Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 6:24-bk-02830

Florida Middle Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Tiffany P Geyer
Case #: 6:25-ap-00001
Nature of Suit81 Bankruptcy - Subordination of claim or interest
12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference
13 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §548 fraudulent transfer
Case Filed:Jan 05, 2025
Last checked: never
Defendant
Patrick Mathes
1565 Mayflower Ct .
Winter Park, FL 32792
Represented By
Patrick Mathes
contact info
Defendant
Hazel Mathes
1565 Mayflower Ct.
Winter Park, FL 32792
Represented By
Hazel Mathes
contact info
Defendant
Pazel Investments LLC
Nardella & Nardella, PLLC 135 W. Central Blvd. Suite 300
Orlando, FL 32801
Represented By
Pazel Investments LLC
contact info
Defendant
Michael Mathes
432 Bouchelle Dr, Unit 104
New Smyrna Beach, FL 32169
Represented By
Michael Mathes
contact info
Defendant
Marcia Mathes
432 Bouchelle Dr, Suite 104
New Smyrna Beach, FL 32169
Represented By
Marcia Mathes
contact info
Defendant
Nathaniel Mathes
136 Sleepy Hollow
Essex Junction, VT 05452
Represented By
Nathaniel Mathes
contact info
Defendant
Allison Mathes
136 Sleepy Hollow Rd.
Essex Junction, VT 05452
Represented By
Allison Mathes
contact info
Plaintiff
Sterling Credit Corp.
222 S Westmonte Dr Ste 301
Altamonte Springs, FL 32714
Represented By
Robert D Wilcox
Wilcox Law Firm
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/12/2025 1:05 PM EDT
Wednesday, May 07, 2025
13 13 court CHAP Pro Memo - Hearing Held Wed 05/07 9:45 PM
Hearing Proceeding Memo: Hearing Held - APPEARANCES: Robert Wilcox (Plaintiff), Frank M Wolff (Defendant), RULING: Oral Ruling Scheduled 7/9/2025 at 2:00 PM (announced as 1:30 PM in open court) 1) Pretrial Conference Complaint by Sterling Credit Corp. against Patrick Mathes, Hazel Mathes, Pazel Investments LLC, Michael Mathes, Marcia Mathes, Nathaniel Mathes, Allison Mathes (Doc #1) Preliminary Hearing 2) Defendant's Amended Motion to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding Counts 2, 3, 4, 5 and 6 of the Complaint (Doc #8): Matter Taken Under Advisement, Plaintiff's Response (Doc #9), (NH) Proposed Orders, if applicable, should be submitted within three days after the date of the hearing - Local Rule 9072-1(c). This docket entry/document is not an official order of the Court . (Bill)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 06, 2025
12 12 order Generic Order Tue 05/06 9:51 AM
Order Granting Motion to Appear Remotely at Hearing Related [+]. Service Instructions: Robert Wilcox is directed to serve a copy of this order on interested parties and file a proof of service within 3 days of entry of the order. (Alison)
Related: [-] 11
Monday, May 05, 2025
11 11 motion Z - Generic Motion (use only when there is no specific motion event) (AP) Mon 05/05 1:20 PM
Motion Requesting Plaintiff's Counsel Be Permitted to Appear Remotely at Hearing Scheduled for 1:30 PM on May 7, 2025 Filed by Robert D Wilcox on behalf of Plaintiff Sterling Credit Corp.. (Wilcox, Robert) Modified Text on 5/6/2025 (RLS)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 10, 2025
court Mon 03/10 3:24 PM
Preliminary Hearing Scheduled for 05/07/2025 01:30 PM Orlando, FL - Courtroom 6A, 6th Floor, George C. Young Courthouse, 400 W. Washington Street. Re: Amended Motion to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding Counts 2, 3, 4, 5 and 6 of the Complaint Contains negative notice. Doc8 . This entry will serve as the official notification of hearing from the court. Related [+]. (Bill)
Related: [-] 8
Friday, March 07, 2025
10 10 notice Notice (DO NOT USE for appearances or hearings) Fri 03/07 3:28 PM
Notice of Intent to Serve Subpoena Filed by Frank M Wolff on behalf of Defendants Allison Mathes, Hazel Mathes, Marcia Mathes, Michael Mathes, Nathaniel Mathes, Patrick Mathes, Pazel Investments LLC. (Wolff, Frank)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 04, 2025
