Massachusetts District Court
Judge:Allison D Burroughs
Case #: 1:25-cv-10027
Nature of Suit190 Contract - Other Contract
Cause29:1109 Breach of Fiduciary Duties
Case Filed:Jan 06, 2025
Terminated:Jan 27, 2025
Case in other court:Middlesex County Superior Court, 2481CV02756
Last checked: Thursday Feb 20, 2025 4:46 AM EST
Defendant
Black Harbor Build & Design, LLC
11 School Street
N. Chelmsford, MA 01863
Defendant
Homes Done Your Way Remodeling, LLC
84 Walcott Street
Stow, MA 01775
Defendant
K-Elle Modern Medical Corp.
4 Fletcher Lane
Westford, MA 01886
Defendant
Elise Loiselle
4 Fletcher Lane
Westford, MA 01886
Defendant
Kimberly Oliver
Defendant
Trizane Richardson
84 Walcott Street
Stow, MA 01775
Represented By
Michael B. Cole
Aceto, Bonner & Cole, PC
contact info
Plaintiff
RMF Holding Group, LLC
251 Little Falls Dr.
Wilmington, NY 19808
Represented By
Quinn Heath
Cable, Fleisher & Sosebee, PLLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/16/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Monday, January 27, 2025
6 6 misc Case file sent Mon 01/27 11:40 AM
Case file sent to Middlesex Superiour Court. (CAM)
Related: [-]
5 5 1 pgs order Order of Remand to State Court Mon 01/27 11:02 AM
Judge Allison D. Burroughs: ORDER entered. ORDER OF REMAND to the State Court. (CAM)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 24, 2025
4 4 notice Notice - Other Fri 01/24 7:10 AM
NOTICE by Trizane Richardson of Voluntary Remand (Cole, Michael)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 06, 2025
3 3 notice Certified Copy of Notice of Removal Provided to Defense Counsel Mon 01/06 5:06 PM
Certified Copy of Notice of Removal Provided to Defense Counsel by Email (McManus, Caetlin)
Related: [-]
2 2 notice Notice of Case Assignment Mon 01/06 3:35 PM
ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Judge Allison D. Burroughs assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge M. Page Kelley. (Kinsella, Jaylannie)
Related: [-]
1 1 notice Notice of Removal Mon 01/06 2:45 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Trizane Richardson ( Filing fee: $ 405, receipt number AMADC-10774407 Fee Status: Filing Fee paid)(Cole, Michael)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 26 pgs Exhibit State Court Complaint,
Att: 2 Affidavit,
Att: 3 Category Form,
Att: 4 Civil Cover Sheet