge Alicia G. Rosenberg. (jtil)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 CV71