FATA v. ORTIZ et al
Pennsylvania Eastern District Court | |
Judge: | Mitchell S Goldberg |
Case #: | 5:24-cv-06936 |
Nature of Suit | 440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights |
Cause | 42:1983 Civil Rights Act |
Case Filed: | Dec 30, 2024 |
Last checked: Friday Feb 14, 2025 6:33 AM EST |
Defendant
ABRAHAM ORTIZ
|
|
Defendant
PAMELA PEREZ
|
|
Plaintiff
ABRAHIM FATA
193200 LEHIGH COUNTY DOC 38 N. 4TH STREET
ALLENTOWN, PA 18102 |
Docket last updated: 10 hours ago |
Wednesday, May 07, 2025 | ||
10 | 10
![]() NOTICE of Docketing Record on Appeal from USCA re9 Notice of Appeal filed by ABRAHIM FATA. USCA Case Number 25-1887 (dt) |
|
Thursday, May 01, 2025 | ||
9 | 9
![]() NOTICE OF APPEAL as to8 Order (Memorandum and/or Opinion), by ABRAHIM FATA. (ENVELOPE ATTACHED). (er) |
|
Friday, April 25, 2025 | ||
misc
Remark
Fri 04/25 7:44 AM
COPY OF DOC. NOS. 7 AND 8 HAVE BEEN MAILED TO PRO SE. (bw) |
||
Wednesday, April 23, 2025 | ||
8 | 8
![]() ORDER THAT LEAVE TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS IS GRANTED. ABRAHIM FATA # 193200,SHALL PAY THE FULL FILING FEE OF $350 IN INSTALLMENTS REGARLESS OF THE OUTCOME OF THIS CASE. THE CLERK OF COURT IS DIRECTED TO SEND A COPY OF THIS ORDER TO THE WARDEN OF LEHIGH COUNTY JAIL. THE COMPLAINT IS DEEMED FILED. THE COMPLAINT IS DISMISSED. THE CLERK OF COURT SHALL CLOSE THIS CASE. SIGNED BY CHIEF JUDGE MITCHELL S. GOLDBERG ON 4/23/25. 4/24/25 ENTERED AND COPIES NOT MAILED TO PRO SE AND E-MAILED TO WARDEN OF LEHIGH COUNTY JAIL. (mbh) |
|
7 | 7
![]() MEMORANDUM AND/OR OPINION. SIGNED BY CHIEF JUDGE MITCHELL S. GOLDBERG ON 4/23/25. 4/24/25 ENTERED AND COPIES NOT MAILED TO PRO SE.(mbh) |
|
Monday, February 10, 2025 | ||
6 | 6
![]() Request filed by ABRAHIM FATA. (mbh) |
|
5 | 5
![]() Amended Statement filed by ABRAHIM FATA. (mbh) |
|
Wednesday, January 15, 2025 | ||
4 | 4
![]() ORDER THAT PLAINTIFF HAVING FAILED TO FILE A CERTIFIED COPY OF THE PRISONER ACCOUNT STATEMENT, AS REQUIRED, PLAINTIFFS MOTION TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS CANNOT BE ADJUDICATED AT THIS TIME. PLAINTIFF SHALL, WITHIN 30 DAYS OF THE DATE OF THIS ORDER, FILE A CERTIFIED COPY OF THE PRISONER TRUST FUND ACCOUNT STATEMENT. ALTERNATIVELY PLAINTIFF CAN PROCEED BY SUBMITTING $405 TO THE CLERK OF COURT WITHIN 30 DAYS OF THE DATE OF THIS ORDER. IF PLAINTIFF FAILS TO COMPLY WITH THIS ORDER, THE CASE MAY BE DISMISSED WITHOUT FURTHER NOTICE FOR FAILURE TO PROSECUTE.. SIGNED BY GEORGE V WYLESOL, CLERK OF COURT ON 1/15/25. 1/15/25 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED TO PRO SE PLAINTIFF ABRAHIM FATA.(dt) |
|
Monday, December 30, 2024 | ||
3 | 3
![]() PRO SE NOTICE RE:GUIDELINES (mas) |
|
2 | 2
![]() COMPLAINT against ABRAHAM ORTIZ, PAMELA PEREZ, filed by ABRAHIM FATA.(mas) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
1 | 1
![]() MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by ABRAHIM FATA.(mas) |