Colorado District Court
Judge:Lewis T Babcock
Case #: 1:25-cv-00033
Nature of Suit440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights
Cause42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Case Filed:Jan 06, 2025
Terminated:Apr 18, 2025
Last checked: Thursday Feb 20, 2025 2:21 AM MST
Defendant
Mid America Mortgage
Plaintiff
Sylvia F. Conley
782 Galena Street
Aurora, CO 80010


Docket last updated: 2 hours ago
Friday, April 18, 2025
12 12 order Judgment - Clerk Fri 04/18 1:34 PM
JUDGMENT by Clerk re:11 Order by Judge Lewis T. Babcock on 4/18/2025. (tlove, )
Related: [-]
11 11 2 pgs order Order on Report and Recommendations Fri 04/18 1:30 PM
ORDER by Judge Lewis T. Babcock on 4/18/2025. It is ORDERED that the Recommendation of United States Magistrate Judge (ECF No.10 ) is accepted and adopted. The amended complaint (ECF No.7 ) and the action are dismissed without prejudice pursuant to Rule 41(b) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure because Plaintiff failed to comply with the pleading requirements of Rule 8. Leave to proceed in forma pauperis on appeal is denied without prejudice to the filing of a motion seeking leave to proceed in forma pauperis on appeal in the United States Court of Appeals for the Tenth Circuit. (tlove, )
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 26, 2025
10 10 motion Report and Recommendations Wed 03/26 1:55 PM
RECOMMENDATION OF UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE re7 Amended Complaint filed by Sylvia F. Conley. By Magistrate Judge Richard T. Gurley on 3/26/2025 (tlove, )
Related: [-]
9 9 2 pgs order Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge Wed 03/26 11:37 AM
ORDER OF REFERENCE TO UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE. This action is under review pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 8.1. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 636(b), Fed. R. Civ. P. 72, and D.C.COLO.LCivR 72.1, United States Magistrate Judge Richard T. Gurley is designated to conduct proceedings in this civil action. By Judge Lewis T. Babcock on 3/26/2025. (tlove, )
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 25, 2025
8 8 1 pgs order Order Reassigning Case Tue 03/25 10:06 AM
MINUTE ORDER. Pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 8.1, the Clerk of Court is directed to assign this matter to Senior Judge Lewis T. Babcock. The undersigned will remain as the assigned magistrate judge. Entered by Magistrate Judge Richard T. Gurley on 3/25/2025. PLEASE READ THE ATTACHED ORDER. (tlove, )
Related: [-]
Monday, March 17, 2025
7 7 cmp Amended Complaint Mon 03/17 4:42 PM
AMENDED COMPLAINT against Mid America Mortgage, filed by Sylvia F. Conley. (tlove, ) (Missing pages)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet
Wednesday, February 19, 2025
6 6 order Minute Order Wed 02/19 10:21 AM
MINUTE ORDER. On January 15, 2025, Plaintiff was ordered to file an amended complaint within thirty days that complies with the pleading requirements of Rule 8 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Plaintiff has not filed an amended complaint within the time allowed. Instead, Plaintiff has submitted a set of exhibits (ECF No.5 ) that does not provide a short and plain statement of the claim(s) Plaintiff is asserting that demonstrates she is entitled to relief. Plaintiff will be given one more opportunity to file an amended complaint that complies with the pleading requirements of Rule 8 and must do so on or before March 21, 2025. Plaintiff is reminded that the action may be dismissed without further notice if she fails to file an amended complaint as previously directed within the time allowed. By Magistrate Judge Richard T. Gurley on 2/19/2025. (tlove, )
Related: [-]
Monday, February 10, 2025
5 5 misc Exhibits Mon 02/10 3:12 PM
Exhibits filed by Plaintiff Sylvia F. Conley. (tlove, )
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 15, 2025
4 4 6 pgs order Order Wed 01/15 12:06 PM
ORDER DIRECTING PLAINTIFF TO FILE AMENDED COMPLAINT. If Plaintiff fails to file an amended complaint within the time allowed, the action may be dismissed without further notice. It is FURTHER ORDERED that the Application to Proceed in District Court Without Prepaying Fees or Costs (Long Form) (ECF No.2 ) is denied as moot. By Magistrate Judge Richard T. Gurley on 1/15/2025. (tlove, )
Related: [-]
Monday, January 06, 2025
3 3 misc Case Assigned to Judge Mon 01/06 1:47 PM
Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Richard T. Gurley. Text Only Entry (efoga, )
Related: [-]
2 2 motion Proceed In Forma Pauperis Mon 01/06 1:47 PM
Application to Proceed in District Court Without Prepaying Fees or Costs (Long Form) by Plaintiff Sylvia F. Conley.(efoga, )
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Envelope
1 1 cmp Complaint Mon 01/06 1:46 PM
COMPLAINT against Mid America Mortgage Filing Fee: 405.00 Receipt Number:112928, filed by Sylvia F. Conley.(efoga, )
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Envelope