Michigan Western District Court
Judge:Hala Y Jarbou
Referred: Phillip J Green
Case #: 1:25-cv-00013
Nature of Suit442 Civil Rights - Employment
Cause42:2003 Job Discrimination
Case Filed:Jan 06, 2025
Last checked: Thursday Feb 20, 2025 4:24 AM EST
defendant
Rob Boldwin
Represented By
John Stephen Gilliam
Jackson Lewis P.C. (southfield)
contact info
defendant
Lees Famous Recipe Chicken
Represented By
John Stephen Gilliam
Jackson Lewis P.C. (southfield)
contact info
defendant
Deb Middlerbrock
Represented By
John Stephen Gilliam
Jackson Lewis P.C. (southfield)
contact info
plaintiff
Courtney Thomas
1116 Summit St.
Kalamazoo, MI 49006


Docket last updated: 05/15/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Monday, April 28, 2025
19 19 motion Report and Recommendation Mon 04/28 9:32 AM
REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION re10 ; objections to R&R due within 14 days; signed by Magistrate Judge Phillip J. Green (jkw)
Related: [-]
utility Copies Mailed Mon 04/28 3:49 PM
Copy of Report and Recommendation19 sent via U.S. Mail to Courtney Thomas (pjw)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 18, 2025
18 18 respm Reply to Response to Motion Fri 04/18 2:06 PM
REPLY to response to motion10 with certificate of service filed by Lees Famous Recipe Chicken, Deb Middlerbrock, Rob Boldwin (Gilliam, John) Modified text on 4/18/2025 (pjw)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 07, 2025
17 17 respm Response to Motion Tue 04/08 12:46 PM
AMENDED RESPONSE TO MOTION to dismiss for failure to state a claim 9 , and AMENDED MOTION to dismiss for failure to state a claim 10 (titled Motion against dismissal) filed by Courtney Thomas (pjw) Modified text on 4/8/2025 (pjw)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 04, 2025
16 16 respm Response to Motion Mon 04/07 1:18 PM
RESPONSE TO MOTION to dismiss for failure to state a claim 9 , AMENDED MOTION to dismiss for failure to state a claim 10 (titled Motion against dismissal) filed by Courtney Thomas (pjw)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 19, 2025
15 15 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Wed 03/19 11:16 AM
ORDER granting13 motion for extension of time to file response/reply re10 ; signed by Magistrate Judge Phillip J. Green (jkw)
Related: [-]
utility Copies Mailed Wed 03/19 1:26 PM
Copy of Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply15 sent via U.S. Mail to Courtney Thomas (eod)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 18, 2025
14 14 respm Response to Motion Tue 03/18 1:42 PM
RESPONSE TO MOTION for extension of time to file response/reply re10 13 with certificate of service filed by Lees Famous Recipe Chicken, Deb Middlerbrock, Rob Boldwin (Gilliam, John) Modified text on 3/18/2025 (eod)
Related: [-]
notice Attorney Appearance Tue 03/18 1:40 PM
(NON-DOCUMENT) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE of Emily M. Petroski on behalf of defendants Lees Famous Recipe Chicken, Deb Middlerbrock, Rob Boldwin (Petroski, Emily)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 17, 2025
13 13 motion Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Mon 03/17 4:16 PM
MOTION for extension of time to file response/reply re10 by plaintiff Courtney Thomas; (pjw)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 11, 2025
12 12 notice Change of Address - Prisoner or Pro Se Wed 03/12 8:02 AM
CHANGE OF ADDRESS for plaintiff Courtney Thomas to 207 Paisley Ct. Kalamazoo, MI 49007 (pjw)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 06, 2025
11 11 notice Corporate Disclosure Statement Thu 03/06 9:58 PM
CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Lees Famous Recipe Chicken (Gilliam, John)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 14, 2025
10 10 motion Dismiss/Failure to State a Claim Fri 02/14 5:52 PM
AMENDED MOTION to dismiss for failure to state a claim by defendants Lees Famous Recipe Chicken, Deb Middlerbrock, Rob Boldwin; (Gilliam, John)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1
9 9 motion Dismiss/Failure to State a Claim Fri 02/14 4:27 PM
MOTION to dismiss for failure to state a claim by defendants Lees Famous Recipe Chicken, Deb Middlerbrock, Rob Boldwin; (Gilliam, John)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1
Friday, January 24, 2025
8 8 service Summons Returned Executed Mon 01/27 7:56 AM
SUMMONS returned executed; Rob Boldwin served on 1/24/2025, answer due 2/14/2025; Lees Famous Recipe Chicken served on 1/24/2025, answer due 2/14/2025; Deb Middlerbrock served on 1/24/2025, answer due 2/14/2025 (pjw)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 23, 2025
service Summons Issued and Delivered to Marshal Thu 01/23 9:29 AM
SUMMONS ISSUED as to Rob Boldwin, Lees Famous Recipe Chicken, Deb Middlerbrock and delivered to US Marshal for service (pjw)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 21, 2025
7 7 cmp Amended Complaint Tue 01/21 1:22 PM
FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT against Rob Boldwin, Lees Famous Recipe Chicken, Deb Middlerbrock filed by Courtney Thomas (pjw)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 14, 2025
utility Copies Mailed Tue 01/14 1:56 PM
Copy of Order6 sent via U.S. Mail to Courtney Thomas (klb)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 13, 2025
6 6 2 pgs order Order Mon 01/13 9:24 PM
ORDER re1 directing Plaintiff to file an Amended Complaint within 21 days; signed by Magistrate Judge Phillip J. Green (jkw)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 07, 2025
utility Copies Mailed Tue 01/07 8:10 AM
Copy of Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge5 , Order to Proceed In Forma Pauperis4 and Receipt of Case Notice3 sent via U.S. Mail to Courtney Thomas (pjw)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 06, 2025
5 5 1 pgs order Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge Mon 01/06 7:03 PM
ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Phillip J. Green; signed by Chief Judge Hala Y. Jarbou (aks)
Related: [-]
4 4 2 pgs order Order to Proceed In Forma Pauperis Mon 01/06 2:32 PM
ORDER granting plaintiff leave to proceed in forma pauperis; signed by Magistrate Judge Phillip J. Green (jkw)
Related: [-]
3 3 misc Receipt of Case Notice Mon 01/06 1:49 PM
NOTICE of receipt of case (pjw)
Related: [-]
2 2 motion Application to Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees Mon 01/06 1:48 PM
APPLICATION TO PROCEED without prepayment of fees and affidavit (pjw)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Mon 01/06 1:47 PM
COMPLAINT against Rob Boldwin, Lees Famous Recipe Chicken, Deb Middlerbrock filed by Courtney Thomas (pjw)
Related: [-]