Georgia Northern District Court
Judge:Timothy C Batten, Sr
Case #: 1:25-cv-00046
Nature of Suit360 Torts - Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Libel,Assault,Slander
Case Filed:Jan 06, 2025
Re-opened:Sep 20, 2024
Case in other court:California Northern, 3:22-cv-09153
Last checked: Thursday Feb 20, 2025 4:38 AM EST
Defendant
Angelica Muldrow
3748 Sycamore Bend
Decatur, GA 30034
Represented By
Frank G. Podesta
Fgp Law LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Ajeenah Crittendon
Represented By
Catherine Delcin
Delcin Consulting Group Apc
contact info
Jason H. Coffman
Law Office Of Jason H. Coffman
contact info
Fateen Anthony Dawkins
Anthony Dawkins, PC
contact info
Plaintiff
EZ E-File Tax Preparers, Inc.
a California corporation 11501 Dublin Blvd STE 200
Dublin, GA 94568
Represented By
Catherine Delcin
Delcin Consulting Group Apc
contact info
Fateen Anthony Dawkins
Anthony Dawkins, PC
contact info

GPO Mar 31 2023
ORDER DENYING 16 SPECIAL MOTION TO STRIKE AND SUA SPONTE DISMISSING COMPLAINT. Signed by Chief Judge Richard Seeborg on March 31, 2023. The motion hearing set for April 20, 2023, is vacated. (rslc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/31/2023)Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) [Transferred from California Northern on 1/6/2025.]
GPO Aug 22 2023
ORDER GRANTING 42 MOTION TO DISMISS, DENYING 33 MOTION FOR ATTORNEY FEES, AND DENYING 70 MOTION TO STRIKE. Signed by Chief Judge Richard Seeborg on August 22, 2023. (rslc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/22/2023)Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) [Transferred from California Northern on 1/6/2025.]
GPO Sep 23 2024
ORDER REOPENING CASE, VACATING IN PART ORDER OF DISMISSAL, AND SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Signed by Chief Judge Richard Seeborg on September 23, 2024. (rslc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/23/2024)Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) [Transferred from California Northern on 1/6/2025.]
GPO Jan 06 2025
ORDER GRANTING 84 MOTION TO CHANGE VENUE. Signed by Chief Judge Richard Seeborg on January 6, 2025. (rslc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/6/2025)Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) [Transferred from California Northern on 1/6/2025.]

Docket last updated: 6 hours ago
Thursday, April 17, 2025
118 118 9 pgs order Order on Motion to Change Venue Order on Motion to Disqualify Judge Thu 04/17 1:40 PM
ORDER denying111 Motion to Change Venue; denying116 Motion to Disqualify Judge.. Signed by Judge Timothy C. Batten, Sr. on 04/17/2025. (jkb)
Related: [-]