New York Eastern District Court
Judge:Natasha C Merle
Referred: Vera M Scanlon
Case #: 1:25-cv-00079
Nature of Suit470 Other Statutes - Racketeer Influenced and Corrupt Organizations
Cause18:1962 Racketeering (RICO) Act
Case Filed:Jan 06, 2025
Last checked: Thursday Feb 20, 2025 4:28 AM EST
Defendant
Phuoc Van Tran
20644 Conrail Road
Bridgeville, DE 19933
Defendant
SSL Transportation LLC
Represented By
Shuyang Xie
contact info
Defendant
Does Numbers 1 through 10 Inclusive
Defendant
Zengbin Yao
744 45th Street
Brooklyn, NY 11220
Defendant
Qiao Wen Wu
1606 South Atlantic Blvd, Apt A
Alhambra, CA 94086
Defendant
Jiguo Wu
5621 Decatur Boulevard
Indianapolis, IN 46241
Defendant
Guizhen Wang
299 West Washington Ave, Apt 311
Sunnyvale, CA 94086
Defendant
Longjian Jiang
Defendant
Xinbin Tian
Defendant
Yongze Song
1606 South Atlantic Blvd, Apt A
Alhambra, CA 91803
Represented By
Shuyang Xie
contact info
Defendant
Linfeng Song
13654 NE 83rd CT
Redmond, WA 98502
Represented By
Shuyang Xie
contact info
Defendant
Shumin Liu
Defendant
Lianhua Li
1606 South Atlantic Blvd, Apt A
Alhambra, CA 91803
Represented By
Shuyang Xie
contact info
Defendant
Zhen Lei
Plaintiff
XianDong Shi
4160 Main Street, #312 Suite 208a
Flushing, NY 11355
Represented By
Ying Liu
Liu & Shields LLP
contact info
Carolyn Shields
Liu & Shields LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 76 minutes ago
Friday, May 09, 2025
order Scheduling Order Fri 05/09 6:02 PM
ORDER. As discussed during the conference, Plaintiff is encouraged to investigate whether proper service has been made upon those Defendants for whom Plaintiff has contact information, but who have not yet appeared. Defendants must answer or otherwise respond to the amended complaint by 5/30/2025. Discovery is stayed during pendency of the anticipated motion practice. The parties are reminded of their preservation obligations during the stay of discovery. If new information arises during the upcoming premotion conference to indicate that discovery would be advisable, the parties may enter a joint letter proposing a discovery schedule. Within 10 days of the decision on the motion to dismiss, if this action is not dismissed, the parties must file a joint letter on ECF proposing a discovery schedule. A referral to the Court-annexed mediation program will not issue at this time. If the parties desire such a referral after motion practice is complete, they may request a referral to the Court-annexed mediation program at any time by filing a joint letter on ECF. The Court will mail this Order and the full public docket to non-appearing Defendants: Jiguo Wu at 5621 Decatur Blvd, Indianapolis, Indiana 46241; Shumin Liu 717 East 9th St Apt 5F, New York, NY 10009; Xinbin Tian, 41-43 149 Place, Floor 2, Flushing, NY 11355; and Longjian Jiang, 3312 202nd Street, Bayside, NY 11361. These non-appearing Defendants are strongly encouraged to participate in this litigation. If they do not, Plaintiff may request a default judgment, and the Court may enter a judgment against these Defendants based upon Plaintiff's representation. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Vera M. Scanlon on 5/9/2025. (SH)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 08, 2025
34 34 misc Letter Thu 05/08 10:32 AM
Letter to Judge Scanlon by Zengbin Yao (Barnett, Keith)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 07, 2025
minutes Initial Conference Hearing Wed 05/07 12:44 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Vera M. Scanlon: Initial Conference held on 5/6/2025. Ying Liu and Carolyn Shields appeared on behalf of Plaintiff. Shuyang Xie appeared on behalf of Defendants Yongze Song, Lianhua Li, Linfeng Song, and corporate Defendant SSL Transportation LLC. Michelle Aulivola and Nicole Lynn Bohler appeared on behalf of Defendant Phuoc Van Tran. Attorney for Zengbin Yao, Keith S. Barnett, did not appear. See separate docket entry for Order issuing from this proceeding. (FTR Log #15:18-15:49.) (SH)
Related: [-]
order Order on Motion for Pre Motion Conference Wed 05/07 1:03 PM
ORDER re33 AMENDED COMPLAINT filed by XianDong Shi -- In light of plaintiff's amended complaint33 , defendants' pre-motion conference requests21 ,28 are denied with leave to renew. Ordered by Judge Natasha C. Merle on 5/7/2025. (AG)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 06, 2025
33 33 cmp Amended Complaint Tue 05/06 2:19 PM
AMENDED COMPLAINT against Does Numbers 1 through 10 Inclusive, Longjian Jiang, Zhen Lei, Lianhua Li, Shumin Liu, SSL Transportation LLC, Linfeng Song, Yongze Song, Xinbin Tian, Phuoc Van Tran, Guizhen Wang, Jiguo Wu, Qiao Wen Wu, Zengbin Yao, filed by XianDong Shi. (Shields, Carolyn)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 28, 2025
32 32 misc Proposed Scheduling Order Mon 04/28 3:02 PM
Proposed Scheduling Order by XianDong Shi (Liu, Ying)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 09, 2025
order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Wed 04/09 3:49 PM
ORDER. The Court finds the motion for an extension of time to respond to the complaint at ECF No.30 to be moot. Per Rule III(5) of the District Judge's Individual Rules, "[s]ervice of the letter-motion [for a pre-motion conference] within the time requirements of Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 or 56, or any other applicable filing or service deadline, shall constitute timely service of a motion made pursuant to those provisions." Defendant Phuoc Van Tran timely filed a pre-motion conference letter. See 3/20/2025 Order; ECF No.28 . Ordered by Magistrate Judge Vera M. Scanlon on 4/9/2025. (SH)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 04, 2025
