Colorado District Court
Judge:Nina Y Wang
Case #: 1:25-cv-00036
Nature of Suit190 Contract - Other Contract
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Declaratory Judgment
Case Filed:Jan 06, 2025
Case in other court:Denver County District Court, 2024CV33800
Last checked: Thursday Feb 20, 2025 2:22 AM MST
Counter Claimant
David Petrushka
Represented By
Murray I. Weiner
Mulliken Weiner Berg & Jolivet P.C.
contact info
Counter Defendant
Ramos Injury Firm, LLC, The
Represented By
Zachary Paul Mugge
Antero Law LLC
contact info
Defendant
David Petrushka
Represented By
Murray I. Weiner
Mulliken Weiner Berg & Jolivet P.C.
contact info
Plaintiff
Ramos Injury Firm, LLC, The
Represented By
Zachary Paul Mugge
Antero Law LLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 27 minutes ago
Wednesday, March 12, 2025
28 28 order Scheduling Order Wed 03/12 2:31 PM
SCHEDULING ORDER: Discovery due by 10/13/2025. Dispositive Motions due by 11/3/2025. SO ORDERED by Magistrate Judge Cyrus Y. Chung on 3/12/2025. (msmot)
Related: [-]
27 27 minutes Scheduling Conference Wed 03/12 2:25 PM
MINUTE ENTRY for Scheduling Conference held on 3/12/2025 before Magistrate Judge Cyrus Y. Chung: The Scheduling Order is approved and entered with the modifications and edits by the Court, as stated on the record. FTR: Courtroom C205. (msmot)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 26, 2025
26 26 misc Proposed Scheduling Order Wed 02/26 8:21 AM
Proposed Scheduling Order by Defendant David Petrushka. (Weiner, Murray)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 25, 2025
25 25 respm Reply to Response to Motion Tue 02/25 4:06 PM
REPLY to Response to7 Partial MOTION to Dismiss filed by Defendant David Petrushka. (Weiner, Murray)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 17, 2025
24 24 misc Jury Demand Mon 02/17 6:31 PM
DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Plaintiff Ramos Injury Firm, LLC, The, Counter Defendant Ramos Injury Firm, LLC, The. (Mugge, Zachary)
Related: [-]
23 23 answer Answer/Reply to Counterclaim Mon 02/17 6:29 PM
Plaintiff The Ramos Injury Law Firm, LLC's ANSWER/REPLY to8 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim by Ramos Injury Firm, LLC, The.(Mugge, Zachary)
Related: [-]
22 22 respm Response to Motion Mon 02/17 6:27 PM
RESPONSE to7 Partial MOTION to Dismiss filed by Plaintiff Ramos Injury Firm, LLC, The, Counter Defendant Ramos Injury Firm, LLC, The. (Mugge, Zachary)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 12, 2025
21 21 misc Jury Demand Wed 02/12 12:01 PM
DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Defendant David Petrushka. (Weiner, Murray)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 04, 2025
20 20 misc Corporate Disclosure Statement Tue 02/04 12:49 PM
CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. (Mugge, Zachary)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 03, 2025
19 19 misc Certificate (Miscellaneous) Mon 02/03 3:56 PM
CERTIFICATE OF REVIEW by Defendant David Petrushka. (Weiner, Murray)
Related: [-]
18 18 misc Corporate Disclosure Statement Mon 02/03 11:19 AM
CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. (Weiner, Murray)
Related: [-]
17 17 order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Mon 02/03 8:20 AM
MINUTE ORDER: The15 ,16 Motions for Extension of Time are GRANTED . The Parties are advised that press of business does not ordinarily constitute good cause for an extension. Plaintiff's deadline to respond to the7 Partial Motion to Dismiss and deadline to answer the counterclaims are extended to February 17, 2025 . By Judge Nina Y. Wang on 2/3/25. Text Only Entry(nywlc8, )
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 29, 2025
16 16 motion Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Wed 01/29 4:48 PM
Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to7 Partial MOTION to Dismiss by Plaintiff Ramos Injury Firm, LLC, The. (Mugge, Zachary)
Related: [-]
15 15 motion Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond Wed 01/29 4:46 PM
Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond re8 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim by Counter Defendant Ramos Injury Firm, LLC, The. (Mugge, Zachary)
Related: [-]
14 14 order Minute Order Wed 01/29 8:50 AM
MINUTE ORDER: The above-captioned case has been referred to Magistrate Judge Cyrus Y. Chung pursuant to an Order of Reference entered by District Judge Nina Y. Wang on January 28, 2025. ECF No. 13 . Proposed Scheduling Order due 3/5/2025. Scheduling Conference set for 3/12/2025 10:15 AM in Courtroom C205 before Magistrate Judge Cyrus Y. Chung. It is ORDERED that Defendant shall notify all Parties who have not entered an appearance of the date and time of the scheduling conference . Entered by Magistrate Judge Cyrus Y. Chung on 1/29/2025. (dgumb, )
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 28, 2025
13 13 order Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge Tue 01/28 1:41 PM