9 9 answer Response Tue 03/04 1:46 PM
Response to Amended Motion to Dismiss Filed by Robert D Wilcox on behalf of Plaintiff Sterling Credit Corp. Related [+]. (Wilcox, Robert)
Related: [-] 8
Thursday, February 06, 2025
8 8 motion Motion to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding Thu 02/06 3:11 PM
Amended Motion to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding Counts 2, 3, 4, 5 and 6 of the Complaint Contains negative notice. Filed by Frank M Wolff on behalf of Defendants Allison Mathes, Hazel Mathes, Marcia Mathes, Michael Mathes, Nathaniel Mathes, Patrick Mathes, Pazel Investments LLC Related [+]. (Wolff, Frank)
Related: [-] 5 ,1
Wednesday, February 05, 2025
7 7 notice Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Wed 02/05 3:55 PM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice as Additional Counsel Filed by Keenan David Smith on behalf of Defendants Allison Mathes, Hazel Mathes, Marcia Mathes, Michael Mathes, Nathaniel Mathes, Patrick Mathes, Pazel Investments LLC. (Smith, Keenan)
Related: [-]
6 6 notice Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Wed 02/05 3:53 PM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice as Additional Counsel Filed by Paul N Mascia on behalf of Defendants Allison Mathes, Hazel Mathes, Marcia Mathes, Michael Mathes, Nathaniel Mathes, Patrick Mathes, Pazel Investments LLC. (Mascia, Paul)
Related: [-]
5 5 motion Motion to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding Wed 02/05 3:48 PM
Motion to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding Counts II, III and IV of the Complaint Contains negative notice. Filed by Frank M Wolff on behalf of Defendants Allison Mathes, Hazel Mathes, Marcia Mathes, Michael Mathes, Nathaniel Mathes, Patrick Mathes, Pazel Investments LLC Related [+]. (Wolff, Frank)
Related: [-] 1
Monday, January 13, 2025
4 4 misc Summons Service Executed Mon 01/13 4:28 PM
Service Executed on Frank M. Wolff, Esq. for all Defendants of Summons, Complaint, Local Rule 7001-1. Filed by Robert D Wilcox on behalf of Plaintiff Sterling Credit Corp. Related [+]. (Wilcox, Robert)
Related: [-] 2
3 3 notice Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Mon 01/13 10:43 AM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Filed by Frank M Wolff on behalf of Defendants Allison Mathes, Hazel Mathes, Marcia Mathes, Michael Mathes, Nathaniel Mathes, Patrick Mathes, Pazel Investments LLC. (Wolff, Frank)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 07, 2025
2 2 court ADI - Summons Issued (auto) Tue 01/07 3:56 PM
Summons issued on Patrick Mathes, Hazel Mathes, Pazel Investments LLC, Michael Mathes, Marcia Mathes, Nathaniel Mathes, Allison Mathes along with Local Rule 7001-1 - Adversary Proceedings - Procedures. Answer Due 02/06/2025. If one or more defendants are the United States or an officer or agency thereof, add an additional five days to the Answer Due date. A Pretrial/Status Conference will be held on May 7, 2025, at 1:30 PM. A copy of this summons must be included when filing proof of service of this summons. (ADIclerk)
Related: [-]
Sunday, January 05, 2025
1 1 21 pgs cmp ADI - Complaint - Original Sun 01/05 10:38 PM
Complaint by Sterling Credit Corp. against Patrick Mathes, Hazel Mathes, Pazel Investments LLC, Michael Mathes, Marcia Mathes, Nathaniel Mathes, Allison Mathes. Filing Fee Not Required. Nature of Suit: [81 (Subordination of claim or interest)],[13 Related [+]],[12]. (Wilcox, Robert)
Related: [-] covery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfercovery of money/property - 547 preference
Att: 1 Exhibit A
Att: 2 Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor B
Att: 3 Exhibit Composite Exhibit C