31 31 notice Notice of Appearance Fri 04/04 12:23 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Keith S. Barnett on behalf of Zengbin Yao (aty to be noticed) (Barnett, Keith)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 03, 2025
30 30 motion Extension of Time to File Answer Thu 04/03 7:30 PM
Letter MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Phuoc Van Tran. (Bohler, Nicole)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 01, 2025
29 29 respm Response to Motion Tue 04/01 9:15 PM
RESPONSE to Motion re28 MOTION for pre motion conference filed by XianDong Shi. (Shields, Carolyn)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 26, 2025
utility Incorrect Case-Document Information Wed 03/26 9:46 AM
Incorrect Case/Document/Entry Information re28 Letter electronically filed by Nicole Bohler, Esq. Requests for a pre-motion conference addressed to Judge Merle must be filed using the Pre Motion Conference event found in the Motions section of the Motions and Related Filings section. No corrective action is required at this time. Do not refile your document . (AG)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 25, 2025
28 28 misc Letter Tue 03/25 10:49 AM
Letter MOTION by Phuoc Van Tran (Bohler, Nicole)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 21, 2025
27 27 respm Response to Motion Fri 03/21 8:24 AM
RESPONSE to Motion re21 Letter MOTION for pre motion conference filed by XianDong Shi. (Shields, Carolyn)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 20, 2025
order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Thu 03/20 2:40 PM
ORDER granting26 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Defendant Phuoc Van Tran will answer or otherwise respond by 4/4/2025. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Vera M. Scanlon on 3/20/2025. (SH)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 18, 2025
26 26 misc Letter Tue 03/18 1:30 PM
Letter MOTION by Phuoc Van Tran (Aulivola, Michelle)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 17, 2025
25 25 notice Notice of Appearance Mon 03/17 10:50 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Nicole Lynn Bohler on behalf of Phuoc Van Tran (aty to be noticed) (Bohler, Nicole)
Related: [-]
24 24 notice Notice of Appearance Mon 03/17 10:16 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Michelle Aulivola on behalf of Phuoc Van Tran (aty to be noticed) (Aulivola, Michelle)
Related: [-]
23 23 notice Notice of Appearance Mon 03/17 10:14 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by David H. Besso on behalf of Phuoc Van Tran (aty to be noticed) (Besso, David)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 14, 2025
22 22 service Summons Returned Executed Fri 03/14 4:28 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by XianDong Shi. SSL Transportation LLC served on 2/24/2025, answer due 4/2/2025. (Liu, Ying)
Related: [-]
21 21 motion Pre Motion Conference Fri 03/14 2:54 PM
Letter MOTION for pre motion conference by Lianhua Li, SSL Transportation LLC, Linfeng Song, Yongze Song. (Xie, Shuyang)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 13, 2025
20 20 service Summons Returned Executed Thu 03/13 12:54 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by XianDong Shi. SSL Transportation LLC served on 3/12/2025, answer due 4/2/2025. (Liu, Ying)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 10, 2025
19 19 service Summons Returned Executed Mon 03/10 2:09 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by XianDong Shi. Longjian Jiang served on 3/7/2025, answer due 3/28/2025. (Liu, Ying)
Related: [-]
18 18 service Summons Returned Executed Mon 03/10 2:06 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by XianDong Shi. Yongze Song served on 3/7/2024, answer due 3/14/2025. (Liu, Ying)
Related: [-]
17 17 service Summons Returned Executed Mon 03/10 2:02 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by XianDong Shi. Lianhua Li served on 3/7/2025, answer due 3/28/2025. (Liu, Ying)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 07, 2025
16 16 service Summons Returned Executed Fri 03/07 10:41 AM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by XianDong Shi. Xinbin Tian served on 3/6/2025, answer due 3/27/2025. (Liu, Ying)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 06, 2025
15 15 service Summons Returned Executed Thu 03/06 4:04 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by XianDong Shi. Shumin Liu served on 3/6/2025, answer due 3/27/2025. (Liu, Ying)
Related: [-]
14 14 service Summons Returned Executed Thu 03/06 3:47 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by XianDong Shi. Jiguo Wu served on 3/5/2025, answer due 3/26/2025. (Liu, Ying)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 17, 2025
13 13 service Summons Returned Executed Mon 02/17 9:44 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by XianDong Shi. Linfeng Song served on 2/12/2025, answer due 3/14/2025. (Shields, Carolyn)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 14, 2025