ORDER REFERRING CASE: This case is referred to Magistrate Judge Cyrus Y. Chung for non-dispositive matters . Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 636(b)(1)(A) and (B) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 72(a) and (b), this case is referred to the assigned United States Magistrate Judge to (1) convene a scheduling conference under Fed. R. Civ. P. 16(b) and enter a scheduling order meeting the requirements of D.C.COLO.LCivR 16.2, (2) conduct such status conferences and issue such orders necessary for compliance with the scheduling order, including amendments or modifications of the scheduling order upon a showing of good cause, and (3) hear and determine pretrial matters, including discovery and other non-dispositive motions. Court-sponsored alternative dispute resolution is governed by D.C.COLO.LCivR 16.6. On the request of the Parties by motion, this Court may direct the Parties to engage in an early neutral evaluation, a settlement conference, or another alternative dispute resolution proceeding. Alternatively, the Magistrate Judge, at his discretion, may convene such early neutral evaluation and/or settlement conferences and direct related procedures as may facilitate resolution of this case without the necessity of a motion or prior authorization of the undersigned. Counsel for the Parties and all counsel who may later enter an appearance shall review and familiarize themselves with the undersigned's Practice Standards, as well as the Practice Standards of the assigned Magistrate Judge. By Judge Nina Y. Wang on 1/28/2025. Text Only Entry (nywlc8, )
Related: [-]
12 12 order Minute Order Tue 01/28 1:39 PM
MINUTE ORDER: On January 6, 2025, Defendant David Petrushka removed this case to federal court pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 1332(a). See [Doc.1 ]. Under Rule 7.1 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, "[i]n an action in which jurisdiction is based on diversity under 28 U.S.C. § 1332(a), a party... must, unless the court orders otherwise, file a disclosure statement" that "name[s] - and identif[ies] the citizenship of - every individual or entity whose citizenship is attributed to that party or intervenor." Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1(a)(2). Accordingly, it is ORDERED that, on or before February 11, 2025 , both Plaintiff and Defendant SHALL FILE a Rule 7.1 disclosure statement identifying their respective states of citizenship. By Judge Nina Y. Wang on 1/28/2025. Text Only Entry (nywlc8, )
Related: [-]
11 11 misc Letter Reassigning Case Tue 01/28 9:22 AM
CASE REASSIGNED. Pursuant to10 Consent to Jurisdiction of Magistrate Judge. This case is randomly reassigned to Judge Nina Y. Wang and drawn to Magistrate Judge Cyrus Y. Chung. All parties do not consent. All future pleadings should be designated as 25-cv-36-NYW. (Text Only Entry) (dgumb, )
Related: [-]
10 10 misc Consent to Jurisdiction of Magistrate Judge Tue 01/28 8:44 AM
CONSENT to Jurisdiction of Magistrate Judge by Counter Claimant David Petrushka, Defendant David Petrushka All parties do not consent.. (Weiner, Murray)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 24, 2025
9 9 notice Notice of Entry of Appearance Fri 01/24 12:27 PM
NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Zachary Paul Mugge on behalf of All Plaintiffs Attorney Zachary Paul Mugge added to party Ramos Injury Firm, LLC, The(pty:pla) (Mugge, Zachary)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 13, 2025
8 8 answer Answer to Complaint Counterclaim Mon 01/13 11:41 AM
PARTIAL ANSWER to4 Complaint , COUNTERCLAIM against Ramos Injury Firm, LLC, The by David Petrushka.(Weiner, Murray)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A - April 3, 2024 Email,
Att: 2 Exhibit B - Contingent Fee Agreement
7 7 motion Dismiss Mon 01/13 11:37 AM
Partial MOTION to Dismiss by Defendant David Petrushka.(Weiner, Murray)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Contingent Fee Agreement,
Att: 2 Exhibit B - April 3, 2024 Email,
Att: 3 Proposed Order (PDF Only) Order Granting Defendant David Petrushka's Partial Motion to Dismiss
Monday, January 06, 2025
6 6 misc Magistrate Judge Consent Form Mon 01/06 4:16 PM
Magistrate Judge consent form issued pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 40.1, direct assignment of civil actions to full time magistrate judges. (efoga, )
Related: [-]
5 5 misc Case Assigned to Judge Mon 01/06 4:16 PM
Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Cyrus Y. Chung. Text Only Entry (efoga, )
Related: [-]
4 4 cmp Complaint Mon 01/06 4:15 PM
COMPLAINT against David Petrushka, filed by Ramos Injury Firm, LLC, The.(efoga, )
Related: [-]
3 3 misc Notice to Attorney(s) in Removed, Transferred or Other Cases Mon 01/06 4:14 PM
FIRST AND FINAL NOTICE TO ALL ATTORNEY(S) AND UNREPRESENTED PARTIES IN REMOVED, TRANSFERRED, OR OTHER CASES. To receive any further notice in a case removed or transferred to this court, or special matters including discovery disputes, bankruptcy appeals, or withdrawals of reference, Multi-district litigation (MDL), etc., all attorneys and unrepresented parties must enter an appearance under D.C.COLO.LAttyR 5(a). An attorney must be an active member of this court's bar and be in good standing in accordance with D.C.COLO.LAttyR 3. A waiver of the fee for bar admission may apply in limited situations. (Text Only Entry) (efoga, )
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Removal: Administrative Notices Mon 01/06 4:14 PM
ADMINISTRATIVE REMINDER to Filer. It is the responsibility of the attorney or pro se party removing the case to follow Local Rule D.C.COLO.LCivR 81.1 and 28 U.S.C. Section 1446a when filing a Notice of Removal. (Text only entry.) (efoga, )
Related: [-]
1 1 notice Notice of Removal Mon 01/06 3:56 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL by David Petrushka from Denver County District Court, Case Number 2024CV33800. (Filing fee $ 405, Receipt Number BCODC-10072871), filed by David Petrushka.(Weiner, Murray)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Exhibit A - Contingent Fee Agreement,
Att: 2 Exhibit Exhibit B - District Court File,
Att: 3 Exhibit Exhibit C - Waiver and Acceptance of Service,
Att: 4 Exhibit Exhibit D - Notice of Removal to District Court,
Att: 5 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet for Notice of Removal,
Att: 6 Civil Cover Sheet Supplemental Cover Sheet for Notices of Removal