Florida Middle District Court
Judge:Mary S Scriven
Referred: Christopher P Tuite
Case #: 8:25-cv-00021
Nature of Suit485 Other Statutes - Telephone Consumer Protection Act
Cause47:227 Restrictions of Use of Telephone Equipment
Case Filed:Jan 06, 2025
Last checked: Thursday Feb 20, 2025 4:40 AM EST
Defendant
Regal Capital Group, LLC
Plaintiff
Nigel Lucombe
Represented By
Faaris Kamal Uddin
The Law Offices Of Jibrael S. Hindi
contact info
Gerald D Lane, Jr
The Law Offices Of Jibrael S. Hindi, PLLC
contact info
Zane Charles Hedaya
The Law Offices Of Jibrael S. Hindi
contact info
TERMINATED PARTIES
Defendant
Regal Business Group, LLC
Terminated: 02/04/2025


Docket last updated: 05/05/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Wednesday, April 16, 2025
14 14 order Order on Motion to Dismiss Order on Motion to Strike Wed 04/16 9:38 AM
ENDORSED ORDER DENYING AS MOOT 9 Regal Business Group, LLC's Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint, and 10 Plaintiff's Motion to Strike Defendant Regal Business Group, LLC's Pro Se Motion to Dismiss. In light of Plaintiff's having filed an Amended Complaint naming Regal Capital Group, LLC as the sole Defendant in this action, (Dkt. 11), Regal Business Group, LLC's motions are DENIED as MOOT. This case shall proceed in the normal course as to Defendant Regal Capital Group, LLC only. Signed by Judge Mary S. Scriven on 4/16/2025. (DEJ)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 03, 2025
13 13 service Summons issued Thu 04/03 12:13 PM
SUMMONS issued as to Regal Capital Group, LLC. (EVK)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 02, 2025
12 12 service Proposed summons Wed 04/02 4:00 PM
PROPOSED summons to be issued by Nigel Lucombe. (Uddin, Faaris)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 04, 2025
11 11 cmp Amended Complaint Tue 02/04 11:12 AM
AMENDED COMPLAINT against Regal Capital Group, LLC with Jury Demand. filed by Nigel Lucombe.(Uddin, Faaris)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Summons
Monday, January 27, 2025
10 10 motion Strike Mon 01/27 4:13 PM
MOTION to Strike9 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs Complaint by Nigel Lucombe. (Uddin, Faaris)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 21, 2025
9 9 motion Dismiss Tue 01/21 11:53 AM
MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint by Regal Business Group, LLC. (e-portal) (JKB)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit
Wednesday, January 08, 2025
8 8 notice Notice of a Related Action Wed 01/08 1:47 PM
NOTICE of a related action per Local Rule 1.07(c) by Nigel Lucombe. Related case(s): No (Uddin, Faaris)
Related: [-]
7 7 notice Notice of Lead Counsel Designation Wed 01/08 1:47 PM
NOTICE of Lead Counsel Designation by Faaris Kamal Uddin on behalf of Nigel Lucombe. Lead Counsel: Faaris K. Uddin. (Uddin, Faaris)
Related: [-]
6 6 misc Disclosure Statement - LR 3.03 and FRCP 7.1 Wed 01/08 1:46 PM
DISCLOSURE STATEMENT under Rule 7.1, Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, and Local Rule 3.03 by Nigel Lucombe identifying Other Affiliate Jibrael S Hindi for Nigel Lucombe.. (Uddin, Faaris)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 07, 2025
5 5 notice Notice of Referral to IDEAL Program Tue 01/07 10:29 AM
NOTICE of Order Referring Case to U.S. Magistrate Judge for IDEAL Program. See attached Order for important deadlines and information about the IDEAL Program. (AMS)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 06, 2025
4 4 service Summons issued Mon 01/06 2:25 PM
SUMMONS issued as to Regal Business Group, LLC. (BD)
Related: [-]
3 3 notice Notice to Counsel of Local Rule Mon 01/06 11:58 AM
NOTICE TO COUNSEL Gerald Lane, Zane Hedaya, and Faaris Uddin of Local Rule 2.02(a), which states, "The first paper filed on behalf of a party must designate only one lead counsel who - unless the party changes the designation - remains lead counsel throughout the action." Counsel must file a Notice of Lead Counsel Designation identifying lead counsel. (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (ARL)
Related: [-]
2 2 utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Mon 01/06 11:58 AM
NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Mary S. Scriven and Magistrate Judge Christopher P. Tuite. New case number: 8:25-cv-21-MSS-CPT. (ARL)
Related: [-]
1 1 12 pgs cmp Complaint Mon 01/06 11:07 AM
COMPLAINT against Regal Business Group, LLC with Jury Demand (Filing fee $405 receipt number AFLMDC-22878349) filed by Nigel Lucombe.(Uddin, Faaris) Modified text on 1/6/2025 (BD)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Proposed Summons