12 12 service Summons Returned Executed Fri 02/14 4:21 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by XianDong Shi. Zengbin Yao served on 2/14/2025, answer due 3/7/2025. (Shields, Carolyn)
Related: [-]
11 11 service Summons Returned Executed Fri 02/14 4:08 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by XianDong Shi. Phuoc Van Tran served on 1/18/2025, answer due 2/10/2025. (Shields, Carolyn)
Related: [-]
order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Fri 02/14 12:42 PM
ORDER granting10 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Defendants Yongzhe Song, Lianhua Li, Linfeng Song and SSL Transportation LLC will answer or otherwise respond on or before 3/14/2025. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Vera M. Scanlon on 2/14/2025. (SH)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 13, 2025
10 10 motion Extension of Time to File Answer Thu 02/13 6:24 PM
Letter MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Responsive Pleading by Yongze Song, Lianhua Li, SSL Transportation LLC, Linfeng Song. (Xie, Shuyang)
Related: [-]
9 9 notice Notice of Appearance Thu 02/13 9:49 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Shuyang Xie on behalf of Yongze Song, Lianhua Li, SSL Transportation LLC, Linfeng Song (aty to be noticed) (Xie, Shuyang)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 16, 2025
8 8 misc Affidavit/Affirmation Thu 01/16 3:32 PM
AFFIDAVIT/AFFIRMATION Proof of service pursuant to 1/7/25 Judge Order by XianDong Shi (Liu, Ying)
Related: [-]
7 7 notice Notice of Appearance Thu 01/16 2:52 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Ying Liu on behalf of All Plaintiffs (aty to be noticed) (Liu, Ying)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 07, 2025
6 6 order Scheduling Order Tue 01/07 4:26 PM
SCHEDULING ORDER: An initial conference is scheduled for 5/6/2025 at 3:15 PM via ZoomGov. To gain access to the ZoomGov audio conferencing system, counsel and/or any pro se parties are to dial 1-646-828-7666; enter meeting ID 16121901090 and press the pound key; when asked for a participant ID, press the pound key; and enter passcode 091622 and press the pound key. Please note that your microphone will be automatically muted when you enter the virtual conference room. If another conference is underway, please remain on mute until the case is called. At that time, you may unmute your microphone by pressing *6 on your keypad. The parties must complete the attached Joint Proposed Case Management Plan (CMP) and file it on ECF no later than 4/28/2025. As to any Defendant who or which has not appeared by today's date, Plaintiff(s) must mail a copy of this Order, its attachment and the full public docket to each last known mailing address for each such Defendant and file proof of service on ECF within ten days of the date of this Order. The Court reminds the parties of their responsibility to file a disclosure statement under Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 7.1 within 30 days of appearing in this action, if applicable and if they have not yet done so. As to any LLC, the disclosure statement should identify all of the members and their respective citizenships. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Vera M. Scanlon on 1/7/2025. (SH)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 06, 2025
5 5 misc Quality Control Check - Attorney Case Opening Mon 01/06 4:11 PM
This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (CV)
Related: [-]
4 4 service Summons Issued Mon 01/06 4:10 PM
Summons Issued as to Longjian Jiang, Zhen Lei, Lianhua Li, Shumin Liu, SSL Transportation LLC, Linfeng Song, Yongze Song, Xinbin Tian, Phuoc Van Tran, Guizhen Wang, Jiguo Wu, Qiao Wen Wu, Zengbin Yao. (CV)
Related: [-]
3 3 misc Clerks Notice of Rule 73 Mon 01/06 4:08 PM
Clerk's Notice Re: Consent. A United States Magistrate Judge has been assigned to this case and is available to conduct all proceedings. In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent, the assigned Magistrate Judge is available to conduct all proceedings in this action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to this Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. Any party may withhold its consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent.The form may also be accessed at the following link:[LINK:https://img.nyed.uscourts.gov/files/forms/MJConsentForm.pdf] (CV)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Proposed Summons/Civil Cover Sheet Mon 01/06 2:02 PM
Proposed Summons.Civil Cover Sheet.. Re1 Complaint, by XianDong Shi (Shields, Carolyn)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Summons
1 1 cmp Complaint Mon 01/06 1:46 PM
COMPLAINT against Longjian Jiang, Zhen Lei, Lianhua Li, Shumin Liu, SSL TRANSPORTATION LLC, Linfeng Song, Yongze Song, Xinbin Tian, Phuoc Van Tran, Guizhen Wang, Jiguo Wu, Qiao Wen Wu, Zengbin Yao filing fee $ 405, receipt number CNYEDC-18635788 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -Yes. N/A,, filed by XianDong Shi. (Shields, Carolyn)
Related: [-]
utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Mon 01/06 4:07 PM
Case to Judge Natasha C. Merle and Magistrate Judge Vera M. Scanlon. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our[LINK:website] . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (CV)
Related: [-]