California Central District Court
Judge:Autumn D Spaeth
Case #: 8:25-cv-00019
Nature of Suit880 Civil Rights - Defend Trade Secrets Act of 2016 (DTSA)
Cause18:1836(a) Injunction against Misappropriation of Trade Secrets
Case Filed:Jan 06, 2025
Terminated:Apr 07, 2025
Last checked: Thursday Feb 20, 2025 1:25 AM PST
Defendant
Haussmann Financial Inc
Represented By
Marc S. Williams
Cohen Williams LLP
contact info
Kathleen M Erskine
Cohen Williams LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
KiHo Choi
Represented By
Mahdi Ibrahim
Shustak Reynolds And Partners, P.C.
contact info
Erwin J. Shustak
Shustak Reynolds And Partners P.C.
contact info
Plaintiff
John Dunphy
Represented By
Mahdi Ibrahim
Shustak Reynolds And Partners, P.C.
contact info
Erwin J. Shustak
Shustak Reynolds And Partners P.C.
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/02/2025 11:59 PM PDT
Monday, April 07, 2025
25 25 notice Voluntary Dismissal of a Case (Pursuant to FRCP 41a (1)) Mon 04/07 12:26 PM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal filed by Plaintiffs KiHo Choi, John Dunphy. Dismissal is without prejudice. (Ibrahim, Mahdi)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 20, 2025
24 24 notice Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties Thu 03/20 4:11 PM
NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Haussmann Financial Inc, identifying John Dunphy; KiHo Choi; Haussmann Financial, Inc.; Trudy Haussmann. (Williams, Marc)
Related: [-]
23 23 motion Dismiss Case Thu 03/20 4:08 PM
NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case filed by Defendant Haussmann Financial Inc. Motion set for hearing on 4/30/2025 at 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Autumn D. Spaeth. (Williams, Marc)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support of Motion to Dismiss,
Att: 2 Proposed Order
Thursday, March 06, 2025
22 22 othcmp Amended Complaint/Petition Thu 03/06 4:23 PM
FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT against Defendant Haussmann Financial Inc amending Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),1 , filed by Plaintiffs John Dunphy, KiHo Choi(Ibrahim, Mahdi)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1,
Att: 2 Exhibit 2
Thursday, February 27, 2025
21 21 order Extension of Time to Amend Thu 02/27 11:16 AM
ORDER GRANTING STIPULATION TO FILE AMENDED COMPLAINT by Magistrate Judge Autumn D. Spaeth: Having reviewed the Parties' Stipulation to File Amended Complaint20 , and good cause appearing, the Court ORDERS as follows: 1.Plaintiffs may file an Amended Complaint by or before March 6, 2025; and 2. Defendant shall have 14 days from the filing of the Amended Complaint to file a response, including, but not limited to, a Motion to Dismiss under Rule 12(b). (kh)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 26, 2025
20 20 stip Extension of Time to Amend Wed 02/26 11:23 AM
Joint STIPULATION for Extension of Time to Amend Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),1 filed by Plaintiffs John Dunphy, KiHo Choi.(Ibrahim, Mahdi)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Monday, February 24, 2025
19 19 notice Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel (G-123) Mon 02/24 2:30 PM
Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Brittany L. Lane counsel for Defendant Haussmann Financial Inc. Adding Brittany L. Lane as counsel of record for Haussmann Financial, Inc. for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant Haussmann Financial, Inc.. (Attorney Brittany L. Lane added to party Haussmann Financial Inc(pty:dft))(Lane, Brittany)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 21, 2025
18 18 order Continue Fri 02/21 12:34 PM
ORDER GRANTING STIPULATION TO CONTINUE SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Magistrate Judge Autumn D. Spaeth: Having reviewed the Parties' Stipulation to Continue the Scheduling Conference17 , and good cause appearing, the Court ORDERS the Scheduling Conference currently set for February 26, 2025, at 10:00 a.m. to be continued to April 9, 2025, at 10:00 a.m. (kh)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 20, 2025
17 17 stip Continue Thu 02/20 3:23 PM
Joint STIPULATION to Continue Scheduling Conference from 02/26/2025 at 10:00 a.m. to 04/09/2025 at 10:00 a.m. Re: Order,, Set/Reset Hearing,13 filed by Plaintiffs John Dunphy, KiHo Choi.(Ibrahim, Mahdi)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A,
Att: 2 Exhibit B,
Att: 3 Proposed Order
Thursday, February 13, 2025
16 16 service Proof of Service (subsequent documents) Thu 02/13 11:14 AM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Plaintiffs John Dunphy, KiHo Choi, re Change of Lead Counsel15 served on February 13, 2025. (Ibrahim, Mahdi)
Related: [-]
15 15 notice Change of Lead Counsel Thu 02/13 11:09 AM
NOTICE of Change of Lead Counsel changing lead counsel from Erwin J. Shustak to Mahdi M. Ibrahim. filed by Plaintiffs John Dunphy, KiHo Choi, (Ibrahim, Mahdi)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 12, 2025
