California Central District Court
Case #: 8:24-mj-00496
Case Filed:Oct 08, 2024
Terminated:Nov 06, 2024
Last checked: Sunday Jan 05, 2025 11:13 PM PST
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
Kedar S. Bhatia
Ausa - Office Of Us Attorney
contact info
TERMINATED PARTIES
Defendant
Arthit Tanjapatkul (1)
Terminated: 11/06/2024
Represented By
Sara Azari
Law Office Of Sara Azari
contact info
Michael A. Simmrin
Simmrin Law Group
contact info


Docket last updated: 01/05/2025 11:21 PM PST
Tuesday, October 08, 2024
1 1 SEALED COMPLAINT filed as to Arthit Tanjapatkul Approved by Magistrate Judge John D. Early as to Arthit Tanjapatkul (1). (jb)
Related: [-]
3 3 NOTICE OF REQUEST FOR DETENTION filed by Plaintiff USA as to Defendant Arthit Tanjapatkul. (jb)
Related: [-]
4 4 GOVERNMENTS EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR ORDER SEALING DOCUMENTS; DECLARATION OF AUSA KEDAR S. BHATIA Filed by Plaintiff USA as to Defendant Arthit Tanjapatkul. (jb)
Related: [-]
5 5 ORDER SEALING DOCUMENTS by Magistrate Judge John D. Early: granting4 EX PARTE APPLICATION to Seal Case as to Arthit Tanjapatkul (1) (jb)
Related: [-]