Florida Middle District Court
Judge:Marcia Morales Howard
Referred: Patricia D Barksdale
Case #: 3:25-cv-00014
Nature of Suit530 Prisoner Petitions - Habeas Corpus - General
Cause28:2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State)
Case Filed:Jan 03, 2025
Terminated:Feb 25, 2025
Case in other court:Florida Northern, 4:24-cv-00531
Last checked: Tuesday Jan 07, 2025 10:05 PM EST
Petitioner
Kimberly Lee Kessler
J81354 Lowell Correctional Institution - Main 11120 NW Gainesville Road
Ocala, FL 34482
Respondent
State of Florida


Docket last updated: 2 hours ago
Wednesday, April 23, 2025
14 14 appeal USCA order Thu 04/24 5:32 PM
ORDER of USCA Dismissed as to12 Notice of Appeal filed by Kimberly Lee Kessler. EOD: 04/23/2025and issued as mandate; USCA number: 25-10811 (SJW)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 13, 2025
13 13 appeal Transmittal of initial appeal package Thu 03/13 11:29 AM
TRANSMITTAL of initial appeal package to USCA consisting of copies of notice of appeal, docket sheet, order/judgment being appealed, and motion, if applicable to USCA re12 Notice of Appeal.(ELA)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Notice of Appeal,
Att: 2 Order,
Att: 3 Judgment,
Att: 4 Docket Sheet
Wednesday, March 12, 2025
12 12 appeal Notice of Appeal Thu 03/13 11:27 AM
NOTICE OF APPEAL as to10 Judgment,9 Order by Kimberly Lee Kessler. Filing fee not paid.(ELA)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Mailing Envelope,
Att: 2 USCA Letter
Tuesday, February 25, 2025
11 11 notice Notice to Counsel of Local Rule Tue 02/25 9:16 AM
NOTICE of Local Rule 1.11(e), which provides that, unless an order states another time, a seal under Rule 1.11 expires ninety days after a case is closed and all appeals are exhausted. To prevent the content of a sealed item from appearing on the docket after the seal expires, a party or interested non-party must move for relief before the seal expires. (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (ARL)
Related: [-]
10 10 misc Judgment - Prisoner Tue 02/25 9:14 AM
JUDGMENT is entered dismissing this case without prejudice (Signed by Deputy Clerk) (ARL)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 24, 2025
9 9 4 pgs order Order Mon 02/24 2:31 PM
ORDER dismissing the case without prejudice; directions to the Clerk. Signed by Judge Marcia Morales Howard on 2/24/2025. (SM)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 14, 2025
8 8 motion Miscellaneous Relief Fri 02/14 3:36 PM
MOTION for Miscellaneous Relief, specifically Requesting Status Update by Kimberly Lee Kessler. (JOS)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 27, 2025
7 7 notice Notice of Inquiry Tue 01/28 11:42 AM
NOTICE of inquiry titled Motion Requesting Status Update by Kimberly Lee Kessler. Clerk responded with courtesy copy of docket sheet.(JDR)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Mailing Envelope
Thursday, January 23, 2025
6 6 motion Proceed In Forma Pauperis Mon 01/27 12:51 PM
MOTION to Proceed In Forma Pauperis by Kimberly Lee Kessler.(JDR)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Attachment,
Att: 2 Mailing Envelope,
Att: 3 Mailing Envelope (Received from the Northern District)
Monday, January 06, 2025
5 5 transfer District Transfer In Mon 01/06 3:47 PM
Case TRANSFERRED from the Northern District of Florida. Case assigned to District Judge Marcia Morales Howard and Magistrate Judge Patricia D. Barksdale. New Case Number: 3:25-cv-14-MMH-PDB. (MDC)
Related: [-]
4 4 transfer Case transferred in - district transfer Mon 01/06 3:39 PM
Case transferred in from District of Florida Northern; Case Number 4:24-cv-00531. File received electronically
Related: [-]
Friday, January 03, 2025
3 3 ORDER. The clerk shall transfer this case to the U.S. District Court for the Middle District of Florida and shall close the file in the Northern District. Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE HOPE T CANNON on 1/3/2025. (mb) [Transferred from flnd on 1/6/2025.]
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 31, 2024
2 2 Notice to Pro Se Litigant, KIMBERLY LEE KESSLER. (mb) [Transferred from flnd on 1/6/2025.]
Related: [-]
ACTION REQUIRED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE: Chambers of MAGISTRATE JUDGE HOPE T CANNON notified that action is needed Re:1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus. (No service copy/no IFP Motion/fee not paid). (mb) [Transferred from flnd on 1/6/2025.]
Related: [-]
Monday, December 30, 2024
1 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus, filed by KIMBERLY LEE KESSLER. (No service copy/no IFP Motion/fee not paid). (mb) [Transferred from flnd on 1/6/2025.]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit