Florida Southern District Court
Judge:Aileen M Cannon
Referred: Ryon M Mccabe
Case #: 2:25-cv-14002
Nature of Suit375 Other Statutes - False Claims Act
Cause31:3729 False Claims Act
Case Filed:Jan 05, 2025
Last checked: Wednesday Feb 19, 2025 3:45 AM EST
Defendant
Pace Machine & Tool, Inc.
Plaintiff
Christopher Debona
Represented By
Benjamin Harris Yormak
Yormak Employment & Disability Law
contact info


Docket last updated: 26 minutes ago
Tuesday, May 13, 2025
26 26 order Order Referring Motion Tue 05/13 3:37 PM
PAPERLESS ORDER: Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 636 and the Magistrate Rules of the Local Rules of the Southern District of Florida, Defendant's Motion to Dismiss17 is hereby REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Judge Ryon M. McCabe for a Report and Recommendation. Signed by Judge Aileen M. Cannon on 5/13/2025. (bbk)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 12, 2025
25 25 respm Response/Reply (Other) Mon 05/12 11:27 AM
RESPONSE to24 Statement of Claim by Pace Machine & Tool, Inc..(Gonzalez-Llorens, Rene)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit "A"
Tuesday, April 22, 2025
24 24 misc Statement Tue 04/22 12:28 PM
Statement of: of Claim by Christopher Debona re19 Order of Requirements,, Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge,, Set/Reset Deadlines, (Yormak, Benjamin)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 18, 2025
23 23 9 pgs order Order on Motion for Hearing Fri 04/18 10:24 AM
ORDER GRANTING21 JOINT MOTION AND SETTING SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE. Settlement Conference via Zoom set for 6/12/2025 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Shaniek Mills Maynard. Signed by Magistrate Judge Shaniek Mills Maynard on 4/18/2025. See attached document for full details. (ksr)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 16, 2025
22 22 respm Reply in Support of Motion Wed 04/16 1:27 PM
REPLY to Response to Motion re17 MOTION TO DISMISS13 Amended Complaint/Amended Notice of Removal FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM MOTION for More Definite Statement . filed by Pace Machine & Tool, Inc.. (Gonzalez-Llorens, Rene)
Related: [-]
21 21 misc Report Regarding Wed 04/16 9:07 AM
REPORT REGARDING Paperless Order (Doc. 20) by Christopher Debona (Yormak, Benjamin)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 11, 2025
20 20 order - Order (PAPERLESS or pdf attached) ~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines Fri 04/11 3:42 PM
PAPERLESS ORDER: This matter involving a claim brought under the FLSA has been referred to me to conduct a settlement conference19 . To facilitate matters, by Wednesday, April 16, 2025, counsel shall confer and file a joint motion with at least four proposed settlement conference dates that fall within the 28-day period after Defendant's expected filing of a response to Plaintiff's statement of claim. I will thereafter issue an order setting forth the date, time, place, and procedures for the settlement conference. For planning purposes, the settlement conference will be held virtually via Zoom and my general preference is to hold such conferences on Tuesdays and Thursdays when I do not have regularly scheduled criminal duty court. In addition, a representative with full settlement authority for each party must be available to participate in the conference. Signed by U.S. Magistrate Judge Shaniek Mills Maynard on 4/11/2025. (jrz)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 10, 2025
19 19 3 pgs order Order of Requirements Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge ~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines Fri 04/11 9:04 AM
ORDER IN ACTIONS BROUGHT UNDER THE FAIR LABOR STANDARDS ACT. ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Shaniek Mills Maynard for purposes of a settlement conference with notices (NEFs for Events only) for all filings in case. ( Statement of Claim due by 4/30/2025, Amended Complaint due by 4/30/2025.) Signed by Judge Aileen M. Cannon on 4/10/2025. See attached document for full details. (ebz)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 09, 2025
18 18 respm Response in Opposition to Motion Wed 04/09 2:53 PM
RESPONSE in Opposition re17 MOTION TO DISMISS13 Amended Complaint/Amended Notice of Removal FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM MOTION for More Definite Statement and incorporated memorandum of law filed by Christopher Debona. Replies due by 4/16/2025. (Yormak, Benjamin)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 26, 2025
17 17 motion Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim More Definite Statement Wed 03/26 2:30 PM
MOTION TO DISMISS13 Amended Complaint/Amended Notice of Removal FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM , MOTION for More Definite Statement by Pace Machine & Tool, Inc.. Responses due by 4/9/2025. (Gonzalez-Llorens, Rene)
Related: [-]
16 16 misc Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement Wed 03/26 2:27 PM
Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement - NONE disclosed by Pace Machine & Tool, Inc. (Gonzalez-Llorens, Rene)
Related: [-]
Sunday, March 23, 2025
15 15 order Order on Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Order on Motion for More Definite Statement Sun 03/23 8:21 PM
PAPERLESS ORDER denying as moot9 Defendant's Motion to Dismiss. In light of Plaintiff's13 Amended Complaint, Defendant's Motion to Dismiss9 is denied as moot. Signed by Judge Aileen M. Cannon on 3/23/2025. (bbk)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 21, 2025
14 14 respm Response in Opposition to Motion Fri 03/21 2:32 PM
RESPONSE in Opposition re9 MOTION TO DISMISS1 Complaint FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM as to Counts I and III MOTION for More Definite Statement filed by Christopher Debona. Replies due by 3/28/2025. (Yormak, Benjamin)
