California Central District Court
Judge:Pedro V Castillo
Case #: 2:25-cv-00130
Nature of Suit790 Labor - Other Labor Litigation
Cause28:1441 Notice of Removal - Labor/Mgmnt. Relations
Case Filed:Jan 06, 2025
Case in other court:Los Angeles Superior Court, 24STCV00942
Last checked: Thursday Feb 20, 2025 1:32 AM PST
Defendant
PDM Steel Service Centers, Inc.
Represented By
Cameron O'Brien Flynn
Ogletree Deakins Nash Smoak And Stewart P.C.
contact info
Spencer C Skeen
Ogletree Deakins Nash Smoak And Stewart PC
contact info
Defendant
Does
Plaintiff
Calvin Payne
Represented By
Alexander Krown Spellman
Gordon Rees Scully Mansukhani LLP
contact info
Jonathan M Genish
Blackstone Law, Apc
contact info
Patricia Jean Van Ert
Blackstone Law, Apc
contact info
Annabel Blanchard
Blackstone Law, Apc
contact info
Barbara DuVan-Clarke
Blackstone Law Apc
contact info
Plaintiff
Johnny Williams
Represented By
Alexander Krown Spellman
Gordon Rees Scully Mansukhani LLP
contact info
Jonathan M Genish
Blackstone Law, Apc
contact info
Patricia Jean Van Ert
Blackstone Law, Apc
contact info
Annabel Blanchard
Blackstone Law, Apc
contact info
Barbara DuVan-Clarke
Blackstone Law Apc
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/18/2025 11:59 PM PDT
Friday, March 07, 2025
15 15 order For Order Fri 03/07 3:20 PM
ORDER CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE by Magistrate Judge Pedro V. Castillo. The case management conference set for March 13, 2025 is continued to August 14, 2025 at 10:00 a.m., in person. The parties are to submit a joint case management conference statement no later than one week before the conference. (hr)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 06, 2025
14 14 misc Statement Thu 03/06 3:26 PM
STATEMENT Joint Case Management Conference Statement re: Order on Motion for Order,11 .(Flynn, Cameron)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
13 13 notice Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel (G-123) Thu 03/06 10:32 AM
Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Barbara DuVan-Clarke counsel for Plaintiff Johnny Williams. Adding Danielle GruppChang as counsel of record for Plaintiff JOHNNY WILLIAMS for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Plaintiff JOHNNY WILLIAMS. (DuVan-Clarke, Barbara)
Related: [-]
12 12 notice Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel (G-123) Thu 03/06 10:08 AM
Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Barbara DuVan-Clarke counsel for Plaintiff Calvin Payne. Adding Danielle GruppChang as counsel of record for Plaintiff CALVIN PAYNE for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Plaintiff CALVIN PAYNE. (DuVan-Clarke, Barbara)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 28, 2025
11 11 order For Order Wed 01/29 9:43 AM
CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER by Magistrate Judge Pedro V. Castillo: granting10 Joint Case Management Conference Statement. The case management conference set for February 4, 2025 is continued to March 13, 2025 at 10:00 a.m. The parties are to submit a joint case management conference statement no later than one week before the conference. (hr)
Related: [-]
10 10 4 pgs motion Order Tue 01/28 2:28 PM
STATEMENT Joint Case Management Conference Statement re: Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held,, Set/Reset Hearing,9 .(Skeen, Spencer) Modified on 1/28/2025 (mr)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Wednesday, January 22, 2025
9 9 order Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held ~Util - Set/Reset Hearings Wed 01/22 4:27 PM
MINUTE (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER Re: CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE by Magistrate Judge Pedro V. Castillo. To advance the litigation efficiently, the Court will hold an in-person case management conference on February 4, 2025, at 2:00 p.m. (see document for further details) (hr)
Related: [-]
8 8 17 pgs order Order Wed 01/22 4:12 PM
CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER FOR CIVIL CASES ASSIGNED TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE PEDRO V. CASTILLO by Magistrate Judge Pedro V. Castillo. (see document for details) (hr)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 17, 2025
7 7 textonly MJDAP Opt-Out Expired Fri 01/17 9:52 AM
The period to decline consent to a magistrate judge has expired. No timely declination of consent has been received by the Court. Each party is deemed to have knowingly and voluntarily consented to proceed before a Magistrate Judge for all purposes pursuant to the Local Rules. The case shall now proceed before a Magistrate Judge for all purposes. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (mr)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 10, 2025
6 6 notice Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel (G-123) Fri 01/10 4:16 PM
Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Barbara DuVan-Clarke counsel for Plaintiff Calvin Payne. Alexander Krown Spellman is no longer counsel of record for the aforementioned party in this case for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Plaintiff Calvin Payne. (DuVan-Clarke, Barbara)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 08, 2025
5 5 service Proof of Service (subsequent documents) Wed 01/08 5:00 PM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Defendant PDM Steel Service Centers, Inc., re Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71)2 , Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties3 , Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening),,,1 served on January 8, 2025. (Flynn, Cameron)
Related: [-]
4 4 misc Notice of Assignment to U.S. Magistrate Judge and Declination of Consent CV-20B optional html form Wed 01/08 9:16 AM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to a U.S. Magistrate Judge and Declination of Consent. This case has been randomly assigned to Magistrate Judge Pedro V. Castillo. (sh)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 06, 2025
3 3 notice Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties Mon 01/06 4:08 PM
NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant PDM Steel Service Centers, Inc., identifying Calvin Payne, Johnny Williams, PDM Steel Service Centers, Inc.. (Flynn, Cameron)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) Mon 01/06 4:05 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendant PDM Steel Service Centers, Inc.. (Flynn, Cameron)
Related: [-]
1 1 notice Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening) Mon 01/06 4:03 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Los Angeles Superior Court, case number 24STCV00942 Receipt No: BCACDC-38863163 - Fee: $405, filed by Defendant PDM Steel Service Centers, Inc.. (Attorney Cameron O'Brien Flynn added to party PDM Steel Service Centers, Inc.(pty:dft))(Flynn, Cameron)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration of Cameron O. Flynn in Support of Defendant's Notice of Removal of Civil Action to United States District Court,
Att: 2 Exhibit 1 to Declaration of Cameron O. Flynn,
Att: 3 Exhibit 2 to Declaration of Cameron O. Flynn,
Att: 4 Exhibit 3 to Declaration of Cameron O. Flynn,
Att: 5 Exhibit 4 to Declaration of Cameron O. Flynn,
Att: 6 Declaration of Jennifer Gardner in Support of Defendant's Removal of Civil Action to United States District Court
cmp Complaint - (Discovery) Wed 01/08 9:09 AM
CONFORMED EFILED COPY OF SUMMONS AND CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT against Defendants Does, PDM Steel Service Centers, Inc. Jury Demanded., filed by Plaintiffs Calvin Payne, Johnny Williams. [FILED IN STATE COURT 01/12/2024 SUBMITTED AS ATTACHMENT NO. 2 EXHIBIT 1 TO THE NOTICE OF REMOVAL1 ] (sh)
Related: [-]