14 14 misc Report Wed 02/12 3:37 PM
REPORT of Joint 26(f) filed by Plaintiffs John Dunphy, KiHo Choi. (Ibrahim, Mahdi)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 29, 2025
13 13 9 pgs order Order ~Util - Set/Reset Hearings Thu 01/30 9:01 AM
ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Magistrate Judge Autumn D. Spaeth. Scheduling Conference set for 2/26/2025 at 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Autumn D. Spaeth. As provided in Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 26(f), the parties shall meet at least 21 days before the scheduling conference and file a Joint 26(f) Report ("Report") no later than 14 days before the date set for the scheduling conference. (see document for further details) (hr)
Related: [-]
12 12 7 pgs order Order Thu 01/30 8:59 AM
INITIAL STANDING ORDER FOLLOWING ASSIGNMENT OF CIVIL CASE TO JUDGE SPAETH AND CONSENT BY THE PARTIES by Magistrate Judge Autumn D. Spaeth. (see document for details) (hr)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 27, 2025
11 11 textonly MJDAP Opt-Out Expired Mon 01/27 10:54 AM
The period to decline consent to a magistrate judge has expired. No timely declination of consent has been received by the Court. Each party is deemed to have knowingly and voluntarily consented to proceed before a Magistrate Judge for all purposes pursuant to the Local Rules. The case shall now proceed before a Magistrate Judge for all purposes. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (kh)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 23, 2025
10 10 stip Extending Time to Answer (30 days or less) Thu 01/23 8:57 AM
STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Haussmann Financial Inc answer now due 3/3/2025, re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),1 filed by Defendant Haussmann Financial Inc.(Williams, Marc)
Related: [-]
9 9 notice Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel (G-123) Thu 01/23 8:45 AM
Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Kathleen M Erskine counsel for Defendant Haussmann Financial Inc. Adding Kathleen M. Erskine as counsel of record for Defendant Haussmann Financial Inc. for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant Haussmann Financial Inc.. (Attorney Kathleen M Erskine added to party Haussmann Financial Inc(pty:dft))(Erskine, Kathleen)
Related: [-]
8 8 notice Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel (G-123) Thu 01/23 8:40 AM
Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Marc S. Williams counsel for Defendant Haussmann Financial Inc. Adding Marc S. Williams as counsel of record for Defendant Haussmann Financial Inc. for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant Haussmann Financial Inc.. (Attorney Marc S. Williams added to party Haussmann Financial Inc(pty:dft))(Williams, Marc)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 09, 2025
7 7 service Service of Summons and Complaint Returned Executed (21 days) Thu 01/09 4:44 PM
PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff John Dunphy, KiHo Choi, upon Defendant Haussmann Financial Inc served on 1/9/2025, answer due 1/30/2025. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Trudy D. Haussmann, agent for service of process in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by substituted service at business address and by also mailing a copy (Shustak, Erwin)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 06, 2025
6 6 service Summons Issued (Attorney Civil Case Opening) Mon 01/06 3:59 PM
21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),1 as to Defendant Haussmann Financial Inc. (car)
Related: [-]
5 5 misc Notice of Assignment to U.S. Magistrate Judge and Declination of Consent CV-20B optional html form Mon 01/06 3:22 PM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to a U.S. Magistrate Judge and Declination of Consent. This case has been randomly assigned to Magistrate Judge Autumn D. Spaeth. (car)
Related: [-]
4 4 notice Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties Mon 01/06 11:54 AM
NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiffs John Dunphy, KiHo Choi, identifying Trudy D. Haussmann and Osaic Wealth, Inc. (f/k/a Securities America, Inc.). (Shustak, Erwin)
Related: [-]
3 3 1 pgs notice Summons Request Mon 01/06 11:24 AM
Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),1 filed by Plaintiffs John Dunphy, KiHo Choi. (Shustak, Erwin)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) Mon 01/06 10:54 AM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiffs John Dunphy, KiHo Choi. (Shustak, Erwin)
Related: [-]
1 1 16 pgs cmp Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) Mon 01/06 10:33 AM
COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-38857854 - Fee: $405, filed by Plaintiffs John Dunphy, KiHo Choi. (Attorney Erwin J. Shustak added to party John Dunphy(pty:pla), Attorney Erwin J. Shustak added to party KiHo Choi(pty:pla))(Shustak, Erwin)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1,
Att: 2 Exhibit 2