Related: [-]
13 13 cmp Amended Complaint/Amended Notice of Removal Fri 03/21 2:31 PM
AMENDED COMPLAINT against Pace Machine & Tool, Inc., filed by Christopher Debona.(Yormak, Benjamin)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 18, 2025
12 12 notice Notice of Attorney Appearance Tue 03/18 7:24 PM
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Patricia Anne Leonard on behalf of Pace Machine & Tool, Inc.. Attorney Patricia Anne Leonard added to party Pace Machine & Tool, Inc.(pty:dft). (Leonard, Patricia)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 13, 2025
11 11 order - Order (PAPERLESS or pdf attached) Thu 03/13 5:59 PM
PAPERLESS ORDER striking10 Defendant's Partial Answer and Affirmative Defenses as to Count II of Plaintiff's Complaint1 . The Court will direct the filing of an answer, as appropriate, following resolution of Defendant's pending Motion to Dismiss Counts I and III9 of Plaintiff's Complaint1 . Signed by Judge Aileen M. Cannon on 3/13/2025. (bbk)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 11, 2025
10 10 answer Answer to Complaint Tue 03/11 11:40 AM
ANSWER and Affirmative Defenses to Complaint as to Count II Only by Pace Machine & Tool, Inc.. (Gonzalez-Llorens, Rene)
Related: [-]
9 9 motion Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim More Definite Statement Tue 03/11 11:38 AM
MOTION TO DISMISS1 Complaint FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM as to Counts I and III , MOTION for More Definite Statement by Pace Machine & Tool, Inc.. Attorney Rene J. Gonzalez-Llorens added to party Pace Machine & Tool, Inc.(pty:dft). Responses due by 3/25/2025. (Gonzalez-Llorens, Rene)
Related: [-]
8 8 service Summons (Affidavit) Returned Executed Tue 03/11 9:01 AM
SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on1 Complaint with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by Christopher Debona. Pace Machine & Tool, Inc. served on 2/18/2025, response/answer due 3/11/2025. (Yormak, Benjamin)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 10, 2025
7 7 2 pgs order Order to Show Cause Mon 03/10 9:27 AM
ORDER TO SERVE: Show Cause Response due by 4/7/2025. Signed by Judge Aileen M. Cannon on 3/10/2025. See attached document for full details. (scn)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 30, 2025
6 6 service Summons Issued Thu 01/30 10:07 AM
Summons Issued as to Pace Machine & Tool, Inc.. (ebz)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 29, 2025
5 5 notice Notice of Filing Proposed Summons(es) Wed 01/29 9:52 PM
NOTICE of Filing Proposed Summons(es) by Christopher Debona re1 Complaint filed by Christopher Debona (Yormak, Benjamin)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Summon(s)
Monday, January 06, 2025
4 4 order - Order (PAPERLESS or pdf attached) Mon 01/06 6:34 PM
NOTICE OF COURT PRACTICES ON SEALING/REDACTION: Notwithstanding the requirements of Local Rule 5.4 and/or any protective order, the parties are prohibited from filing anything under seal or from redacting any content from a court filing or exhibit/attachment (except for the personal data identifiers listed in Section 6A of this District's CM/ECF Administrative Procedures) unless the party with a stated interest in sealing/redaction first seeks and obtains permission from the Court via a motion for leave. The motion for leave must be filed after meaningful conferral with the opposing party (or parties) and be filed publicly except as authorized by prior Court order. Additionally, the motion for leave shall specify the particularized basis for sealing the proposed material; shall describe the information/documents to be sealed with as much specificity as possible but without attaching the proposed sealed material; shall indicate the proposed duration of the seal request and the reasons why means other than sealing are unavailable or unsatisfactory; shall contain a separate certificate of conference section indicating the results of the parties' meaningful conferral; and shall be filed at last three business days before any related deadline to permit adequate Court consideration. The party seeking authorization to seal material shall not file or otherwise attach the subject material until the Court has ruled on the motion for leave. Finally, all parties are advised that mere designation of material as confidential and/or otherwise subject to a protective order does not bind the Court, does not supplant the requirements of the Local Rules on sealing, and does not otherwise relieve the party seeking sealing/redaction from justifying its request under applicable legal principals governing the presumption of public access to civil proceedings. Failure to comply with this Notice may result in immediate unsealing of any unauthorized shielded material. Signed by Judge Aileen M. Cannon on 1/6/2025. (bbk)
Related: [-]
3 3 order Clerk's Notice to Filer - ELECTRONIC CASE, SUMMONS(ES) Mon 01/06 9:29 AM
Clerk's Notice to Filer re: Summons will not be issued for the following reasons: Incorrect District name, and enable editing is corrupted. (gqa)
Related: [-]
Sunday, January 05, 2025
2 2 order Clerk's Notice of Judge Assignment and Optional Consent Mon 01/06 9:17 AM
Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Aileen M. Cannon. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Shaniek M. Maynard is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. (gqa)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Sun 01/05 10:27 PM
COMPLAINT against Pace Machine & Tool, Inc.. Filing fees $ 405.00 receipt number AFLSDC-18091599, filed by Christopher Debona.(Yormak, Benjamin)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Summon(s)