California Central District Court
Case #: 2:24-cr-00602
Case Filed:Oct 08, 2024
Last checked: Sunday Jan 05, 2025 11:13 PM PST
Defendant
Perry Jay Hunter (1)
Represented By
Lisa Shinar LaBarre
Federal Public Defenders Office
contact info
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
Sara B. Vargas
Ausa - Office Of Us Attorney
contact info


Docket last updated: 01/05/2025 11:22 PM PST
Monday, September 16, 2024
1 1 COMPLAINT filed as to Defendant Perry Hunter in violation of 18:2252A(a)(5)(B),(b)(2). Approved by Magistrate Judge Stephanie S. Christensen as to Perry Hunter (1). (jb) [2:24-mj-05616-DUTY]
Related: [-]
3 3 NOTICE OF REQUEST FOR DETENTION filed by Plaintiff USA as to Defendant Perry Hunter. (jb) [2:24-mj-05616-DUTY]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 25, 2024
4 4 5 pgs Rule 5(c)(3) Documents Received as to Perry Hunter. (jb) [2:24-mj-05616-DUTY]
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 08, 2024
5 5 6 pgs INDICTMENT Filed as to Perry Jay Hunter (1) count(s) 1, 2, 3. Offense occurred in LA. (mhe)
Related: [-]
6 6 2 pgs CASE SUMMARY filed by AUSA Sara B Vargas as to Defendant Perry Jay Hunter; defendants Year of Birth: 1962 USMS# REG 37044-511 (mhe)
Related: [-]